In Re Rajysan, Inc. dba MMD Equipment, a California Corporation

Appellee: State of New Jersey Department of the Treasury, Taxation Division
Undetermined: Rajysan, Inc.
Appellant: Amarjit Sahani, The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Shaheen Sahani, Rajinder Sahani and Gurpreet Sahani
Case Number: 2:2018cv10666
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellants Amarjit Sahani, Gurpreet Sahani, Rajinder Sahani, Shaheen Sahani. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appellants' Appendix)(Landau, Lewis)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON BANKRUPTCY APPEAL by Judge John F. Walter. The Court orders Appellants fo file their Opening Brief on or before February 11, 2019; Appellees shall file a Response Brief on or before March 4, 2019; and Appellants shall file a Reply Brief on or before March 18, 2019. This matter is set for hearing on April 1, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/13/2019. (iv)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . (iv)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellants Amarjit Sahani, Gurpreet Sahani, Rajinder Sahani, Shaheen Sahani. with Proof of Service Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10667 JLS 2:18-cv-10669 AB 2:18-cv-10688 JGB (Landau, Lewis)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge John F. Walter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/24/2018. (car)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION RE ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE TAX AGENCY ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS WITH LOW NUMBER ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AGAINST INSIDERS FOR SAME PRIMARY RELIEF AND FOR INTERVENTION entered on 12/10/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Deborah J. Saltzman, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/27/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 9:17-bk-11363-DS, Adversary number: 9:18-ap-01048-DS, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellants. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) Modified on 2/7/2019 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Rajysan, Inc. dba MMD Equipment, a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: State of New Jersey Department of the Treasury, Taxation Division
Represented By: Heather Lynn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Rajysan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Amarjit Sahani
Represented By: Lewis Raymond Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Chad V Haes
Represented By: Richard A Marshack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shaheen Sahani
Represented By: Lewis Raymond Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rajinder Sahani
Represented By: Lewis Raymond Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gurpreet Sahani
Represented By: Lewis Raymond Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?