Stephen H. Bafford et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Bafford, Laura Bafford and Stephen H. Bafford
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation, Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan and Alight Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10219
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE #18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Northrop Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss on February 8, 2019. Plaintiffs shall have until Monday, March 4, 2019 to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss. Northrop Defendants shall have until Monday, March 18, 2019 to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Northrop Defendants motion to dismiss shall be heard on Monday, April 1, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., or as soon thereafter as may be convenient for the Court. (lc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Northrop Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nowak, Richard)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation, (Nowak, Richard)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stephen H. Bafford, Laura Bafford. upon Alight Solutions LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Ilene Grant. (Renaker, Teresa)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard E. Nowak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation designating Alexander Vitruk as local counsel #13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard E. Nowak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard E. Nowak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23014830) filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vitruk, Alexander)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stephen H. Bafford, Laura Bafford. upon Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard E. Nowak. (Renaker, Teresa)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stephen H. Bafford, Laura Bafford. upon Northrop Grumman Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard E. Nowak. (Renaker, Teresa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander Vitruk on behalf of Defendants Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation (Attorney Alexander Vitruk added to party Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Vitruk added to party Northrop Grumman Corporation(pty:dft))(Vitruk, Alexander)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-00513 DMG (JEMx) (esa)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed as to USA (60 days). Proof by certified mail missing information due to incorrect event; missing certified mail receipts. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Service on Secretaries of Labor and Treasury filed by Plaintiffs Laura Bafford, Stephen H. Bafford (Renaker, Teresa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laura Bafford, Stephen Bafford, identifying Stephen H. Bafford, Laura Bafford, Northrop Grumman Corp., Admin. Comm. of Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Northrop Grumman Pension Plan, Alight Solutions LLC, Blackstone Group. (Renaker, Teresa)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Laura Bafford, Stephen Bafford. (Renaker, Teresa)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22863593 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Bafford, Laura Bafford. (Attorney Teresa S Renaker added to party Laura Bafford(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa S Renaker added to party Stephen Bafford(pty:pla))(Renaker, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen H. Bafford et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Richard E Nowak
Represented By: Alexander Vitruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Committee of the Northrop Grumman Pension Plan
Represented By: Richard E Nowak
Represented By: Alexander Vitruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alight Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bafford
Represented By: Teresa S Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Bafford
Represented By: Teresa S Renaker
Represented By: Margo E Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Kirsten Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen H. Bafford
Represented By: Margo E Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Kirsten Scott
Represented By: Teresa S Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?