In Re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Matthew Finamore, Florinda Esparza, Clarene Banks, Christine Tamez, Knight Law Plaintiffs, Mark J. Hemza, Joel Hinojosa, anthony alegrete, Alvin Cearley, Kandis Tippett, Ruby Granados, Alice Clark, Teresa Rodriguez, Neal Estes, Taylor Harrell, Teresa Byrd, Jose Gonzalez, CLR Plaintiffs, Terrie Bumpus, Josh Lazette, Sharon Johnson, Soledad Monjarez, Clayton Walley, Michael Floerke, Josie Hollowell, BLF Plaintiffs, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Staci Wyatt, Dolores B. Ramos, Megan Rice, Monica Castro, Ashley Johnson, Ivy Rosenberg, Dora Bell, Julian Santana, Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Cynthia Duran, Raymond Childs, Bill Smith, Mike Reneau, Robert Zebrowski, Caleb Barnes, Zachary Pemberton, Brandy Benavides, Daniel Reyes, Michelle Pope, Felton Burton, Juanita Sanches, Deborah Head, Dawn Utsey, Linda Bourland, Benjamin Ascensio, Victoria A. Pullum, Jacqueline Reader, Alfred Franco, Amanda Sutton, Lynda Spivey, Mutsuko Sako, Carmen Guardado, Consumer Legal Services, P.C. Plaintiffs, Christopher Soldo, Amy Schulte, Skyla Choate, Judith Nagella and Jamie Holcomb
Defendant: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation and Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Petitioner: Mark Fields and Alan Draper
Special Master: Hon. Gary Allen Feess
3Rd Party Defendant: Bennie Fowler, Raj Nair and Robert Fascetti
Not Classified By Court: Daniel Stuart Grago
Case Number: 2:2018ml02814
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 939 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion for Order,, #773 . Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment (Rules 59(e), 60) [Quintero, Yvonne and Salvador v. Ford Motor Company] #937 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Chang, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 938 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 10, 2020 Filing 937 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion for Order,, #773 . Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment (Rules 59(e), 60) [Quintero, Yvonne and Salvador v. Ford Motor Company] filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 10/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Kirnos, Radomir)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation (as to Robert Bagwell. v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. 2:17-cv-06632-AB-FFMx) #899 , the Court hereby Orders that Plaintiffs deadline to file Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses is hereby continued to 45 days from the entry of the order on attorneys' fees, costs and expenses in Pedante v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 2:l7-cv-06656-AB-FFM. Ford Motor Company will have 14 days to oppose Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses. Plaintiff will have 12 days to reply to Ford Motor Company's opposition papers. (gk)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER REGARDING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE FOR HOBART AND ALTAMIRANO-TORRES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that after reviewing the Stipulation #932 , the Court adopts dates in this order for the Hobart (Hobart v. Ford Motor Co., 2:18-cv-01893-AB-FFM) and Altamirano-Torres (Altamirano-Torres v. Ford Motor Co., 2:17-cv-07338-AB-FFM) cases. As to Hobart, Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 4/21/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.; Jury Trial set for 4/27/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. As to Altamirano-Torres Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/19/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.; Jury Trial set for 5/25/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. (gk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Israel Flores to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #923 . (gk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 932 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Trial and Pretrial Schedule filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maclear, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 931 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Court and counsel confer. As discussed in Court and on the record, counsel for Ford shall provide plaintiffs with a breakdown of the settlement offers by no later than 9/18/2020, with a Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020. The parties shall notify the Court, by no later than 10/14/2020, if they would like this matter referred to the Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. A further Status Conference is set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 930 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants for Court Reporter. Court will contact Catherine Schmitz at cschmitz@grsm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hugret, Spencer)
September 3, 2020 Filing 929 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:18-ml-02814 AB(PVCx). (rn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 928 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/21/20, 9:11 A.M re Transcript #927 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2020 Filing 927 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/21/20, 9:11 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2020. (Jui, Chia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 926 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING TIME by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Telephonic Status Conference hearing time is ADVANCED from 10:00 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. on September 4, 2020, before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Ford's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to all of Plaintiff's fraud claims #839 [re Altamirano-Torres, Case No. CV 17-07338 AB (FFMx)]. See document for further details. (gk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 924 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 2, 2020 Filing 923 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Israel Flores to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27904652) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 922 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation re #845 (Chang, Andrew)
August 30, 2020 Filing 921 Notice of Electronic Filing re APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs re: Judgment,, #906 , Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,, #905 , #917 , Designation of Record on Appeal #916 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 909 , Stipulation and Order,, #910 , Status Report #912 , Status Report #920 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #915 , Order on Motion for Hearing,, #911 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #914 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #919 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #918 , Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,, Motion Hearing,,, Status Conference - optional html form,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,, Terminate Hearings,, #913 e-mailed to Earl Underwood bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 28, 2020 Filing 920 STATUS REPORT for Texas Plaintiffs filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 28, 2020 Filing 919 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #918 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 27, 2020 Filing 918 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meehan Rasch counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Meehan Rasch is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law. (Rasch, Meehan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 917 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs re: Judgment,, #906 , Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,, #905 , filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1-A44 - Invoices, #3 Exhibit B) (Hugret, Spencer)
August 25, 2020 Filing 916 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs re #915 (Rosner, Hallen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 915 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Appeal of Judgment,, #906 , Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,, #905 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27774728.) (Rosner, Hallen)
August 24, 2020 Filing 914 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Raymond Paul Boucher counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Adding Raymond P. Boucher as counsel of record for Knight Law Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attorney Raymond Paul Boucher added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Boucher, Raymond)
August 21, 2020 Filing 913 MINUTES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #839 ; STATUS CONFERENCE (Telephonic) held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. As discussed in Court and on the record, counsel shall meet and confer and file a stipulation with new proposed dates for expert discovery, dispositive motions, pretrial filings, the final pretrial conference and motion in limine hearing, and jury trial, by no later than September 4, 2020. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motion under submission. A further Status Conference is set for October 21, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (lom)
August 18, 2020 Filing 912 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE #849 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby SETS a telephonic status conference with counsel for the Texas Plaintiffs and Ford's counsel for Friday September 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to file by August 28, 2020, a Joint Status Conference Statement outlining the exact issues that the parties intend to discuss with the Court at the status conference, and their positions on these issues. If these dates are not convenient the parties may file a stipulation proposing other dates. (lom)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES #901 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby Orders as follows: 1. Plaintiff's deadline to file Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses is hereby continued to forty-five (45) days from the entry of the order on attorneys' fees, costs and expenses in Pedante v. Ford Motor Company, Case No. 2:17-cv-06656-AB-FFM. 2. Ford Motor Company will have fourteen (14) days to oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses. 3. Plaintiff will have twelve (12) days to reply to Ford Motor Company's opposition papers. (lom)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 909 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Status Conference previously scheduled for August 18, 2020 is CONTINUED to August 21, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Ford Motor Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. 839) remains on calendar for this same date and time. Both hearings will be telephonic. The call-in information provided to counsel, via email, remains the same. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2020 Filing 908 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Ford's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims #839 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nassihi, Amir)
August 14, 2020 Filing 907 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 904 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 903 STATUS REPORT REGARDING ADDITIONAL CONSUMER LEGAL SERVICES, P.C. PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED HEREIN filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 906 JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the Court's concurrently-issued Order granting Defendant Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #794 [re Quintero, Case No. CV 18-01912 AB (FFMx)], the Court hereby ENTERS JUDGMENT in favor of Ford Motor Company as follows: Judgment as a matter of law is granted in favor of Ford and against Plaintiffs as to Plaintiffs' breach of express warranty claim, as to the issue of civil penalties under California Civil Code Section 1794(c), and as to Plaintiffs' breach of implied warranty claim under California Civil Code Section 1791.1. (gk)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER GRANTING FORD'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND DENYING AS MOOT FORD'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court are Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ("JMOL") #794 and Motion for a New Trial #795 . The Court GRANTS Ford's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Judgment on Jury Verdict [Quintero, Case No. CV 18-01912 AB (FFMx), Dkt. No. 62] is VACATED. A new separate Judgment will be entered concurrently with this Order. The Court DENIES AS MOOT Ford's Motion for a New Trial. (gk)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLANTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff Mark Pedante's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Case No. CV 17-06656 AB (FFMx), Dkt. No. 70] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is awarded $49,987.01 in attorneys' fees for work performed by Knight Law, and $1,214.49 in costs and expenses, to be paid withing 30 days of the issuance of this Order. Insofar as the Motion seeks an award of fees for work performed by Kiesel Law, it is DENIED. (gk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 901 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses to Forty-Five (45) Days from Entry of the Court's Order on Fees, Costs and Expenses in the Matter of Pedante v. Ford Motor Company [Fort, Sharon v. Ford Motor Company] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 900 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File, #895 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 899 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses to Forty-Five (45) Days from Entry of the Courts Order on Fees, Costs and Expenses in the Matter of Pedante v. Ford Motor Company [Bagwell, Robert v. Ford Motor Company] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 898 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File, #894 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 897 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Earl P Underwood on behalf of Plaintiff Victoria A. Pullum (Attorney Earl P Underwood added to party Victoria A. Pullum(pty:pla))(Underwood, Earl)
August 12, 2020 Filing 895 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses [Fort, Sharon v. Ford Motor Company] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order) (Kirnos, Radomir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 894 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses [Bagwell, Robert v. Ford Motor Company] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order) (Kirnos, Radomir)
August 11, 2020 Filing 893 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Telephonic Status Conference #849 with Request to the Court filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 892 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims #839 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Nassihi, Amir)
August 7, 2020 Filing 891 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims #839 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 7, 2020 Filing 890 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 889 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 888 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 887 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 886 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 885 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 884 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 883 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 882 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 881 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 880 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court ORDERS the parties to promptly file their stipulations of dismissal (Dkt. Nos. 851-864) in the respective individual cases no later than Tuesday August 11, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 7, 2020 Filing 879 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #864 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10471 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 878 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #863 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10463 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 877 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #862 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-09566 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 876 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #861 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10472 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 875 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #860 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10462 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 874 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #859 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10626 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 873 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #858 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. SACV 19-02132 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 872 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #857 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10460 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 871 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #856 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10346 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 870 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #855 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10348 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 869 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #854 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. EDCV 19-02307 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 868 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #853 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10873 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 867 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #852 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. CV 19-10177 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 866 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #851 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation should have also been filed under the Civil Case No. EDCV 19-02453 AB (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 865 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #842 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 6, 2020 Filing 864 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 863 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 862 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 861 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 860 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 859 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 858 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 857 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 856 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 855 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 854 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 853 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 852 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2020 Filing 851 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.(Hugret, Spencer)
August 5, 2020 Filing 849 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Telephonic Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Ascensio, Clarene Banks, Caleb Barnes, Dora Bell, Brandy Benavides, Linda Bourland, Terrie Bumpus, Felton Burton, Teresa Byrd, Monica Castro, Alvin Cearley, Raymond Childs, Alice Clark, Cynthia Duran, Florinda Esparza, Neal Estes, Matthew Finamore, Michael Floerke, Alfred Franco, Jose Gonzalez, Ruby Granados, Taylor Harrell, Deborah Head, Joel Hinojosa, Josie Hollowell, Ashley Johnson, Sharon Johnson, Josh Lazette, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Soledad Monjarez, Zachary Pemberton, Michelle Pope, Dolores B. Ramos, Jacqueline Reader, Mike Reneau, Daniel Reyes, Megan Rice, Teresa Rodriguez, Ivy Rosenberg, Mutsuko Sako, Juanita Sanches, Julian Santana, Bill Smith, Christopher Soldo, Lynda Spivey, Christine Tamez, Kandis Tippett, Dawn Utsey, Clayton Walley, Staci Wyatt, Robert Zebrowski. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Alfred Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Jacqueline Reader(pty:pla), Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Mutsuko Sako(pty:pla), Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Christopher Soldo(pty:pla), Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Lynda Spivey(pty:pla)) (Dalton, Richard)
August 4, 2020 Filing 848 STATUS REPORT Regarding Consumer Legal Services, PC Plaintiffs Identified Herein (Amended) filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 4, 2020 Filing 847 STATUS REPORT Regarding Consumer Legal Services, PC Plaintiffs Identified Herein filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 3, 2020 Filing 850 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55780 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #845 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (gk)
