Marlene Navarro v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Marlene Navarro
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Case Number: 2:2018cv10640
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marlene Navarro, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certified Mail)(Karlin, Marc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marlene Navarro, upon Defendant United States of America served on 1/10/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Karlin, Marc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS; Declaration of Matthew J. Barragan filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States of America(pty:dft)) (Barragan, Matthew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marlene Navarro. (Karlin, Marc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marlene Navarro. (Karlin, Marc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachment # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, Attachment # 2 Exhibit Notice of Interested Parties and Attachment # 3 Exhibit Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1 Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (et)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22949313 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Marlene Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Exhibit Summons) (Attorney Marc A Karlin added to party Marlene Navarro (pty:bkmov))(Karlin, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlene Navarro v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Navarro
Represented By: Marc A Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?