Richard Scott Brooks v. Scott Freunheim et al
Petitioner: Richard Scott Brooks
Respondent: Scott Freunheim and Jaxier Beccera
Case Number: 2:2018cv10506
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: IT IS ORDERED that Respondent is granted a thirty-day extension of time, to and including February 25, 2019, in which to file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. If Respondent files a Motion, Petitioner's Opposition shall be filed and served within twenty days of the Motions service date. re #9 (sbou)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 First APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DECLARATION OF HEATHER B. ARAMBARRI; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Respondent Scott Freunheim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arambarri, Heather)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Deputy Attorney General Heather B. Arambarri on behalf of Respondent Scott Freunheim. (Attorney Heather Bushman Arambarri added to party Scott Freunheim(pty:res))(Arambarri, Heather)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Respondent shall e-file and serve a Notice of Appearance that designates the Deputy Attorney General(s) in charge of the case within fourteen (14) days of the service date of this Order. Respondent shall file a Motion to Dismiss within thirty (30) days of the service date of this Order. Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to the Petition within forty-five (45) days of the service date of this Order. Petitioner may file a single Reply responding to matters raised in the Answer within thirty (30) days of the date of service thereof. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent) (kh)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is hereby GRANTED. (kh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 W 1st Street, Suite 4311**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565*. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Scott Brooks. (jms) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jaxier Beccera, Scott Freunheim, filed by Richard Scott Brooks.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2651-WQH-BLM. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening] (jms) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Scott Brooks v. Scott Freunheim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Scott Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Freunheim
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Heather Bushman Arambarri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jaxier Beccera
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?