July 31, 2020 Filing 846 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims #839 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 845 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration #827 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27443168.) (Chang, Andrew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 844 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 29, 2020 Filing 843 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Patricia Maclear on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 842 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 28, 2020 Filing 841 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims #839 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The filer set this matter for hearing on 8/21/2020 at 9:00 AM. Judge Birotte hears civil motions on Fridays at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 840 Conditional Transfer Order - 54 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 839 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Fraud Claims filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 8/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Nassihi, Amir)
July 24, 2020 Filing 838 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Allen Winkler counsel for Plaintiffs Amy Schulte, Judith Nagella, Jamie Holcomb, Skyla Choate. Adding Christopher Allen Winkler as counsel of record for Amy Schulte, Judith Nagella, Jamie Holcomb, Skyla Choate for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Amy Schulte, Judith Nagella, Jamie Holcomb, Skyla Choate. (Attorney Christopher Allen Winkler added to party Amy Schulte(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Allen Winkler added to party Judith Nagella(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Allen Winkler added to party Jamie Holcomb(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Allen Winkler added to party Skyla Choate(pty:pla))(Winkler, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #726 filed by CLR Plaintiffs. CCA # 20-55097. The parties' stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties' stipulation. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (gk)
July 19, 2020 Filing 836 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/8/20, 10:12 A.M re Transcript #835 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 19, 2020 Filing 835 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/8/20, 10:12 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (Jui, Chia)
July 15, 2020 Filing 834 JOINT REPORT of Regarding the Efforts to Schedule Mediations with Maureen Summers for the Knight Law Group Cases filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 833 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maclear, Amy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 832 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Molly J Mrowka counsel for Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Molly J. Mrowka is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Mrowka, Molly)
July 8, 2020 Filing 831 MINUTES OF Status Conference and Motion Hearing (Telephonic) held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion or Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Quintero v. Ford CV 18-01912 #794 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for New Trial Regarding Quintero v. Ford CV 18-01912 #795 . For the reasons stated on the record, the parties are ordered to contact Ms. Summers, within 24 hours, to continue the process of mediation. The parties are ordered to file a Status Report, within seven days, as to the status. Counsel Lee and Ford are to meet and confer to determine by 7/29/2020, the opt-out status of cases filed by Mr. Lee's firm, and file a Status Report within five days thereafter. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties in connection with the post-trial motions filed with respect to the Quintero matter, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, takes the motions under submission. A further Status Conference is set for 8/18/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 830 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
July 6, 2020 Filing 829 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David J McGlothlin on behalf of Plaintiff Victoria A. Pullum (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney David J McGlothlin added to party Victoria A. Pullum(pty:pla))(McGlothlin, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 828 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Plaintiff Victoria A. Pullum (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Victoria A. Pullum(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #747 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. (gk)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR OMNIBUS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE REGARDING CERTAIN CLR PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED HEREIN by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Pursuant to the parties Stipulation #823 , the cases identified in this order, including all claims stated herein against all parties, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. See document for further details. (gk)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 825 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Post-trial motions in Yvonne Quintero et al. v. Ford Motor Company, CV 18-01912 AB (FFMx), are set for hearing on 7/8/2020. The Court also hereby SETS a Status Conference for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court will conduct the Status Conference before hearing argument on the Quintero motions. The purpose of the Status Conference is to discuss (1) procedures for compensating Liaison Counsel for common benefit work; and (2) settlement procedures. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 824 Conditional Transfer Order - 52 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 823 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with Prejudice of Certain CLR Plaintiffs Identified Herein filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Frank)
June 29, 2020 Filing 822 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion related) #818 . The following error(s) was/were found: Absent prior written order of the Court, the opposing party shall not file a response to the reply, Local Rule 7-10. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 821 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffsto Status Report #815 , Response, #820 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Ford Motor Companys Conditional Objection And Request For Review Following Clerk Of The Courts Award Of Costs [Dkt. No. 95] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Taft, Stephanie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 820 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffsto Status Report #815 Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Ford Motor Companys Conditional Objection And Request For Review Following Clerk Of The Courts Award Of Costs [Dkt. No. 95] (Taft, Stephanie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 819 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #745 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 818 REPLY (SUR-REPLY) TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for New Trial #795 [QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM)] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Rosner, Hallen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 817 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for New Trial #795 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
June 24, 2020 Filing 816 REPLY in Support of Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #794 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 815 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS CONDITIONAL OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR REVIEW FOLLOWING CLERK OF THE COURTS AWARD OF COSTS filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Maclear, Amy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 814 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement [Fort, Sharon v. Ford Motor Co.] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Mikhov, Steve)
June 22, 2020 Filing 813 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Mikhov, Steve)
June 19, 2020 Filing 812 Conditional Transfer Order - 51 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
June 17, 2020 Filing 811 DECLARATION of Hallen D. Rosner in opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #794 [QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM)] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trial Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trial Transcript Pages 748-749, #3 Exhibit 3 - Trial Exhibit 13)(Rosner, Hallen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 810 Opposition re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law #794 [QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM)] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Rosner, Hallen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 809 DECLARATION of Hallen D. Rosner in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for New Trial #795 [QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM)] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trial Transcript Page 664)(Rosner, Hallen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 808 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for New Trial #795 [QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM)] filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Rosner, Hallen)
June 16, 2020 Filing 807 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF APPROXIMATELY 760 CASES IN MDL filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 15, 2020 Filing 806 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 10, 2020 Filing 805 JOINT REPORT of FORDS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT REPORT ON SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES IN THIS MDL filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 9, 2020 Filing 804 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plantiff Benjamin Ascensio, Clarene Banks, Caleb Barnes, Dora Bell, Brandy Benavides, Linda Bourland, Terrie Bumpus, Felton Burton, Teresa Byrd, Monica Castro, Alvin Cearley, Raymond Childs, Alice Clark, Cynthia Duran, Florinda Esparza, Neal Estes, Matthew Finamore, Michael Floerke, Alfred Franco, Jose Gonzalez, Ruby Granados, Taylor Harrell, Deborah Head, Joel Hinojosa, Josie Hollowell, Ashley Johnson, Sharon Johnson, Josh Lazette, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Soledad Monjarez, Zachary Pemberton, Michelle Pope, Dolores B. Ramos, Jacqueline Reader, Mike Reneau, Daniel Reyes, Megan Rice, Teresa Rodriguez, Ivy Rosenberg, Mutsuko Sako, Juanita Sanches, Julian Santana, Bill Smith, Christopher Soldo, Lynda Spivey, Christine Tamez, Kandis Tippett, Dawn Utsey, Clayton Walley, Staci Wyatt, Robert Zebrowski for Court Reporter. (Duck, Kevin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 803 OBJECTIONS to Status Report, #790 filed by Plaintiffs Carmen Guardado, Amanda Sutton. (Beck, Benjeman)
June 8, 2020 Filing 802 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjeman R Beck counsel for Plaintiff Amanda Sutton. Adding Eleazar D. Kim as counsel of record for Amanda Sutton for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Amanda Sutton. (Attorney Benjeman R Beck added to party Amanda Sutton(pty:pla))(Beck, Benjeman)
June 8, 2020 Filing 801 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjeman R Beck counsel for Plaintiff Carmen Guardado. Adding Eleazar D. Kim as counsel of record for Carmen Menjivar Guardado for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Carmen Menjivar Guardado. (Attorney Benjeman R Beck added to party Carmen Guardado(pty:pla))(Beck, Benjeman)
June 8, 2020 Filing 800 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig Madison Patrick counsel for Plaintiffs Benjamin Ascensio, Clarene Banks, Caleb Barnes, Dora Bell, Brandy Benavides, Linda Bourland, Terrie Bumpus, Felton Burton, Teresa Byrd, Monica Castro, Alvin Cearley, Raymond Childs, Alice Clark, Cynthia Duran, Florinda Esparza, Neal Estes, Matthew Finamore, Michael Floerke, Alfred Franco, Jose Gonzalez, Ruby Granados, Taylor Harrell, Deborah Head, Joel Hinojosa, Josie Hollowell, Ashley Johnson, Sharon Johnson, Josh Lazette, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Soledad Monjarez, Zachary Pemberton, Michelle Pope, Dolores B. Ramos, Jacqueline Reader, Mike Reneau, Daniel Reyes, Megan Rice, Teresa Rodriguez, Ivy Rosenberg, Mutsuko Sako, Juanita Sanches, Julian Santana, Bill Smith, Christopher Soldo, Lynda Spivey, Christine Tamez, Dawn Utsey, Clayton Walley, Staci Wyatt, Robert Zebrowski. Adding Craig Madison Patrick as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Ascensio, et al.. (Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Benjamin Ascensio(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Clarene Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Caleb Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Dora Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Brandy Benavides(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Linda Bourland(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Terrie Bumpus(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Felton Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Teresa Byrd(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Monica Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Alvin Cearley(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Raymond Childs(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Alice Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Cynthia Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Florinda Esparza(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Neal Estes(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Matthew Finamore(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Michael Floerke(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Alfred Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Ruby Granados(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Taylor Harrell(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Deborah Head(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Joel Hinojosa(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Josie Hollowell(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Ashley Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Sharon Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Josh Lazette(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Lloyd Lister, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Jamie Lopez-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Soledad Monjarez(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Zachary Pemberton(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Michelle Pope(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Dolores B. Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Jacqueline Reader(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Mike Reneau(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Daniel Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Megan Rice(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Teresa Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Ivy Rosenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Mutsuko Sako(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Juanita Sanches(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Julian Santana(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Bill Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Christopher Soldo(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Lynda Spivey(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Christine Tamez(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Dawn Utsey(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Clayton Walley(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Staci Wyatt(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Madison Patrick added to party Robert Zebrowski(pty:pla))(Patrick, Craig)
June 8, 2020 Filing 799 OBJECTIONS to Status Report, #790 Objection to Ford's Settlement Procedure Proposal filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Ascensio, Clarene Banks, Caleb Barnes, Dora Bell, Brandy Benavides, Linda Bourland, Terrie Bumpus, Felton Burton, Teresa Byrd, Monica Castro, Alvin Cearley, Raymond Childs, Alice Clark, Cynthia Duran, Florinda Esparza, Neal Estes, Matthew Finamore, Michael Floerke, Alfred Franco, Jose Gonzalez, Ruby Granados, Taylor Harrell, Deborah Head, Joel Hinojosa, Josie Hollowell, Ashley Johnson, Sharon Johnson, Josh Lazette, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Soledad Monjarez, Zachary Pemberton, Michelle Pope, Dolores B. Ramos, Jacqueline Reader, Mike Reneau, Daniel Reyes, Megan Rice, Teresa Rodriguez, Ivy Rosenberg, Mutsuko Sako, Juanita Sanches, Julian Santana, Bill Smith, Christopher Soldo, Lynda Spivey, Christine Tamez, Kandis Tippett, Dawn Utsey, Clayton Walley, Staci Wyatt, Robert Zebrowski. (Dalton, Richard)
June 8, 2020 Filing 798 OBJECTIONS to Status Report, #790 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Stuart Grago. (Korper, Rene)
June 8, 2020 Filing 797 SUPPLEMENT to Status Report, #790 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
June 8, 2020 Filing 796 OBJECTIONS to Status Report, #790 Consumer Legal Services, P.C. Plaintiffs' Objection to Ford's Settlement Procedure Proposal filed by Plaintiff Consumer Legal Services, P.C. Plaintiffs. (Lee, Charles)
June 5, 2020 Filing 795 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for New Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 794 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew Chang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 793 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REPORT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR ADDERESSING FEES IN THIS MDL filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 4, 2020 Filing 792 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. correcting Status Report #791 Re: Proposals For Awarding Fees Incurred on Common Work (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Awarding Common Fees In This MDL)(Taft, Stephanie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 791 STATUS REPORT Re: Proposals For Awarding Fees Incurred On Common Work filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Awarding Common Fees In This MDL)(Taft, Stephanie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 790 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re: Settlement Proposals For MDL Cases filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs Proposal For Settlement Processes, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Intensive Settlement Program)(Taft, Stephanie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 789 STATUS REPORT REGARDING PROPOSAL ADDRESS FEES IN THIS MDL filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maclear, Amy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 788 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/13/20, 10:11 A.M re Transcript #787 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2020 Filing 787 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/13/20, 10:11 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2020. (Jui, Chia)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER REGARDING MOTION SCHEDULE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to parties' Joint Status Report Regarding Motion Schedule #782 , the Court ORDERS the following regarding Hobartv. Ford Motor Co., 2:18-cv-01893-AB-FFM and Altamirano-Torres v. Ford Motor Co., 2: 17-cv-07338-AB-FFM: By 5/29/2020, Plaintiffs counsel shall provide Ford a draft of their proposed amended complaint in Altamirano-Torres. By 6/4/2020, Ford shall respond as to whether or not it will oppose filing of the amended complaint. Dispositive motions in both Hobart and Altamirano-Torres will be filed no later than 9/4/2020. The Final Pretrial Conferences in Hobart and Altamirano-Torres shall be held on 10/21/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Hobart v. FMC, 2:18-cv-01893-AB-FFM will go to Trial on 11/3/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Altamirano-Torres v. Ford Motor Co., 2:17-cv-07338-AB-FFM will go to Trial on 11/17/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. (gk)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IN QUINTERO V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY (2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #781 , The Court adopts the following briefing schedule: (1) Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by 7/10/2020, and notice it for hearing on 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM; (2) Ford's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees shall be filed on 7/31/2020; (3) Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Attorney's Fees shall be filed on 8/14/2020; (4) Ford's Application to Tax Plaintiffs' Costs shall be filed on 7/31/2020; (5) Plaintiffs' Objection to Ford's Application to Tax Plaintiffs' Costs shall be filed on 8/14/2020; (6) Ford's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Ford's Application to Tax Plaintiffs' Costs shall be filed on 8/28/2020; and (7) The Court reminds the parties that cost applications and related filings are presented to the Clerk of Court. See Local Rule 54-2. (gk)
May 27, 2020 Filing 784 Conditional Transfer Order - 49 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
May 26, 2020 Filing 783 Conditional Transfer Order - 40 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
May 26, 2020 Filing 782 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report regarding Motion Schedule (Hobart, Altamirano-Torres) filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 781 STIPULATION for Order re Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees in Quintero v. Ford Motor Company filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hugret, Spencer)
