Fariba B. Banayan v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fariba Banayan and Fariba B. Banayan
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP, The Bank of New York, Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou, Michael Moseby, Countrywide Bank, NA, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Recontrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America, National Association and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10367
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #7 , #10 by Judge Manuel L. Real. See document for details. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (gk)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real. On January 31, 2019, Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Plaintiff Fariba Banayan filed a stipulation to allow Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. additional time to respond to the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint was stricken for untimeliness, on January 31, 2019. Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Plaintiff Fariba Banayan's Stipulation #15 is hereby MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon #7 , and the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, NA #10 , set for hearing on February 4, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. are suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of February 4, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. The document is stricken. See Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents. (cch)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, identifying JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. is a wholly owned subsidiary of JPMorgan Chase & Co., which is incorporated in Delaware. (Hyatt, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 18, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Robert A Hyatt added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank(pty:dft))(Hyatt, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. F.R.Civ.P 15 Amended pleading is untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 *STRICKEN 1/31/19 - See Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #14 and Response by the Court #17 * First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by plaintiff Fariba B. Banayan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Banayan, Fariba) Modified on 2/1/2019 (cch).
December 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10367 R(RAOx). (rn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Campbell, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, NA. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Campbell, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, re Request for Judicial Notice, #8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 served on 12/21/2018. (Jindal, Neeru)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jindal, Neeru)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jindal, Neeru)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, NA, identifying Bank of America Corporation. (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Recontrust Company, NA(pty:dft))(Campbell, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 JOINDER filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Countrywide Bank, FSB f/k/a Countrywide Bank, N.A. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Campbell, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
December 14, 2018 COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, Countrywide Bank, NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Michael Moseby, Recontrust Company, NA, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon, Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Fariba B. Banayan. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, identifying Computershare Limited, Bank of New York Corporation. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV05861 Receipt No: 0973-22898286 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A(pty:dft))(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fariba B. Banayan v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as successor Indenture Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and successor by April 27, 2009 de jure merger with Cou
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moseby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Robert A Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, NA
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fariba Banayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fariba B. Banayan
Represented By: Fariba Bakshian Banayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?