Acrisure of California, LLC v. SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company and Acrisure of California, LLC
Defendant: SoCal COMMERICAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a California corporation; PAUL J. SMITH, an individual; KENNETH D. SMITH, an individual; and Does 1 through 20 inclusive, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Paul J. Smith, SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. and Kenneth D. Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv10187
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph R Ashby on behalf of Defendants Kenneth D. Smith, Paul J. Smith, SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. (Ashby, Joseph)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Sergenian, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kenneth D. Smith answer now due 2/28/2019; Paul J. Smith answer now due 2/28/2019; SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. answer now due 2/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Kenneth D. Smith; Paul J. Smith; SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc..(Attorney David A Sergenian added to party Kenneth D. Smith(pty:dft), Attorney David A Sergenian added to party Paul J. Smith(pty:dft), Attorney David A Sergenian added to party SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sergenian, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Acrisure of California, LLC, upon Defendant Kenneth D. Smith served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenneth D. Smith, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kenneth D. Smith. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Paul J. Smith. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company., Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company, identifying ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC d/b/a/ Tegner Miller Insurance Brokers. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Kidde, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22858678 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Attorney Thomas S Kidde added to party ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company(pty:pla))(Kidde, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acrisure of California, LLC v. SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acrisure of California, LLC
Represented By: Gary S Rattet
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoCal COMMERICAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a California corporation; PAUL J. SMITH, an individual; KENNETH D. SMITH, an individual; and Does 1 through 20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Smith
Represented By: Joseph R Ashby
Represented By: David A Sergenian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoCal Commerical Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R Ashby
Represented By: David A Sergenian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth D. Smith
Represented By: Joseph R Ashby
Represented By: David A Sergenian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?