Lisa Corson v. Star Jasper et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: Star Jasper, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2018cv10732
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Star Jasper served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephanie Doe - Reception in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Star Jasper. (et)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV11- Statement of Consent) (et)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Doniger, Stephen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22965677 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. Star Jasper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Jasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?