May 22, 2020 Filing 779 RESPONSE filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigationto Statement #776 Ford's Response to Plaintiff's Statement in Fort and Wirth re "Agency" Allegations (Chang, Andrew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 780 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE RE: RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FILED IN PEDANTE, CV 17-06656 AB by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon considering the matters discussed at the 5/13/2020 hearing, the Court hereby notifies the parties that it will not resolve the Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed in the Pedante matter until after the parties further meet and confer on mechanisms for Liaison Counsel to seek payment for common benefit work. Ideally, the parties should include in their discussions common benefit fees already sought in the Pedante motion. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 778 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maclear, Amy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 777 STATEMENT Plaintiffs' and Ford Motor Company's Joint Statement re: Second IDP Trial Picks filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Kirnos, Radomir)
May 15, 2020 Filing 776 STATEMENT in Fort and Wirth Regarding "Agency" Allegations filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Kirnos, Radomir)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 775 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMAND IN STROHMAN, CV 20-01988, AND SUA SPONTE REMANDING CAMARA, CV 20-00258 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff Joseph Strohman's Motion for Remand [filed in Case No. CV 20-01998 AB (FFMx), Docket No. 9] is GRANTED, but his request for fees is denied. The Court REMANDS the Strohman action back to the state court from which it was removed. The Court also SUA SPONTE REMANDS the Camara action [CV 20-00258 AB (FFMx)] back to the state court from which it was removed. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 13, 2020 Filing 774 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Ford Motor Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Fort v. Ford Motor Co.) #745 ; Ford Motor Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Wirth v. Ford Motor Co.) #747 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court and counsel confer regarding the matters raised in the Proposed Agenda. As discussed in Court and on the record, the parties are to meet and confer to select 2 cases, 1 per side, that will go trial on 11/3/2020, and 11/17/2020. They shall notify the Court by 5/15/2020, which 2 cases they've selected, and which trial will go on which date. The parties shall also confer regarding their proposed schedule of dates for motions and file a Joint Status Report and proposed Order by 5/22/2020. The parties shall also meet and confer regarding (1) proposals for settlement processes, and (2) proposals for awarding fees incurred on common work. The Court urges the parties to use their best efforts to agree on these matters. The parties shall file by 6/3/2020 a further Joint Status Report on these matters, along with appropriate proposed Orders to effectuate their proposals. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 773 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT IN QUINTERO et al v. FORD MOTOR COMP ANY, CV 18-01912 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court is Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Modify Proposed Judgment #727 . The Court deems Defendant's Motion to be an Objection, and SUSTAINS it. Defendant objects that Plaintiffs are not entitled to judgment on their breach of the implied warranty claim. The Court agrees. The Court will modify Plaintiff's proposed Judgment to state that Plaintiffs abandoned their implied warranty claim. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 772 Agenda Related to Proposed MDL Status Discussion at May 13 Hearings (Nassihi, Amir)
April 27, 2020 Filing 771 Conditional Transfer Order - 47 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 770 Conditional Transfer Order - 46 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
April 16, 2020 Filing 769 Conditional Transfer Order - 45 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 768 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendants Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hugret, Spencer)
April 13, 2020 Filing 767 Conditional Transfer Order - 44 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #764 , the entire action (Case No. 2:18-cv-08026-AB-FFMx) is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (gk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #763 , the entire action (Case No. 2:18-cv-02478-AB-FFMx) is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (gk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 764 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mikhov, Steve)
April 8, 2020 Filing 763 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mikhov, Steve)
March 27, 2020 Filing 762 Conditional Transfer Order - 43 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
March 23, 2020 Filing 760 Conditional Transfer Order - 42 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. In light of the Court's implementation of its COOP (Continuity of Operations Plan) in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on Defendant's Motions to Compel Arbitraton (Dkt. Nos. 745, 747) to Wednesday May 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2020 Filing 758 Conditional Transfer Order - 41 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (yl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 757 Conditional Transfer Order - 40 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (yl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 756 NOTICE MASTER CASE LIST filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Maclear, Amy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING 1) FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (Fort v. Ford Motor Co.) #745 ; 2) FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (Wirth v. Ford Motor Co.) #747 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing date regarding these motions from March 4, 2020, to April 1, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2020 Filing 754 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #747 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 753 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #745 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
February 24, 2020 Filing 752 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 20-55097, as to PLAINTIFFS CLR Plaintiffs for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact NEIL GIELEGHEM at NG@CLRATTORNEY.COM with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Gieleghem, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 751 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #747 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
February 21, 2020 Filing 750 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #745 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
February 20, 2020 Filing 749 Conditional Transfer Order - 39 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 761 Mail Returned addressed to Gary Allen Feess, Phillips ADR re Minute Order on Motion to Exclude, Motion for Summary Judgment #725 . (gk)
February 14, 2020 Filing 748 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #747 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chang, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 747 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 746 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #745 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 745 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 744 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Bench Trial on Ford's Equitable Defense #727 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 743 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
February 11, 2020 Filing 742 Conditional Transfer Order - 38 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 741 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Bench Trial on Ford's Equitable Defense #727 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Rosner, Hallen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 740 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Arlyn L Escalante counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Adding Arlyn L. Escalante as counsel of record for Yvonne Quintero and Salvador Quintero for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Quintero and Salvador Quintero. (Attorney Arlyn L Escalante added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Escalante, Arlyn)
February 3, 2020 Filing 739 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #733 , Notice of Appearance #732 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 30, 2020 Filing 738 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Mark Pedante Knight Law Plaintiffs, re Notice of Appearance #733 served on January 30, 2020. (Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 737 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Mark Pedante Knight Law Plaintiffs, re Transcript Order Form (G-120), #734 , Transcript Order Form (G-120), #736 , Transcript Order Form (G-120), #735 served on January 30, 2020. (Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 736 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 19-56530, as to Plaintiff Mark Pedante, Knight Law Plaintiffs for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Paula Herndon at pherndon@gmsr.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 735 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 19-56530, as to Plaintiff Mark Pedante, Knight Law Plaintiffs for Court Reporter. Court will contact Paula Herndon at pherndon@gmsr.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 19-56530, as to Plaintiff Mark Pedante Knight Law Plaintiffs for Court Reporter. Court will contact Paula Herndon at pherndon@gmsr.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 733 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Meehan Rasch on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Attorney Meehan Rasch added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Rasch, Meehan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hallen David Rosner on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Attorney Hallen David Rosner added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Rosner, Hallen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 731 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55097 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #726 as to Plaintiffs CLR Plaintiffs. (gk)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. [This document relates only to Case No. CV 18-01912 AB (FFMx)] (gk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 729 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Bench Trial on Ford's Equitable Defense #727 served on January 24, 2020. (Chang, Andrew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 728 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Bench Trial on Ford's Equitable Defense #727 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 727 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modifying Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Bench Trial on Ford's Equitable Defense filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER MODIFYING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SET BENCH TRIAL ON FORDS EQUITABLE DEFENSE, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. CHANG, #3 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. CHANG, #4 Exhibit B TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. CHANG, #5 Exhibit C TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. CHANG, #6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING FORDS MOTION FOR ORDER MODIFYING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SET BENCH TRIAL ON FORDS EQUITABLE DEFENSE) (Chang, Andrew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 726 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiffs CLR Plaintiffs. Appeal of R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,,,, #715 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25188421.) (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the Judgments entered in Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Company, CV-18-04817 AB (FFMx) (Dkt. No. 24) and Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Company, CV-18-04190 AB (FFMx) (Dkt. No. 23) on 12/26/2019, the Court hereby DENIES AS MOOT the following Motions filed in the MDL, ML 18-02814-AB (FFMx), insofar as they relate to the Cannon and Brown cases: Dkt. Nos. #462 , #463 , #465 , #466 , #468 , and #469 . Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 724 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES' TO SET BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #721 , it is hereby ORDERED: (1) Ford's brief objecting to Plaintiffs' proposed form of judgment and seeking resolution of its equitable defense shall be filed by 1/24/2020. (2) Plaintiffs' response to Ford's brief shall be filed by 2/7/2020. (3) Ford's reply brief shall be filed by 2/14/2020. (4) The Court shall set a hearing at its convenience to resolve Ford's objections and, if necessary, to address Ford's equitable defense to Plaintiffs' claims. No judgment shall be entered before resolution of the Parties disputes as briefed. (gk)
January 10, 2020 Filing 722 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment on Jury Verdict re Order,, #720 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment on Jury Verdict)(Kirnos, Radomir)
January 10, 2020 Filing 721 STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule Regarding Proposed Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES' TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #718 , it is hereby ORDERED: (1) That Plaintiffs' deadline to submit a proposed judgment is continued to 1/10/2020; and (2) That, if the parties are unable to stipulate to the form of a proposed judgment by that date, the parties will submit a stipulated briefing and hearing schedule regarding remaining issues by 1/10/2020. (gk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 719 Conditional Transfer Order - 37 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 718 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Judgment Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
December 28, 2019 Filing 717 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/2/19, 10:16 A.M re Transcript #716 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 28, 2019 Filing 716 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/2/19, 10:16 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2020. (Jui, Chia)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court concurs with and accepts the findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendations contained in the Report #549 after having made a de novo determination of the portions to which objections were directed. IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered dismissing with prejudice the following case numbers: BROWN v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4190 AB (FFMx); CANNON v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4817 AB (FFMx); EINBUND v. FORD, 2:18-cv-2901 AB (FFMx); GARZA v. FORD, 2:18-cv-2745 AB (FFMx); HERNANDEZ v. FORD, 2:18-cv-8736 AB (FFMx); HILL v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4409 AB (FFMx); HOLMSTEDT v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4328 AB (FFMx); MOWRER v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4602 AB (FFMx); NICHOLS v. FORD, 2:18-cv-8733 AB (FFMx); PISARKIEWICZ v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4423 AB (FFMx); SNYDER v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4618 AB (FFMx); STRAW v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4425 AB (FFMx); SULLIVAN v. FORD, 2:18-cv-4622 AB (FFMx); VALENCIA v. FORD, 2:18-cv-2865 AB (FFMx); and VANIDESTINE v. FORD, 2:18-cv-2618 AB (FFMx). (gk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 714 Conditional Transfer Order - 35 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 713 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 711 TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED RETAINER AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs.. (Altman, Bryan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 712 Conditional Transfer Order - 34 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 710 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 709 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE of $12,948 Purchase Price of Focus on August 24, 2017 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chang, Andrew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 708 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #2 Exhibit A)(Chang, Andrew)
December 15, 2019 Filing 707 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Brief re Implied Warranty Verdict Form filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 15, 2019 Filing 706 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' Bench Brief to Admit Matthew Garza Video (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Taft, #2 Proposed Order)(Taft, Stephanie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 705 NOTICE Ford's Amended Revised Counter Designations Pursuant to the Court's December 12, 2019 Ruling filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 704 NOTICE Ford's Revised Counter Designations Pursuant to Court's December 12, 2019 Order filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 703 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Designated Portions of Testimony and Amended/Augmented Designation of Deposition Testimony of Ford Witnesses Shawn McClain filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 13, 2019 Filing 702 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
December 11, 2019 Filing 701 Conditional Transfer Order - 32 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 700 Conditional Transfer Order - 33 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 698 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Garza Video filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Chang, Andrew)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Peck to appear on behalf of Knight Law Plaintiffs, designating Steve B. Mikhov as local counsel #677 . (gk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 697 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company regarding Defendant's Trial Exhibits 700-1019 re Exhibit List #690 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Mrowka, Molly)
December 9, 2019 Filing 696 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Motions in Limine #649 , #651 , #652 , #653 , #666 , #654 , #648 , #647 , #650 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. The Court, having conferred with counsel, allots 10 hours of trial time to each side, excluding openings and closings. Opening statements must not exceed 30 minutes per side, and closing arguments must not exceed 40 minutes per side. The Court and counsel confer re Voir Dire questions, Verdict Form and Jury Instructions. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 695 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE IN YVONNE QUINTERO et al. V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiffs Yvonne and Salvador Quintero's ("Plaintiffs") Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #649 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #651 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiffs Did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle #652 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony of Robert Pascarella #653 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Argument That Plaintiffs Are Not Entitled to Damages or That Damages Should be Reduced Because Plaintiffs No Longer Own the Vehicle They Leased #666 is DENIED. Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Other Unrelated Incidents #654 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence and Argument that Ford Does Not Repurchase Vehicles Without A Lawsuit Being Filed #648 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions #647 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics #650 is DENIED. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 694 OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS OF TESTIMONY TO FORDS DEPOSITION DESIGNATION OF WITNESS PIERO AVERSA filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 693 OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS OF TESTIMONY TO FORDS DEPOSITION DESIGNATION OF WITNESS AMY MARENTIC filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 692 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 6, 2019 Filing 691 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument or Implication That Plaintiffs Are Not Entitled to Damages, or That Damages Should Be Reduced, Because They No Longer Own the Leased Vehicle #666 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Chang, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 690 JOINT [PROPOSED] AMENDED Exhibit List [Dkt. 685] filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs.. (Taft, Stephanie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 689 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 6, 2019 Filing 688 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Chang, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 687 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint Annotated set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 686 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint Unannotated set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 685 JOINT [PROPOSED] Exhibit List (Quintero, et al., Case No. 2:18-cv-01912-AB-FFM) filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs.. (Taft, Stephanie)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(B) AND FOR STAY OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL #665 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. (gk)
