Livia Santos Pinheiro v. United States of America
Petitioner: Livia Santos Pinheiro
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv10420
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: #5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Government is to respond to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence and Petition for a Writ of Coram Nobis in the above-captioned matters by February 22, 2019. The Petitioner's reply is to be filed by March 22, 2019. (mrgo)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING RESPONSE DATE filed by respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, Ryan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu; The Government is ordered to file a response to the Petition for a Writ of Coram Nobis #1 by January 15, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Ryan White on behalf of respondent United States of America. (White, Ryan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu for petition filed under 28 U.S.C. 1651. (lh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Coram Nobis Pursuant to by a Person In Federal Custody (28:1651), filed by Petitioner Livia Santos Pinheiro. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livia Santos Pinheiro v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Ryan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Livia Santos Pinheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?