Darren Harris v. Jerry Brown et.al.
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Defendant: I Mijares, Kathleen Allison, E Jordan, C. Freeman, J Batrez, Chief Deputy Warden Xavier Cano, G Johnson, W Reaume, C Campbell, Rosas, A Lugo, Debbie Asuncion, Enriquez, M. Voong, Jerry Brown, J. Curiel, T Rodriguez, Edward, M Bolton, Scott Kernan and J Anderson
Case Number: 2:2018cv10349
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Deficiency. On 2/1/2019, the Court received, through the United States Mail, the attached document for filing in the above-captioned case, which alleges claims arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. To submit a document for filing in this case, you must present it to designated staff at your facility for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your document(s) a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. Submission of this document by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02, it is hereby ORDERED that the document(s) be rejected. You must now re-submit your document(s) to the Court electronically, in accordance to General Order 18-02 and your institution's policies. If you fail to do so, the document(s) will not be filed and will not be considered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6) (hr)
January 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #24 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (see document for details) (hr)
January 24, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, Re REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order #24 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, DENYING, #17 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee, with leave to amend within 30 days. (es)
January 24, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Re #17 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml)
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Darren Harris. (dml)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
December 13, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Western Division for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 Letter from Darren Harris dated 10/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 19 Letter from Darren Harris dated 6/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) Modified on 6/26/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 18 Letter from Darren Harris dated 5/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Account, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.] Modified on 12/14/2018 (lh).
March 12, 2018 Filing 16 Mail sent to Darren Harris returned as undeliverable re #13 Order,,. Mail Returned; response required by 5/11/2018. (REFUSED)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IFP Form due by 4/5/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Darren Harris dated 2/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IFP Form due by 3/5/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Darren Harris. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IFP Form due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 certificate, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Jerry Brown, Kathleen Allison, Scott Kernan, Debbie Asuncion, Xavier Cano, J. Curiel, M. Bolton, Rosas, G. Johnson, J. Anderson, C. Campbell, W. Reaume, E. Jordan, Edward, T Rodriguez, J. Batrez, Enriquez, A Lugo, I. Mijares, C. Freeman, M. Voong. Filed byDarren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File to File Complaint and In Forma Pauperis Application as MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Complaint and In Forma Pauperis Application. Form Complaint due by 12/3/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File complaint filed by Darren Harris. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2017: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 11/13/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/13/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 1 Letter from Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darren Harris v. Jerry Brown et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Mijares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Batrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Warden Xavier Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Reaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Curiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?