December 5, 2019 Filing 683 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Mrowka, Molly)
December 5, 2019 Filing 682 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. JOINT SUBMITTAL (Mrowka, Molly)
December 5, 2019 Filing 681 PROPOSED DISPUTED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 5, 2019 Filing 680 STATEMENT Joint Neutral Statement of the Case filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Quintero) (Chang, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 679 Witness List filed by Defendant (Joint Submission) Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Mrowka, Molly)
December 5, 2019 Filing 678 RESPONSE filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigationto EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Entry of Judgment Under FRCP 54(B) and for Stay of Trial Proceedings Pending Appeal #665 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 677 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Peck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24869525) #659 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Mikhov, Steve)
December 4, 2019 Filing 676 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Pro Hac Vice Application filed 12/2/2019 #659 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. (gk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 675 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Incidents #654 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kirnos, Radomir)
December 3, 2019 Filing 674 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions #647 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ford's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions)(Taft, Stephanie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 673 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics #650 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Fords Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics)(Taft, Stephanie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 672 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence and Argument that Ford Does Not Repurchase Vehicles Without a Lawsuit Being Filed #648 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Ford's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence and Argument That Ford Does Not Repurchase Vehicles Without a Lawsuit Being Filed)(Taft, Stephanie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 671 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #649 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Richardson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Chang, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 670 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiffs did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle #652 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew L. Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit A to RJN)(Chang, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 669 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repairs or the Increased Costs of Vehicles as a Result of Implementing Adequate Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #651 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Chang, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 668 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony of Robert Pascarella #653 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Mrowka, Molly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 667 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Peck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24869525) #659 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. NY missing. (lt)
December 3, 2019 Filing 666 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Argument or Implication That Plaintiffs Are Not Entitled to Damages, or That Damages Should Be Reduced, Because They No Longer Own the Leased Vehicle filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
December 2, 2019 Filing 665 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Entry of Judgment Under FRCP 54(B) and for Stay of Trial Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Proposed Order) (Kirnos, Radomir)
December 2, 2019 Filing 664 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Minutes (In Chambers) Order Denying as Moot Daubert Motions as to Yvonne Quintero filed 12/2/2019 #663 . Due to clerical error, clerk has made a duplicate entry to document number 662. (gk)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DAUBERT MOTIONS AS TO YVONNE QUINTERO et al. V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court are Ford's Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of Plaintiff Yvonne and Salvador Quintero's experts Micale [filed under the Master MDL Case No. 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx) as document no. 462], Darrell Blasjo [filed under the Master MDL Case No. 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx) as document no. 463], and Barbara Luna [filed under the Master MDL Case No. 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx) as document no. 464]. Defendant's Daubert motions as to the Quintero matter are DENIED AS MOOT. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DAUBERT MOTIONS AS TO YVONNE QUINTERO et al. V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court are Ford's Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of Plaintiff Yvonne and Salvador Quintero's experts Micale #462 , Darrell Blasjo #463 , and Barbara Luna #464 . Defendant's Daubert motions as to the Quintero matter are DENIED AS MOOT. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #471 . Ford's Motion for Summary Adjudication is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' claims for fraud, and DENIED as to Plaintiffs' claim for civil penalties under the Song-Beverly Act. (gk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 660 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial Daubert Motions #463 ; Ford's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna at Trial #464 ; Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Quintero v. Ford Motor Co. #471 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative rulings prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. The Pretrial Conference for the Yvonne Quintero v. Ford Motor Co. [CV 18-01912-AB (FFMx)] is set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. The Jury Trial date remains set for 12/10/2019 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 659 * STRICKEN * APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Peck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24869525) filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mikhov, Steve) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 12/4/2019 #676 ** Modified on 12/5/2019 (gk).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF MATTHEW GARZA by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the trial proceedings, Plaintiff Mark Pedante's Ex Parte Application For Leave To File Under Seal The Deposition Transcript Of Matthew Garza #607 is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. (gk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the trial proceedings, Defendant Ford Motor Company's Ex Parte Application For An Application For Leave To File Under Seal #591 is DENIED AS MOOT. (gk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 656 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/24/19, 9:55 A.M re Transcript #655 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2019 Filing 655 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/24/19, 9:55 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2020. (Jui, Chia)
November 26, 2019 Filing 654 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Incidents filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 653 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony of Robert Pascarella filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
November 26, 2019 Filing 652 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiffs did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
November 26, 2019 Filing 651 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repairs or the Increased Costs of Vehicles as a Result of Implementing Adequate Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
November 26, 2019 Filing 650 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 649 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
November 26, 2019 Filing 648 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence and Argument that Ford Does Not Repurchase Vehicles Without a Lawsuit Being Filed filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chang, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chang, #7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chang, #8 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 647 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chang, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chang, #5 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, SEPARATE STATEMENT AND EXHIBITS D THROUGH F, H THROUGH GG, LL THROUGH OO, AND QQ TO THE DECLARATION OF RUSSELL HIGGINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal #558 is hereby granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Separate Statement and Exhibits D through F, H through GG, LL through OO and QQ to the Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ford's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment be filed under seal. (gk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 645 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Final Pretrial Conference dates in the Quintero matter #642 and sets the following schedule: Hearing regarding Daubert Motions #462 , #463 , and #464 and Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment #471 remain on calendar for 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. All pretrial filings shall be filed by no later than 12/5/2019 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference is continued to 12/9/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial remains set for 12/10/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 644 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date and Final Pretrial Conference Date #642 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Chang, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 643 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. In light of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and the Final Pretrial Conference Date in Quintero (Dkt. No. 642), a Telephonic Status Conference is set for tomorrow, Thursday, November 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will email counsel the call-in information. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2019 Filing 642 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date and Final Pretrial Conference Date filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephanie Michelle Taft added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla)) (Taft, Stephanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 641 RESPONSE filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigationto Objection to Report and Recommendations, #618 (Underhill, M)
November 15, 2019 Filing 640 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
November 12, 2019 Filing 639 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/8/19 9:59 A.M. re Transcript #638 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2019 Filing 638 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/8/19 9:59 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2020. (ha)
November 11, 2019 Filing 637 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendant and Plaintiff Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint/Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Jury Instructions)(Chang, Andrew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 636 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
November 10, 2019 Filing 635 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial #464 re Quintero, Yvonne filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
November 10, 2019 Filing 634 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to re Yvonne and Salvador Quintero #471 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Underhill, M)
November 10, 2019 Filing 633 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 re Quintero, Yvonne filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
November 10, 2019 Filing 632 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 re Quintero, Yvonne filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 631 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On Thursday November 7, the Court and the parties discussed working on and filing amended jury instructions. The parties represented that they were working on them. The parties should also work on an amended special verdict form. The parties are ORDERED to file their amended proposed jury instructions (agreed and disputed, in the correct format) and an amended proposed special verdict form by 5pm on Monday November 11, 2019. The Court also reminds the parties to email Word versions of these documents to the Courts email address. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2019 Filing 630 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Christopher Martinez at cmartinez@shb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Nassihi, Amir)
November 6, 2019 Filing 629 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff Mark Pedante's Trial Brief re: Ford's Objections to the Recoverability of Items of Incidental and Consequential Damages filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Higgins, Russell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 628 TRIAL BRIEF regarding Recoverability of Certain Categories of Alleged Damages filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #2 Exhibit A to Dec. of Chang, #3 Exhibit B to Dec. of Chang, #4 Exhibit C to Dec. of Chang, #5 Exhibit D to Dec. of Chang, #6 Exhibit E to Dec. of Chang, #7 Exhibit F to Dec. of Chang, #8 Exhibit G to Dec. of Chang, #9 Exhibit H to Dec. of Chang, #10 Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Chang, Andrew)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 627 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. (gk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 626 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits and Related Testimony #623 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Higgins, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 625 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zachary B Powell counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Adding Zachary Powell as counsel of record for Knight Law Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attorney Zachary B Powell added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Powell, Zachary)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DAUBERT MOTIONS AS TO MARK PEDANTE V. FORD MOTOR COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Ford's Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of Plaintiff Mark Pedante's experts Micale #462 , Darrell Blasjo #463 , Barbara Luna #464 , and Miller #467 are DENIED. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 623 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits and Related Testimony filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Ex Parte Application for an Order to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits and Related Testimony, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #4 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
November 2, 2019 Filing 622 STATEMENT Proposed Joint Neutral Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Kirnos, Radomir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 621 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 620 PROPOSED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 619 PROPOSED Competing SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 618 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued), #549 filed by plaintiffs CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen-Michel D. Resnick In Support of CLR Plaintiffs' Response to Report and Recommendation)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 617 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (annotated set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - joint/agreed proposed jury instructions, #2 Exhibit B - disputed jury instructions)(Underhill, M)
November 1, 2019 Filing 616 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Higgins, Russell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 615 Second Amended MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 614 Amended MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Attorney Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Mrowka, Molly)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 613 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE IN PEDANTE v. FORD MOTOR CO., CV 17-06656 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #525 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #524 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 #521 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony, Argument, or Implication that Plaintiff Did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle #522 is DENIED. Ford's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Other Unrelated Incidents #512 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part. Ford's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Spoliated Evidence of Post-Lawsuit Repairs #509 is DENIED. Ford's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions #511 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part. Ford's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics #520 is DENIED. Ford's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses Darryl Blasjo, Steve Miller, Anthony Micale, and Barbara Luna Ph.D. From Testifying At Trial #523 is DENIED. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 612 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 30, 2019 Filing 611 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude Spoliated Evidence of Post-Lawsuit Repairs #509 ; Ford's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions #511 ; Ford's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Other Unrelated Incidents #512 ; Ford's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Reference to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics #520 ; Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiff Misused, Abused or Neglected the Subject Vehicle #521 ; Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiff Did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle #522 ; Ford's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses Darryl Blasjo, Steve Miller, Anthony Micale, and Barbara Luna, Ph.D. from Testifying at Trial #523 ; Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #524 ; Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #525 ; Defendant Ford motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #466 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative rulings prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. The Court, having conferred with counsel, allots 10 hours of trial time to each side, excluding openings and closings. Opening statements must not exceed 30 minutes per side, and closing arguments must not exceed 40 minutes per side. Court and counsel confer regarding the recently filed pretrial documents. As discussed in Court and on the record, counsel shall meet and confer and re-file the pretrial filings by no later than 11/1/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Ford Motor Co. withdraws its Motion to Bifurcate Trial #503 . Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (gk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 610 Plaintiff's [Proposed] Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Mikhov, Steve)
October 29, 2019 Filing 609 AMENDED MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 29, 2019 Filing 608 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Deposition Transcript of Matthew Garza under seal #607 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit O UNREDACTED)(Taft, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 607 APPLICATION to file document Deposition Transcript of Matthew Garza under seal filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Under Seal the Deposition Transcript of Matthew Garza, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit O, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Under Seal the Deposition Transcript of Matthew Garza)(Taft, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 606 REVISED Exhibit List Plaintiff's Revised Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFEDANT FORD MOTOR CO.'S MOTION FORPARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Ford's Motion for Summary Adjudication #470 is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs claims for fraud, and DENIED as to Plaintiffs claim under the Song-Beverly Act and his claim for civil penalties thereunder. See document for details. (smo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 603 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 28, 2019 Filing 602 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Higgins, Russell)
