Samdae Enterprises, Inc. v. LANY Music, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samdae Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Jake Clifford Goss, LANY Music, LLC, Charles Leslie Priest, Paul Jason Klein and Ryan Miller
Case Number: 2:2018cv10556
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 28 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order) (lom)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiffs Complaint and any related counterclaims in the above-entitled action. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (lom)
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #24 by Clerk of Court to Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The document is accepted as filed. The case is closed as stipulated. (jp)
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. There is an answer on file. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc..(Delgado, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying LANY Music, LLC, Paul Jason Klein, Charles Leslie Priest, Jake Clifford Goss and Ryan Miller. (Rothschild, Stephen)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 4/22/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: LANY MUSIC, INC., Paul Jason Klein,Charles Leslie Priest, Jake Clifford Gossand Ryan Miller Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and, COUNTERCLAIM against Samdae Enterprises, Inc. filed by Defendants Ryan Miller, Charles Leslie Priest, Paul Jason Klein, LANY Music, LLC, Jake Clifford Goss.(Rothschild, Stephen)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO FEBRUARY 15, 2019 #18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ryan Miller answer now due 2/15/2019; Charles Leslie Priest answer now due 2/15/2019; Paul Jason Klein answer now due 2/15/2019; LANY Music, LLC answer now due 2/15/2019; Jake Clifford Goss answer now due 2/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Ryan Miller; Charles Leslie Priest; Paul Jason Klein; LANY Music, LLC; Jake Clifford Goss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Jake Clifford Goss(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Paul Jason Klein(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party LANY Music, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Ryan Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Charles Leslie Priest(pty:dft))(Rothschild, Stephen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Ryan Miller Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: see below under other. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event did not extend any time to respond to complaint, therefore a proposed order should have been submitted. (Note correct events that should have been used: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less); or Stipulation: Extending time to answer (More than 30 days)..which requires a proposed order to be submitted)...select the event as appropriate. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Ryan Miller.(Attorney Howard E King added to party Ryan Miller(pty:dft))(King, Howard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Ryan Miller served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Will Meyers, Manager at Wallflower Merchandise, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Delgado, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jake Clifford Goss answer now due 2/8/2019; Paul Jason Klein answer now due 2/8/2019; LANY Music, LLC answer now due 2/8/2019; Charles Leslie Priest answer now due 2/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc..(Delgado, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Jake Clifford Goss served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason D. Jones, Agent Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Delgado, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Charles Leslie Priest served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason D. Jones, Agent Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Delgado, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Paul Jason Klein served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason D. Jones, Agent Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Delgado, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant LANY Music, LLC served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Darin Jones, CPA, Authorized to Accept Service of Process, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Delgado, William)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LANY Music, LLC. (jtil)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Samdae Enterprises, Inc.. (Delgado, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc., (Delgado, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc.. (Delgado, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc.. (Delgado, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22932652 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Samdae Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William A Delgado added to party Samdae Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla))(Delgado, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samdae Enterprises, Inc. v. LANY Music, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samdae Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: William A Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Clifford Goss
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANY Music, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Leslie Priest
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Jason Klein
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Miller
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?