Martin Reiner v. Bryan Leifer et al
Plaintiff: Martin Reiner
Defendant: John Haubrich Jr, John Barber, Susan Kaplan, Craig Holden, Lewis, Bisgaard & Smith, Ronnie Caplane, Manuel Graiwer, Boris Vernik, Steve Belilove, Rick Dietrich, Richard Shapiro, Steven Yee, Rosely George, Bryan Leifer, Gary Kaplan, James Robbins, Does 1 to 10, inclusive and Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP
Case Number: 2:2018cv10186
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case, #12 #13 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. (mrgo)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case, #12 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case is closed. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 15] First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminated Case, #12 filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Weston, Christopher) Modified on 1/23/2019 (mrgo).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT 10 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Because Plaintiff's lawsuit is within the scope of Judge King's vexatious litigant order and because Plaintiff did not obtain approval to file his complaint, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's complaint for failing to comply with Judge King's order. (See document for details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Martin Reinerto Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 10 Response to OSC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Weston, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court orders the plaintiff to show cause, in writing, no later than January 8, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for failing to comply with the order 66 that issued in 2:15-cv-07577-GHK-KES. The defendant was ordered "to seek approval from the Chief Judge of this Court prior to any filing in this Court that relates to claims stemming from or relating to his involvement in matters identified on pages 23-26 of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed on November 25, 2015" 60 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/07/2018,, filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner.(Weston, Christopher)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants John Barber, Steve Belilove, Ronnie Caplane, Rick Dietrich, Rosely George, Manuel Graiwer, John Haubrich Jr, Craig Holden, Gary Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Bryan Leifer, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP, James Robbins, Richard Shapiro, Boris Vernik, Steven Yee. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #2 , MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Summons and Case Civil Cover Sheet were e-filed under the wrong event category. No further action is required for the Civil Cover Sheet and for the Summons unless the Court so directs. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 [CIVIL COVER SHEET] filed as Case Cover Sheet with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/07/2018, receipt number 26E00H60), filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner.(Weston, Christopher) Modified on 12/11/2018 (car).
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 [Request for Clerk to Issue Summons] filed as Summons with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/07/2018, receipt number 26E00H60), filed by plaintiff Martin Reiner.(Weston, Christopher) Modified on 12/11/2018 (car).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22858802 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner. (Attorney Christopher G Weston added to party Martin Reiner(pty:bkmov))(Weston, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Reiner v. Bryan Leifer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haubrich Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis, Bisgaard & Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Caplane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Graiwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Vernik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Belilove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosely George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Reiner
Represented By: Christopher G Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?