October 28, 2019 Filing 601 OBJECTIONS to Jury Instructions (Proposed), #594 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 28, 2019 Filing 600 OBJECTIONS to Jury Verdict (Proposed), #595 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 28, 2019 Filing 599 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 28, 2019 Filing 598 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs.. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 28, 2019 Filing 597 PROPOSED Exhibit List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 596 STATUS REPORT JOINT Status Report Re: Settlement filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 595 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Ford Motor Company's Proposed Special Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Ford Motor Company's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form and Jury Instructions)(Underhill, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 594 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Ford Motor Company's Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Ford Motor Company's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form)(Underhill, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 593 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 592 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of the Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits under seal #591 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT A UNREDACTED, #2 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT B UNREDACTED, #3 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT C UNREDACTED, #4 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT D UNREDACTED, #5 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT E UNREDACTED, #6 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT F UNREDACTED, #7 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT G UNREDACTED, #8 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT H UNREDACTED, #9 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT I UNREDACTED, #10 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT J UNREDACTED, #11 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT K UNREDACTED, #12 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT L UNREDACTED, #13 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT M UNREDACTED, #14 Unredacted Document EXHIBIT N UNREDACTED)(Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 591 APPLICATION to file document Portions of the Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits under seal filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Ex Parte Application for an Application for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A REDACTED, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B REDACTED, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C REDACTED, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D REDACTED, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E REDACTED, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F REDACTED, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G REDACTED, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H REDACTED, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I REDACTED, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J REDACTED, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K REDACTED, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L REDACTED, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT M REDACTED, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT N REDACTED, #16 Proposed Order)(Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 590 STATEMENT Proposed Joint Neutral Statement of Case filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Kelly, Frank)
October 28, 2019 Filing 589 Witness List filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants.. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 588 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation.. (Kelly, Frank)
October 24, 2019 Filing 604 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial, as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. CV 17-6656 AB (FFMx) #462 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial, as it relates to Pedante #463 ; Ford's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna at Trial, as it relates to Pedante #464 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Steven R. Miller as it relates to Pedante #467 ; Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Pedante #470 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative Order on the motion for summary judgment prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court and counsel confer. Defendant Ford Motor Company WITHDRAWS its Application for Leave to File Motions to Compel Arbitration and Set Briefing Schedules #569 , and the Court DENIES Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial #543 . Within one week from today, Defendant shall notify Plaintiffs which cases they intend to file Motions to Compel Arbitration on. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Motion filing date 2/14/2020; Opposition due 2/21/2020; Reply due 2/26/2020; Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 9:00 AM. The Court continues the Jury Trial in the Mary Cannon matter [Case No. CV 18-04817 AB (FFMx)] to 4/7/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. and continues the Jury Trial in the Christi Brown matter [Case No. CV 18-04190 AB (FFMx)] to 4/28/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. All other pending hearings and filing deadlines for these cases are vacated. Promptly after the sanctions issue is resolved, and depending on the resolution of that issue, the parties must meet and confer and file a Stipulation and Proposed Order proposing new dates for any outstanding hearings and deadlines vacated by this order. To ensure a clear record, the Stipulation shall also indicate for any already-filed motion the docket numbers of any of the papers already filed as to that motion. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
October 24, 2019 Filing 586 DECLARATION of Matthew Fyie in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Separate Statement and Exhibits to the Declaration of Russell Higgins under seal #558 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 24, 2019 Filing 585 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan C Altman counsel for Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Adding Bryan C. Altman as counsel of record for Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Altman, Bryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 584 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan C Altman counsel for Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Adding BRYAN C. ALTMAN as counsel of record for Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attorney Bryan C Altman added to party Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Altman, Bryan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 587 MINUTES OF SCIENCE/TECHNOLOGY HEARING held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court and counsel confer. Counsel inform the court of their stipulation to not have the hearing transcribed. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court approves the stipulation. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (yl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 583 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses Darryl Blasjo, Steve Miller, Anthony Micale, and Barbara Luna Ph.D. From Testifying At Trial #523 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 23, 2019 Filing 582 OPPOSITION Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file File Motions to Compel Arbitration and to Set Briefing Schedules (in Pedante, Quintero, and three other "test" cases pending in this proceeding) #569 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 23, 2019 Filing 581 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Spoliated evidence #509 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 23, 2019 Filing 580 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #525 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Richardson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kelly, Frank)
October 23, 2019 Filing 579 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Other Unrelated Incidents #512 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 23, 2019 Filing 578 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions #511 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 23, 2019 Filing 577 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics #520 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #2 Exhibit A)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 23, 2019 Filing 576 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from November 5, 2019 to December 10, 2019 #543 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John R. Meehan, #2 Exhibit 1)(Underhill, M)
October 23, 2019 Filing 575 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony, Argument, or Implication that Plaintiff Did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle #522 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank P. Kelly, III, #2 Exhibit A)(Kelly, Frank)
October 23, 2019 Filing 574 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Separate Statement and Exhibits to the Declaration of Russell Higgins under seal #558 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 23, 2019 Filing 573 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #524 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Kelly, Frank)
October 23, 2019 Filing 572 FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S PARTIAL opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiff Misused, Abused or Neglected the Subject Vehicle #521 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Thomas, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 571 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin R Duck on behalf of Plaintiffs Alfred Franco, Mutsuko Sako, Christopher Soldo, Jacqueline Reader, Lynda Spivey (Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Alfred Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Mutsuko Sako(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Christopher Soldo(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Jacqueline Reader(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Lynda Spivey(pty:pla))(Duck, Kevin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 570 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate Trial #503 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Kelly, Frank)
October 22, 2019 Filing 569 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file File Motions to Compel Arbitration and to Set Briefing Schedules (in Pedante, Quintero, and three other "test" cases pending in this proceeding) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order) (Chang, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 566 DECLARATION of Stephanie Taft In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from November 5, 2019 to December 10, 2019 #543 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from November 5, 2019 to December 10, 2019 #543 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 564 Notice of Withdrawal of Leave to File Document Under Seal, #498 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 21, 2019 Filing 563 NOTICE of Filing Sealed Documents in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 20, 2019 Filing 562 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment re Mary Cannon #468 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
October 20, 2019 Filing 561 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #466 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
October 20, 2019 Filing 560 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hugret in Support of Ford Motor Company's Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial)(Chang, Andrew)
October 20, 2019 Filing 559 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Separate Statement and Exhibits to the Declaration of Russell Higgins under seal #558 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit D, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit F, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit H, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit I, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit J, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit K, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit M, #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit N, #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit O, #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit P, #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit Q, #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit R, #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit S, #17 Unredacted Document Exhibit T, #18 Unredacted Document Exhibit U, #19 Unredacted Document Exhibit V, #20 Unredacted Document Exhibit W, #21 Unredacted Document Exhibit X, #22 Unredacted Document Exhibit Y, #23 Unredacted Document Exhibit Z, #24 Unredacted Document Exhibit AA, #25 Unredacted Document Exhibit BB, #26 Unredacted Document Exhibit CC, #27 Unredacted Document Exhibit DD, #28 Unredacted Document Exhibit EE, #29 Unredacted Document Exhibit FF, #30 Unredacted Document Exhibit GG, #31 Unredacted Document Exhibit LL, #32 Unredacted Document Exhibit MM, #33 Unredacted Document Exhibit OO, #34 Unredacted Document Exhibit QQ)(Higgins, Russell)
October 19, 2019 Filing 558 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Separate Statement and Exhibits to the Declaration of Russell Higgins under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit D, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit E, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit F, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit H, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit I, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit J, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit K, #10 Redacted Document Exhibit M, #11 Redacted Document Exhibit N, #12 Redacted Document Exhibit O, #13 Redacted Document Exhibit P, #14 Redacted Document Exhibit Q, #15 Redacted Document Exhibit R, #16 Redacted Document Exhibit S, #17 Redacted Document Exhibit T, #18 Redacted Document Exhibit U, #19 Redacted Document Exhibit V, #20 Redacted Document Exhibit W, #21 Redacted Document Exhibit X, #22 Redacted Document Exhibit Y, #23 Redacted Document Exhibit Z, #24 Redacted Document Exhibit AA, #25 Redacted Document Exhibit BB, #26 Redacted Document Exhibit CC, #27 Redacted Document Exhibit DD, #28 Redacted Document Exhibit EE, #29 Redacted Document Exhibit FF, #30 Redacted Document Exhibit GG, #31 Redacted Document Exhibit LL, #32 Redacted Document Exhibit MM, #33 Redacted Document Exhibit OO, #34 Redacted Document Exhibit QQ, #35 Redacted Document Statement of Facts in Opposition)(Higgins, Russell)
October 19, 2019 Filing 557 STATEMENT of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to re Yvonne and Salvador Quintero #471 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 19, 2019 Filing 556 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to re Yvonne and Salvador Quintero #471 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit OO, #41 Exhibit PP, #42 Exhibit QQ)(Higgins, Russell)
October 19, 2019 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 19, 2019 Filing 554 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 19, 2019 Filing 553 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial #464 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFMARY CANNONS APPLICATIONFOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDERSEAL (1) PORTIONS OFPLAINTIFF MARY CANNONSOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTFORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND (2) EXHIBITS A THROUGH ZZ TO THE DECLARATION OF NEIL GIELEGHEM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARY CANNONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #518 APPLICATION to Seal Document (yl)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS B AND D THROUGH GG TO THE DELCARATION OF RUSSELL HIGGINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (yl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 552 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #550 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Higgins, Russell)
October 18, 2019 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2019 (jm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: It is hereby ORDERED Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Plantiff's Statement of Facts In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Ford's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment be filed under seal (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS)granting #546 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Document (yl)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Upon review of the docket, it appears that Plaintiff Pedante has not filed unredacted exhibits in support of his opposition to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment. Nor has the Court received courtesy copies of such documents. If Pedante has filed an unredacted version of these exhibits, he must file a Notice directing the Court to it. If Pedante has not filed an unredacted version, he must do so immediately but no later than 10 am on Monday October 21, 2019, and he must provide courtesy copies by that time. For the record, the Court is able to grant in part Dkt. No. 493 based on the representations of Dkt. No. 539. As of yesterday October 17, Plaintiff has filed 10 docket entries in opposition to the MSJ. It is not entirely clear which are operative. Therefore, Plaintiff must review his filings and by 10am October 21, file a Notice of Withdrawal withdrawing whatever documents, if any, are not operative. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 18, 2019 Filing 547 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #546 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Higgins, Russell)
October 18, 2019 Filing 546 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Higgins, Russell)
October 17, 2019 Filing 549 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE DEFENDANT FORD'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER FRCP 37(D) AND/OR THE COURT'S INHERENT POWERS issued by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: Re MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) #438 : (see attached R&R) (jm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 545 Joint STIPULATION for Order Stipulation of the Parties Re Ford's Ex Party Application to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 544 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On October 11, 2019, Plaintiff Mark Pedante filed a redacted opposition (DKt. No. 510) to Defendant Ford's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 470). It does not appear that Pedante filed an unredacted version of his opposition. If Pedante has filed an unredacted version of his opposition, he must file a Notice directing the Court to it. If Pednate has not filed an unredacted version, he must do so immediately but no later than 3pm on Friday October 18, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2019 Filing 543 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from November 5, 2019 to December 10, 2019 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Micale Report Excerpts, #3 Declaration Kwasniewicz Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Thomas, John)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES IN THE PEDANTE MATTER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The briefing schedule for Motions in Limine only (Dkt. Nos. 509, 511, 512, 520-525), in the Pedante matter is modified as follows: Meet/Confer: October 9, 2019 Exchange/Filing Date: October 15, 2019 (15-page limit), Oppositions Date: October 23, 2019 (15-page limit), Hearing date: October 30, 2019 at 9:00 am (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 541 JOINT REQUEST OF THE PARTIES RE STATUS OF SECOND STIPULATION filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs re: Stipulation for Order #499 (Taft, Stephanie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 540 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #538 (Taft, Stephanie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 539 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to file document Portions of Opposition to MSJ and Exhibits A through ZZ to Gieleghem Decl. under seal #518 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matt Fyie)(Attorney Molly J Mrowka added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Mrowka, Molly)
October 15, 2019 Filing 538 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate Trial #503 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate Trial)(Taft, Stephanie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 537 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 14, 2019 Filing 536 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/26/19, 9:40 A.M re Transcript #535 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 14, 2019 Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/26/19, 9:40 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2020. (Jui, Chia)
October 14, 2019 Filing 534 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Steven R. Miller #467 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
October 14, 2019 Filing 533 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial #464 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attorney Andrew L Chang added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Chang, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 532 REPLY in support of Ford Motor Company's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in Support of Ford's Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial)(Hugret, Spencer)
October 14, 2019 Filing 531 REPLY in support of Ford Motor Company's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 14, 2019 Filing 530 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) #470 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Thomas, John)
