In Re: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.
Appellee: Nancy Hoffman Zamora, U.S. Bank National Association, Antoinette Weed and Sara Yavor
Appellant: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Julio C. Molica, Nancy Cueva, Nancy Amparo Cueva and Julio C Molica
Case Number: 2:2018cv10689
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Appellant Julio C Molica, Pro Se in place and stead of Attorney Daniel J McCarthy of Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP #17 . (jp)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENIED Request for Approval of Substitution of Appellant Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Pro Se in place and stead of attorney Daniel J mcCarthy of Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP #16 . A Corporation cannot represent itself. (jp) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jp).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Nancy Cueva as Pro Se in place and stead of attorney Daniel J mcCarthy of Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP #15 . (jp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Nancy Cueva) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Julio C. Molica) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 3/11/2019. (bp)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY COURT CLERKS WITHDRAWAL OF ERRONEOUS APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE [DOCKET NO. 11] filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 3)(McCarthy, Daniel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form #3 (bp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 [WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #12] APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (bp) Modified on 2/8/2019 (bp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Related Cases filed by Appellants Nancy Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (McCarthy, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellants Nancy Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10742 (McCarthy, Daniel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION filed by Appellants Nancy Cueva, Julio C. Molica. Amendment to Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) #2 (bp)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order DENYING Emergency Motion for Temporary and Permanent Stay Pending Appeal #6 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending appeal of Bankruptcy Court's orders Emergency Motion For Temporary And Permanent Stay Pending Appeal filed by Appellants Nancy Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declarations Of Nancy A. Cueva, Julio C. Molica And Daniel J. McCarthy In Support Of Appellants' Emergency Motion For Temporary And Permanent Stay Pending Appeal, #2 Appellants' Appendix In Support Of Emergency Motion For Temporary And Permanent Stay Pending Appeal, #3 Exhibits 1 to 11 to Appellants' Appendix In Support Of Emergency Motion For Temporary And Permanent Stay Pending Appeal, #4 Exhibits 12 to 35 to Appellants' Appendix In Support Of Emergency Motion For Temporary And Permanent Stay Pending Appeal, #5 (Proposed) Order Staying Orders Of The Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal) (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Certification Of Interested Parties And Statement That There Are No Related Cases CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Appellants Nancy Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., identifying Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Nancy A. Cueva, Julio C. Molica, Nancy Hoffmeier Zamora, Sarah Yavor, Antoinette Weed, Select Portfolio Servicing, Washington Mutual Bank, Barry Cooper, Charles Fox Productions, and John Huynh. (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF Transfer of Appeal to District Court prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/24/2018. (lh)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Authorizing Trustee to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Subject to Short Sale Approval entered on 12/04/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/13/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:16-bk-11387-GM, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-18-1336., filed by Appellants Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Nancy Cueva. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy Hoffman Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: JaVonne M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Antoinette Weed
Represented By: A David Youssefyeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sara Yavor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C. Molica
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Cueva
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Amparo Cueva
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C Molica
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?