Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. v. Pixels.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. and Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. doing business as MPTV Images
Defendant: Pixels.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10232
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Grossbardt, Jonah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pixels.com, LLC answer now due 3/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Pixels.com, LLC.(Attorney Jay A Woollacott added to party Pixels.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Woollacott, Jay)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than, February 7, 2019 at noon, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Defendant(s) Answer or Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to defendant(s). The Court may dismiss the entire action prior to the expiration of such time, however, if plaintiff has not diligently prosecuted the action. (iv)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., upon Defendant Pixels.com, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Courtney H. "Doe", as person in charge of office at time of service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pixels.com, LLC. (jtil)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22866409 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3- Demand letters) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. v. Pixels.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. doing business as MPTV Images
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixels.com, LLC
Represented By: Jay A Woollacott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?