October 12, 2019 Filing 529 Amendment to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #524 Amended Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2, to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 12, 2019 Filing 528 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. correcting MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits #524 (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 12, 2019 Filing 527 Amendment to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #525 Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1, to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 12, 2019 Filing 526 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. correcting MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices #525 (Kirnos, Radomir)
October 11, 2019 Filing 525 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Litigation Matters and Counsel's Business Practices filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 11, 2019 Filing 524 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Hypothetical Repair Procedures and the Increased Costs to a Consumer as a Result of Implementing Sufficient Repairs or Bringing Lawsuits filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirnos, Radomir)
October 11, 2019 Filing 523 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses Darryl Blasjo, Steve Miller, Anthony Micale, and Barbara Luna Ph.D. From Testifying At Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #5 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 522 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony, Argument, or Implication that Plaintiff Did Not Make Sufficient Efforts to Ask Defendant to Repurchase or Replace the Subject Vehicle filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #3 Proposed Order)(Higgins, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 521 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony, Argument or Implication that Plaintiff Misused, Abused or Neglected the Subject Vehicle filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #3 Proposed Order)(Higgins, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 520 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude References to Litigation Conduct, and Other Improper Trial Tactics filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nassihi, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nassihi, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Nassihi, #6 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kelly, Frank)
October 11, 2019 Filing 519 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Opposition to MSJ and Exhibits A through ZZ to Gieleghem Decl. under seal #518 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document OPPOSITION TO MSJ (UNREDACTED), #2 Unredacted Document STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT (UNREDACTED), #3 Exhibit EX. A TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #4 Exhibit EX. B TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #5 Exhibit EX. C TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #6 Exhibit EX. D TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #7 Exhibit EX. E TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #8 Exhibit EX. F TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #9 Exhibit EX. G TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #10 Exhibit EX. H TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #11 Exhibit EX. I TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #12 Exhibit EX. J TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #13 Exhibit EX. K TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #14 Exhibit EX. L TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #15 Exhibit EX. M TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #16 Exhibit EX. N TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #17 Exhibit EX. O TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #18 Exhibit EX. P TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #19 Exhibit EX. Q TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #20 Exhibit EX. R TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #21 Exhibit EX. S TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #22 Exhibit EX. T TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #23 Exhibit EX. U TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #24 Exhibit EX. V TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #25 Exhibit EX. W TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #26 Exhibit EX. X TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #27 Exhibit EX. Y TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #28 Exhibit EX. Z TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #29 Exhibit EX. AA TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #30 Exhibit EX. BB TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #31 Exhibit EX. CC TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #32 Exhibit EX. DD TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #33 Exhibit EX. EE TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #34 Exhibit EX. FF TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #35 Exhibit EX. GG TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #36 Exhibit EX. HH TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #37 Exhibit EX. II TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #38 Exhibit EX. JJ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #39 Exhibit EX. KK TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #40 Exhibit EX. LL TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #41 Exhibit EX. MM TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #42 Exhibit EX. NN TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #43 Exhibit EX. OO TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #44 Exhibit EX. PP TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #45 Exhibit EX. QQ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #46 Exhibit EX. RR TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #47 Exhibit EX. SS TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #48 Exhibit EX. TT TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #49 Exhibit EX. UU TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #50 Exhibit EX. VV TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #51 Exhibit EX. WW TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #52 Exhibit EX. XX TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #53 Exhibit EX. YY TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #54 Exhibit EX. ZZ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 518 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Opposition to MSJ and Exhibits A through ZZ to Gieleghem Decl. under seal filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 517 TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment re Mary Cannon #468 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES, #2 Declaration OF NEIL GIELEGHEM, #3 Redacted Document EX. A TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #4 Redacted Document EX. B TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #5 Redacted Document EX. C TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #6 Redacted Document EX. D TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #7 Redacted Document EX. E TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #8 Redacted Document EX. F TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #9 Redacted Document EX. G TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #10 Redacted Document EX. H TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #11 Redacted Document EX. I TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #12 Redacted Document EX. J TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #13 Redacted Document EX. K TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #14 Redacted Document EX. L TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #15 Redacted Document EX. M TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #16 Redacted Document EX. N TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #17 Redacted Document EX. O TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #18 Redacted Document EX. P TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #19 Redacted Document EX. Q TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #20 Redacted Document EX. R TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #21 Redacted Document EX. S TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #22 Redacted Document EX. T TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #23 Redacted Document EX. U TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #24 Redacted Document EX. V TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #25 Redacted Document EX. W TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #26 Redacted Document EX. X TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #27 Redacted Document EX. Y TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #28 Redacted Document EX. Z TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #29 Redacted Document EX. AA TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #30 Redacted Document EX. BB TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #31 Redacted Document EX. CC TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #32 Redacted Document EX. DD TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #33 Redacted Document EX. EE TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #34 Redacted Document EX. FF TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #35 Redacted Document EX. GG TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #36 Redacted Document EX. HH TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #37 Redacted Document EX. II TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #38 Redacted Document EX. JJ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #39 Redacted Document EX. KK TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #40 Redacted Document EX. LL TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #41 Redacted Document EX. MM TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #42 Redacted Document EX. NN TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #43 Redacted Document EX. OO TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #44 Redacted Document EX. PP TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #45 Redacted Document EX. QQ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #46 Redacted Document EX. RR TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #47 Redacted Document EX. SS TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #48 Redacted Document EX. TT TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #49 Redacted Document EX. UU TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #50 Redacted Document EX. VV TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #51 Redacted Document EX. WW TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #52 Redacted Document EX. XX TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #53 Redacted Document EX. YY TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #54 Redacted Document EX. ZZ TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 516 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #504 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
October 11, 2019 Filing 515 TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS, RANDALL BOUNDS OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #466 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF RANDALL BOUNDS ISO OPPOSITION TO DAUBERT MOTION)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 514 TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT ANTHONY G. MICALE FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 513 MARY CANNONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment re Mary Cannon #468 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document PLAINTIFF MARY CANNONS L.R. 56-2 STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT AND ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 512 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Other Unrelated Incidents filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nassihi, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kelly, Frank)
October 11, 2019 Filing 511 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Speculative Lay Opinions filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chang, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chang, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kelly, Frank)
October 11, 2019 Filing 510 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) #470 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Higgins, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 509 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Spoliated evidence filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo ISO Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration Krista Lenart, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Lenart Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit to Lenart Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine)(Thomas, John)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESTRICT, STRIKE, AND SEAL INSUFFICIENTLY REDACTED DOCUMENTS (DOCKET NOS. 488 AND 489-2), AND GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO REFILE CORRECTED VERSIONS OF SAID DOCUMENTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Plaintiff's Motion to Restrict, Strike, Seal Insufficiently Redacted Documents: Docket Nos. 488 and 489-32, and Application for Leave to Refile Corrected Versions of Said Documents #498 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Docket Nos. 488 and 489-32 are sealed and stricken in their entirety, and Plaintiff is granted leave to re-file, AS SOON AS POSSIBLE BUT NOT LATER THAN 10/11/2019, a correctly redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (gk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 506 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) #438 -Notice of Service of Attorney Signatures and Party Verifications- filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Service of Attorney Signatures and Party Verifications)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 508 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS #438 held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Court hears argument. Defendant's motion for sanctions is taken under submission as stated on the record. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: CS 10/08/19. (hr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 505 DECLARATION of Amir Nassihi in Support of Ford's Motion to Bifurcate NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate Trial #503 - Amended filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Nassihi Declaration)(Nassihi, Amir)
October 8, 2019 Filing 504 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nassihi, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nassihi, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Nassihi, Amir)
October 8, 2019 Filing 503 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Trial, #2 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nassihi, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Nassihi, Amir)
October 8, 2019 Filing 502 COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings October 8, 2019 to October 8, 2019 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Court will contact Christopher Martinez at cmartinez@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Sanctions motion hearing. FEE PAID. (Nassihi, Amir)
October 7, 2019 Filing 501 STATEMENT of Defendant's Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Application for an Order to File Under Seal Exhibit B and D through GG to the Declaration of Russell Higgins APPLICATION to file document Exhibits B and D through GG to the Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #493 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Fyie, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
October 7, 2019 Filing 500 Conditional Transfer Order - 31 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 499 Second STIPULATION for Order to Set Pre-Trial Deadlines in the Pedante Matter filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
October 4, 2019 Filing 498 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Proposed Order)(Higgins, Russell)
October 4, 2019 Filing 497 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #488 , Declaration (Motion related),,, #489 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Facts in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Higgins, Russell)
October 4, 2019 Filing 496 JOINT REPORT of Pending Motions filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER RE: FIRST STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND OTHER PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #482 , it is hereby ORDERED: (1) The briefing schedule relating to Ford's "Daubert" motions #466 , Motion for Summary Judgement #468 , and the Final Pre-trial Conference date in the matter of Cannon v. Ford Motor Company, will be set as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition deadline 10/8/2019; Ford's Reply deadline 10/20/2019 (Sunday); Hearing date and Final Pre-trial Conference set on 10/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (2) The briefing schedule relating to Ford's "Daubert" motions, Motion for Summary Judgement #471 , and the Final Pre-trial Conference date in the matter of Quintero v. Ford Motor Company, will be set as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition deadline 10/19/2019 (Saturday); Ford's Reply deadline 11/10/2019 (Sunday); Hearing date and Final Pre-trial Conference set on 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (3) The briefing schedule relating to Ford's "Daubert" motions #465 , Motion for Summary Judgement #469 , and the Final Pre-trial Conference date in the matter of Brown v. Ford Motor Company, will be set as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition deadline 11/25/2019; Ford's Reply deadline 12/11/2019; Hearing date and Final Pre-trial Conference set on 12/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (4) The briefing schedule for Motions in Limine #462 , #463 , #464 , #467 only, in the matter of Pedante v. Ford Motor Company, is as follows: Meet/Confer 10/7/2019; Exchange/Filing Date 10/11/2019; Oppositions date 10/18/2019; Hearing date (already set by Court) on 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The parties are ORDERED to file by Monday October 7, 2019 a Joint Report indicating which already-filed motions pertain to which case(s), and laying out the briefing schedule for each such motion. See document for further details. (gk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 494 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits B and D through GG to the Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #493 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit D, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit F, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit G, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit H, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit I, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit J, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit K, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit L, #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit M, #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit N, #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit O, #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit P, #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit Q, #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit R, #17 Unredacted Document Exhibit S, #18 Unredacted Document Exhibit T, #19 Unredacted Document Exhibit U, #20 Unredacted Document Exhibit V, #21 Unredacted Document Exhibit W, #22 Unredacted Document Exhibit X, #23 Unredacted Document Exhibit Y, #24 Unredacted Document Exhibit Z, #25 Unredacted Document Exhibit AA, #26 Unredacted Document Exhibit BB, #27 Unredacted Document Exhibit CC, #28 Unredacted Document Exhibit DD, #29 Unredacted Document Exhibit EE, #30 Unredacted Document Exhibit FF, #31 Unredacted Document Exhibit GG)(Higgins, Russell)
October 3, 2019 Filing 493 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits B and D through GG to the Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA, #27 Exhibit BB, #28 Exhibit CC, #29 Exhibit DD, #30 Exhibit EE, #31 Exhibit FF, #32 Exhibit GG)(Higgins, Russell)
October 3, 2019 Filing 492 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. correcting Declaration (Motion related),,, #489 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit Y, #5 Exhibit Z)(Higgins, Russell)
October 3, 2019 Filing 491 DECLARATION of of Russell Higgins re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #488 Declaration of Russell Higgins re: Notification to Ford Counsel of April 2019 Repair filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 3, 2019 Filing 490 DECLARATION of of Mark Pedante in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) #470 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
October 2, 2019 Filing 489 * STRICKEN ATTACHMENT 32 * DECLARATION of Russell Higgins in Opposition to Ford Motor Companys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) #470 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Z, #25 Exhibit AA, #26 Exhibit BB, #27 Exhibit CC, #28 Exhibit DD, #29 Exhibit EE, #30 Exhibit FF, #31 Exhibit GG, #32 SEALED ATTACHMENT - Statement of Facts in Opposition)(Higgins, Russell) ** ATTACHMENT 32 SEALED AND STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF 10/9/2019 #507 ** Modified on 10/9/2019 (gk).
October 2, 2019 Filing 488 * STRICKEN * SEALED DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) #470 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell) ** DOCUMENT SEALED AND STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF 10/9/2019 #507 ** Modified on 10/9/2019 (gk).
