Alfonso Ribeiro v. Epic Games, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro alleged that Defendant Epic Games, Inc. infringed on Plaintiff's copyrights in the Carlton Dance by offering an in-game purchase under the name "Fresh" that allows a player's avatar to perform the Carlton Dance during Fortnite gameplay.

Plaintiff: Alfonso Ribeiro
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv10412
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10110 CJC(RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10412 CJC(RAOx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel #12 . (gk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23071810) filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Epic Games, Inc. answer now due 2/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro.(Beck, Carolynn)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, upon Defendant Epic Games, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brittney Foreman - Person in Charge Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (jtil)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro, (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22904596 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Ribeiro. (Attorney Carolynn Kyungwon Beck added to party Alfonso Ribeiro(pty:pla))(Beck, Carolynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonso Ribeiro v. Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Ribeiro
Represented By: Carolynn Kyungwon Beck
Represented By: David L Hecht
Represented By: Daniel Dubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?