October 2, 2019 Filing 487 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial #464 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 486 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 485 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Steven R. Miller #467 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 484 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 482 First STIPULATION for Order to Set Briefing Schedules and Other Pre Trial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taft, Stephanie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 483 AMENDED MINUTES OF Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing #481 held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or to Dismiss #441 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial #443 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby DENIES the motions without prejudice, for the reasons stated on the record. The Court ADVANCES the hearing regarding Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 ; Ford's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna at Trial #464 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #465 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #466 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Steven R Miller #467 ; and Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co. #470 to 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court also sets a Pretrial Conference as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co. for this same date and time. The hearing regarding Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Co. #468 ; Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Co. #469 ; and Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Quintero v. Ford Motor Co. #471 is vacated. As discussed in Court and on the record, counsel shall meet and confer to propose new briefing schedules and hearing dates and file a stipulation by no later than 10/4/2019. The Court sets a science/technology hearing date for 10/23/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The parties are limited to 5 Motions in Limine per trial, per side. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 481 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or to Dismiss #441 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial #443 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby DENIES the motions without prejudice, for the reasons stated on the record. The Court ADVANCES the hearing regarding Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G Micale from Testifying at Trial #462 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial #463 ; Ford's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna at Trial #464 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #465 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #466 ; Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Steven R Miller #467 ; and Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co. #470 to 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court also sets a Pretrial Conference as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co. for this same date and time. The hearing regarding Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Co. #468 ; Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Co. #469 ; and Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment as it relates to Quintero v. Ford Motor Co. #471 is vacated. As discussed in Court and on the record, counsel shall meet and confer to propose new briefing schedules and hearing dates and file a stipulation by no later than 10/4/2019. The parties are limited to 5 Motions in Limine per trial, per side. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 480 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re: MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) #438 previously scheduled for 10/01/2019 at 10:00 am has been rescheduled. Motion rescheduled for hearing on 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2019 Filing 479 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffsto Objection, #446 , Notice (Other), #435 Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Ford Motor Companys Objection To Plaintiffs [Proposed] CMO No. 1 Re Appointment of Plaintiffs Steering Committee and Plaintiffs Settlement Counsel (Ramirez, Nicole)
September 24, 2019 Filing 478 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Report filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
September 20, 2019 Filing 477 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answer to First Amended Complaint [unredacted version of FAC Proposed to be filed under seal] (Pedante, Mark v. Ford Motor Company) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Hugret, Spencer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 476 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answer to First Amended Complaint [unredacted version of FAC Proposed to be filed under seal] (Cannon, Mary v. Ford Motor Company) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Hugret, Spencer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 475 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answer to First Amended Complaint [unredacted version of FAC Proposed to be filed under seal] (Brown, Christi v. Ford Motor Company) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Hugret, Spencer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 474 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answer to First Amended Complaint [unredacted version of FAC Proposed to be filed under seal] (Quintero v. Ford Motor Company) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Hugret, Spencer)
September 17, 2019 Filing 473 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) #438 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Kelly, Frank)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF ROBERT BAGWELL'S CLAIM OF LOSS OF INCOME AND LOSS OF EARNING CAPACITY AND WITHDRAWAL OF SUBPOENA TO ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation to strike Plaintiff Robert Bagwell's loss of income and loss of earning capacity claims, and to withdraw subpoena to Acco Engineered Systems, Inc. [filed under CV 17-06632 AB (FFMx), document no. 27] is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff Robert Bagwell's loss of income and loss of earning capacity claims and alleged damages are stricken with prejudice. Upon receipt of this order, Defendant Ford Motor Company is ordered to inform Acco Engineered Systems, Inc. of the withdraw of its Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, served on third-party Acco Engineered Systems, Inc. on 4/18/2019. (gk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 471 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to re Yvonne and Salvador Quintero filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Proposed Order) (Thomas, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 470 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to re Mark Pedante (Partial) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Proposed Order) (Thomas, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 469 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment re Christi Brown filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 468 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment re Mary Cannon filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 467 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Steven R. Miller filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #3 Exhibit 1 to Underhill Dec., #4 Exhibit 2 to Underhill Dec., #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 466 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Underhill Dec., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Underhill Dec., #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 465 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Randall Bounds filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Underhill Dec., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Underhill Dec., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Underhill Dec., #6 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 464 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Ford's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial, #2 Declaration Declaration of Andrew L. Chang In Support of Daubert Motion to exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna At Trial, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ford's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Luna at Trial) (Underhill, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 463 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell Blasjo from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendants Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell W. Blasjo from Testifying at Trial, #2 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Darrell W. Blasjo from Testifying at Trial, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
September 16, 2019 Filing 462 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial, #2 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Anthony G. Micale from Testifying at Trial, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/ Proof of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
September 13, 2019 Filing 461 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial #443 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
September 13, 2019 Filing 460 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 459 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re Jonathan Nichols #441 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Underhill, M)
September 10, 2019 Filing 458 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) #438 Opposition filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen-Michel Resnick ISO CLR Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ford's Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A to Resnick Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Resnick Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Resnick Declaration)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 457 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #456 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial #443 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witness, #2 Exhibit G - Expert Report of Dr. Barbara C. Luna, #3 Exhibit H - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witness, #4 Exhibit I - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witness, #5 Exhibit K - Expert Report of Dr. Barbara C. Luna, #6 Exhibit L - Plaintiffs' Disclosures)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER RE DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Application to File Under Seal #444 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the redacted information in Exhibits E-I and Exhibits K-L to the Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in Support of Ford's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying shall be filed under seal. See document for further details. (gk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 455 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/9/19, 9:30 A.M re Transcript #454 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2019 Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/9/19, 9:30 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (Jui, Chia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 453 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial #443 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Higgins, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court are Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaints #363 , #365 , #367 , #369 . The Motions are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED only as to Plaintiff Pedante's claim for breach of the implied warranty (Count 2) #365 . The Motions are otherwise DENIED. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 451 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re Jonathan Nichols #441 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil Gieleghem ISO Jonathan Nichols's Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Neil Gieleghem, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Neil Gieleghem, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Neil Gieleghem)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 450 Amendment to APPLICATION to file document under seal #444 [Proposed] Order filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Hugret, Spencer)
September 4, 2019 Filing 449 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/13/19 9:59 A.M. re Transcript #448 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2019 Filing 448 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/13/19 9:59 A.M.. Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019. (clo)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL #443 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.This Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the hearing regarding this motion from September 27, 2019 to Thursday, September 26, 2019, at 9:00 AM to be heard at the same time as the Case Management Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2019 Filing 446 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other), #435 Ford Motor Company's Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposed CMO No. 1 Re: Appointment of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Settlement Counsel filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank P. Kelly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Kelly, Frank)
August 30, 2019 Filing 445 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #444 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document, #7 Unredacted Document, #8 Unredacted Document, #9 Unredacted Document, #10 Unredacted Document, #11 Unredacted Document)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 444 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Application to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hugret in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Application to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit E in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #4 Exhibit F in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #5 Exhibit G in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #6 Exhibit H in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #7 Exhibit I in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #8 Exhibit K in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #9 Exhibit L in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #10 Proposed Order)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 443 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hugret in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial, #3 Index of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial, #4 Exhibit A in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #5 Exhibit B in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #6 Exhibit C in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #7 Exhibit D in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #8 Exhibit E in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #9 Exhibit F in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #10 Exhibit G in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #11 Exhibit H in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #12 Exhibit I in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #13 Exhibit J in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #14 Exhibit K in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #15 Exhibit L in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #16 Exhibit M in Support of Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #17 Proposed Order, #18 Certificate of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, OR TO DISMISS (Dkt. No. 441) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing regarding this motion from September 25, 2019 to Thursday, September 26, 2019, at 9:00 AM to be heard at the same time as the Case Management Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 28, 2019 Filing 441 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re Jonathan Nichols filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
August 28, 2019 Filing 440 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Radomir Roger Kirnos counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Adding Radomir R. Kirnos as counsel of record for Knight Law Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attorney Radomir Roger Kirnos added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Kirnos, Radomir)
August 27, 2019 Filing 439 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harry Paul Efstratis counsel for Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Adding H. Paul Efstratis as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Harry Paul Efstratis added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Efstratis, Harry)
August 26, 2019 Filing 438 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Under this Court's Inherent Powers and/or FRCP 37(d) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #3 Declaration of Frank P. Kelly III, #4 Exhibit 1 to Kelly Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Kelly Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Kelly Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Kelly Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Kelly Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Kelly Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Kelly Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Kelly Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Kelly Declaration, #13 Exhibit 10 to Kelly Declaration, #14 Exhibit 11 to Kelly Declaration, #15 Exhibit 12-Part 1 to Kelly Declaration, #16 Exhibit 12-Part 2 to Kelly Declaration, #17 Exhibit 13-Part 1 to Kelly Declaration, #18 Exhibit 13-Part 2 to Kelly Declaration, #19 Exhibit 14 to Kelly Declaration, #20 Exhibit 15 to Kelly Declaration, #21 Exhibit 16 to Kelly Declaration, #22 Exhibit 17 to Kelly Declaration, #23 Exhibit 18 to Kelly Declaration, #24 Exhibit 19 to Kelly Declaration, #25 Exhibit 20 to Kelly Declaration, #26 Exhibit 21 to Kelly Declaration, #27 Exhibit 22 to Kelly Declaration, #28 Exhibit 23 to Kelly Declaration, #29 Exhibit 24 to Kelly Declaration, #30 Exhibit 25 to Kelly Declaration, #31 Exhibit 26 to Kelly Declaration, #32 Exhibit 27 to Kelly Declaration, #33 Exhibit 28 to Kelly Declaration, #34 Exhibit 29 to Kelly Declaration, #35 Exhibit 30 to Kelly Declaration, #36 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Filing 437 NOTICE of Intent to Submit Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed CMO re Appointment of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Plaintiffs' Settlement Counsel filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 20, 2019 Filing 436 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steve Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Mitchell Rosensweig is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Attorney Steve Mikhov added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Mikhov, Steve)
August 20, 2019 Filing 435 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 1: Appointment of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Plaintiffs' Settlement Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 1: Appointment of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Plaintiffs' Settlement Counsel)(Ramirez, Nicole)
August 20, 2019 Filing 434 Notice of Electronic Filing re Audio Recording Form (AO-436), #431 , Stipulation to Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application #432 , MDL - Order #433 e-mailed to mitchr@knightlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient not found by SMTP address lookup' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 432 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition #415 filed by third-parties Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 16, 2019 Filing 433 Conditional Transfer Order - 30 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 431 COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings August 13, 2019 to August 13, 2019 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Court will contact Christopher Martinez at cmartinez@shb.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: August 13, 2019. FEE PAID. (Nassihi, Amir)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SEQUENCE OF TRIALS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court ORDERS that the four IDP trial cases shall be tried in this order: (1) Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co., CV 17-06656 AB (FFMx), 11/5/2019; (2) Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Co., CV 18-04817 AB (FFMx), 11/19/2019; (3) Yvonne Quintero et al. v. Ford Motor Co., CV 18-01912 AB (FFMx), 12/10/2019; (4) Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Co., CV 18-04190 AB (FFMx), 1/7/2020. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 428 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Terry Johnson at tjohnson@grsm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 15, 2019 Filing 427 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 426 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica Mendez at jmendez@kiesel.law with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Taft, Stephanie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 425 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Ford's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as it relates to Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Co. Case No. 2:18-cv-04190 #363 ; Ford's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as it relates to Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Co. Case No. 2:18-cv-04817 #365 ; Ford's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as it relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co. Case No. 2:17-cv-06656 #367 ; Ford's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as it relates to Yvonne Quintero, et al. v. Ford Motor Co. Case No. 2:18-cv-01912 #369 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative rulings prior to the case being called. Court and counsel confer as to the recently filed Joint Status Report. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 9/26/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 1) FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #363 ; 2) FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #365 ; 3) FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #367 ; and 4) FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #369 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the Case Management Conference and Motions to Dismiss hearing time from 10:00 AM to 9:00 AM on Friday, August 9, 2019, before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 7, 2019 Filing 423 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Conference Report) filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: THIRD PARTY BENNIE FOWLER'S EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL #371 , #375 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Fowler's ex parte applications for an order to file under seal (Docket Nos. 371, 375) are denied without prejudice as moot. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 420 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katharine Haldorsen Adams counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Adding Katharine H. Adams as counsel of record for Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attorney Katharine Haldorsen Adams added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Adams, Katharine)
August 6, 2019 Filing 419 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Movants Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Under Seal #400 , Amendment (Motion related), #401 (Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 6, 2019 Filing 418 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibit G to Joint Stipulation - Exhibits to Declaration of Stephanie Taft under seal #417 filed by Movants Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 6, 2019 Filing 417 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibit G to Joint Stipulation - Exhibits to Declaration of Stephanie Taft under seal filed by Movants Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 6, 2019 Filing 416 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Warren E Platt counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Adding Warren E. Platt as counsel of record for Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attorney Warren E Platt added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Platt, Warren)
August 6, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition filed by third-parties Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation, #3 Exhibit B to Joint Stipulation, #4 Exhibit C to Joint Stipulation, #5 Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation, #6 Exhibit E to Joint Stipulation, #7 Exhibit F to Joint Stipulation, #8 Exhibit G to Joint Stipulation (Redacted), #9 Proposed Order)(Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER RE:STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW MOTION BY THIRD PARTY BENNIE FOWLER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING HIS DEPOSITION AND QUASHING SUBPOENA #410 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. It is hereby ORDERED: 1. The Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler Motion for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena #374 is WITHDRAWN; 2. The hearing on the Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler Motion for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena Joint Stipulation set for August 6, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. is VACATED; 3. The Court adopts the following limitations to Mr. Fowler's deposition: (see document for details). (hr)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney J. Tracey Walker, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Parties Raj Nair, Bob Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, and Alan Draper, designating Bethany G. Lukitsch as local counsel #406 . (gk)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Michael W. Stark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Parties Raj Nair, Bob Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, and Alan Draper, designating Bethany G. Lukitsch as local counsel #407 . (gk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 412 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Withdraw Motion by Third Party, etc. #410 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Stipulation - Withdraw Motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 411 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment to Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal #401 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. There was no Sealed Declaration filed with the unredacted documents attached. See Local Civil Rule 79-5 for filing under seal documents and the "Guide to Electronically Filing Under Seal Documents in Civil Cases" on the court's website. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 410 JOINT STIPULATION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Precluding Deposition and Quashing Subpoena Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena #374 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bennie Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 2, 2019 Filing 409 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kamran Benjamin Ahmadian counsel for Third Party Defendants Alan Draper, Bennie Fowler. Adding Kamran B. Ahmadian as counsel of record for Alan Draper; Bennie Fowler for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Third-Party Defendants Alan Draper; Bennie Fowler. (Ahmadian, Kamran)
August 2, 2019 Filing 408 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kamran Benjamin Ahmadian counsel for Third Party Defendants Bennie Fowler, Alan Draper. Adding Bethany G. Lukitsch as counsel of record for Alan Draper; Bennie Fowler for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Third-Party Defendant Alan Draper; Bennie Fowler. (Attorney Kamran Benjamin Ahmadian added to party Alan Draper(pty:3pd))(Ahmadian, Kamran)
July 31, 2019 Filing 407 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael William Stark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Robert Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, Raj Nair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24183618) filed by Third Parties Robert Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmadian, Kamran)
July 31, 2019 Filing 406 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Tracey Walker, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Robert Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, Raj Nair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24183528) filed by Third Parties Robert Fascetti, Bennie Fowler, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kamran Benjamin Ahmadian added to party Bennie Fowler(pty:3pd)) (Ahmadian, Kamran)
July 31, 2019 Filing 405 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint #369 Supplemental Authority filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Underhill, M)
July 31, 2019 Filing 404 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint #367 Supplemental Authority filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Underhill, M)
July 31, 2019 Filing 403 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint #363 Supplemental Authority filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Underhill, M)
July 30, 2019 Filing 402 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST to Compel the Deposition of 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness on Behalf of Ford Motor Company or, in the Alternative, For Evidentiary Sanctions #380 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #2 Declaration of Joan Camagong, #3 Exhibit A to Camagong Declaration, #4 Declaration of Jodi Munn Schebel, #5 Exhibit 1 to Schebel Declaration)(Nassihi, Amir)
July 30, 2019 Filing 401 Amendment to EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Under Seal #400 filed by Third Party Defendants Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Joint Stipulation, #3 Exhibit A-G to Joint Stipulation)(Lukitsch, Bethany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 400 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by third party defendant Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Joint Stipulation, #3 Exhibit A-G to Joint Stipulation) (Lukitsch, Bethany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 399 SUPPLEMENT to REQUEST to Compel the Deposition of 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness on Behalf of Ford Motor Company or, in the Alternative, For Evidentiary Sanctions #380 PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF 30(B)(6) CUSTODIAN WITNESS ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE M. TAFT IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 398 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany Gayle Lukitsch counsel for Third Party Defendants Robert Fascetti, Raj Nair. Adding Kamran B. Ahmadian as counsel of record for Raj Nair and Fascetti for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Third Party Defendant Raj Nair, Robert Fascetti. (Lukitsch, Bethany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 397 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany Gayle Lukitsch counsel for Third Party Defendants Raj Nair, Robert Fascetti. Adding Bethany G. Lukitsch as counsel of record for Raj Nair, Robert Fascetti for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Third Party Defendant Raj Nair, Robert Fascetti. (Attorney Bethany Gayle Lukitsch added to party Raj Nair(pty:3pd), Attorney Bethany Gayle Lukitsch added to party Robert Fascetti(pty:3pd))(Lukitsch, Bethany)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 7/31/2019 TO 8/9/2019 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #391 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference is continued to 8/9/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr., to be held in conjunction with the hearing on Ford Motor Company's Motions to Dismiss in Brown, Cannon, Pedante and Quintero matters. (gk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 395 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint #369 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
July 26, 2019 Filing 394 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint #367 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
July 26, 2019 Filing 393 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint #365 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
July 26, 2019 Filing 392 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint #363 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Underhill, M)
July 26, 2019 Filing 391 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from July 31, 2019 to August 9, 2019 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
July 23, 2019 Filing 390 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Precluding Deposition and Quashing Subpoena Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena #374 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bennie Fowler. (Feeney, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 389 LETTER ROGATORY/LETTER OF REQUEST ISSUED re: London, signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (hr)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR THE ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY/LETTER OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE #377 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court will execute and issue the Letter of Request attached as Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Nicole Ramirez filed in support of Plaintiffs' Application. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ORDER ISSUING LETTER ROGATORY: The Court has received the July 12, 2019 application for an order issuing a letter rogatory/letter of request filed by the plaintiffs ("plaintiffs") in this multidistrict litigation. (Docket No. 377.) The hearing notice noticed for August 13 is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 386 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF MARY CANNON AND CHRISTI BROWN re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint #363 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint #365 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF NEIL GIELEGHEM IN SUPPORT OF CLR PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS OF MARY CANNON AND CHRISTI BROWN, #2 Exhibit A TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #3 Exhibit B TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #4 Exhibit C TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #5 Exhibit D TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #6 Exhibit E TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #7 Exhibit F TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #8 Exhibit G TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #9 Exhibit H TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #10 Exhibit I TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION, #11 Exhibit J TO GIELEGHEM DECLARATION)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 385 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint #367 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint #369 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER GRANTING FORD'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Application to file under seal certain portions of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #368 is HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following portions of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaints be FILED UNDER SEAL: pages 2-3, 5-9, 14-15, 18. [This document relates to Yvonne Quintero v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. CV 18-1912 AB (FFMx)] (gk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING FORD'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Application to file under seal certain portions of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #366 is HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following portions of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaints be FILED UNDER SEAL: pages 2-3, 6-9, 14-15, 18. [This document relates to Mark Pedante v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. CV 17-6656 AB (FFMx)] (gk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER GRANTING FORD'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Application to file under seal certain portions of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #362 is HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following portions of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaints be FILED UNDER SEAL: pages 2-3, 7-10, 13, 21-22. [This document relates to Christi Brown v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. CV 18-4190 AB (FFMx)] (gk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 380 REQUEST to Compel the Deposition of 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness on Behalf of Ford Motor Company or, in the Alternative, For Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Request set for hearing on 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Deposition of 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness, #2 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Deposition of 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness, #3 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret In Support of Joint Stipulation Re: Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Deposition of Custodian of Records [L.R. 37-2], #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 12-17 to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #7 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Compel a 30(B)(6) Custodian Witness on Behalf of Ford Motor Company or, in the Alternative, for Evidentiary Sanctions)(Taft, Stephanie)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING FORD'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Ford") Application to file under seal certain portions of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #364 is HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following portions of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaints be FILED UNDER SEAL: pages 3, 6-7, 9, 16-17. [This document relates to Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Co., Case No. CV 18-4817 AB (FFMx)] (gk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 12, 2019 Filing 377 APPLICATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Judicial Assistance [Resubmitted per Magistrate Judge Mumm's July 5, 2019 Order (Dkt. No. 358)] filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Application set for hearing on 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Ramirez In Support of Plaintiffs Application For An Order For the Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Application For An Order For the Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance) (Ramirez, Nicole)
July 11, 2019 Filing 376 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF to file document under seal #375 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bennie Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Unredacted Documents, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Feeney, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 375 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of, and Certain Portions of, Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 re: Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Corrected Third Party Bennie Fowler's Ex Parte Application for an Order to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of, and Certain Portions of, Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 Re: Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena filed by Third Party Bennie Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Redacted Documents) (Feeney, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 374 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Precluding Deposition and Quashing Subpoena Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena filed by Third Party Bennie Fowler. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted joint Stip and Redacted Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Feeney, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 373 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/11/19 10:07 A.M. re Transcript #372 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2019 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/11/19 10:07 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (ha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 371 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for To File Under Seal Exhibits to teh Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of, and Certain Portions of, Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 Re: Motion by Third Party Bennie Fowler for Protective Order Precluding His Deposition and Quashing Subpoena filed by Third Party Bennie Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Hearing - Redacted Joint Stipulation - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of James P. Feeney, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Sealing Order for Fowler Motion) (Feeney, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Powell Feeney on behalf of Miscellaneous Bennie Fowler (Attorney James Powell Feeney added to party Bennie Fowler(pty:misc))(Feeney, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 369 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 368 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint under seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Document Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Quintero First Amended Complaint)(Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 366 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint under seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Document Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Pedante First Amended Complaint)(Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 365 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 364 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint under seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Document Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Cannon First Amended Complaint)(Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 363 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 362 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint under seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Document Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Brown First Amended Complaint)(Underhill, M)
July 9, 2019 Filing 361 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order, #348 Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Ramirez, Nicole)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #340 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS BE FILED UNDER SEAL: 43-55; 57-69; 75- 103; 114-125; 129-132. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #339 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS BE FILED UNDER SEAL: 43-55; 57-69; 75- 103; 114-125; 129-132. IT IS SO ORDERED. granting #339 (yl)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY/LETTER OF REQUEST #328 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court orders plaintiffs to resubmit the Application and Letter, using the Convention's Model Letter, within seven days of the date hereof. To the extent Ford contends that the resubmitted Application and Letter fail to comply with this order, Ford may file a written opposition thereto within one court day of plaintiffs' filing thereof. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: Upon Stipulation #350 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaints in this matter shall be extended to 7/9/2019. Defendant will reserve an 8/9/2019 hearing date, or such date thereafter as is acceptable to the Court, for any motions challenging sufficiency of the First Amended Complaints, such that Plaintiffs' Oppositions to such motions will be due on 7/19/2019 or an equivalent time period thereafter. (gk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON FORD'S MOTION FOR ORDER AND RE-SETTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR COMMON BENEFIT ORDER TO AUGUST 2 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to Stipulation #349 , it is hereby ORDERED that: In light of the parties' Stipulation indicating that the issues raised by Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Order Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership #249 should be resolved by the Motion Establishing a Common Benefit Order #348 , Dkt. No. 249 is DENIED AS MOOT and the 7/31/2019 hearing on it is VACATED. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion Establishing a Common Benefit Order is RESET to 8/2/2019. All responsive papers are to trail the new date hearing date. (gk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiffs' Application is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following portions of the First Amended Complaints be filed under seal: Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Company, et al., No. 2:18-cv-04817-AB-FFM: Paragraphs: 43-55; 57-69; 75-103; 114-125; 129-132. Christi Brown V. Ford Motor Company, et al., No. 2:18-cv-04190-AB-FFM: Paragraphs: 43-55; 57-69; 75-103; 114-125; 129-132. (gk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Nicole Ramirez in Support of, and Certain Portions of, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Application for an Order for the Issuance of Letters Rogatory/Letter of Request for Judicial Assistance by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Nicole Ramirez in Support of, and Certain Portions of, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Application for an Order for the Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request for Judicial Assistance is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART. (See document for further details.) (sp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 353 REPLY In Support APPLICATION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance #328 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Nicole Ramirez In Support Of Plaintiffs Reply Re Application For An Order For The Issuance Of Letter Rogatory/Letter Of Request For Judicial Assistance)(Ramirez, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Filing 352 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Nicole Ramirez In Support Of, And Certain Portions Of, Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Application For An Order For The Issuance Of Letter Rogatory/Letter Of Request For J #351 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(Ramirez, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Filing 351 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Nicole Ramirez In Support Of, And Certain Portions Of, Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Application For An Order For The Issuance Of Letter Rogatory/Letter Of Request For Judicial Assistance under seal filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For An Order To File Under Seal Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Nicole Ramirez In Support Of, And Certain Portions Of, Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Application For An Order For The Issuance Of Letter Rogatory/Letter Of Request For Judicial Assistance, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 2, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit A)(Ramirez, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Filing 350 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
July 1, 2019 Filing 349 Joint STIPULATION for Order Vacating Hearing on Ford's Motion for Order and Re-setting Plaintiffs' Motion for Common Benefit Order to August 2 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
June 28, 2019 Filing 348 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Establishing a Common Benefit Fund filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul R. Kiesel ISO Motion for an Order Establishing a Common Benefit Fund, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Motion for an Order Establishing a Common Benefit Fund) (Ramirez, Nicole)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying #342 MOTION for Order: Plaintiffs' ex parte application is DENIED. Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate good cause for ex parte relief. To the extent plaintiffs contend that exigent circumstances exist, the Court finds that such circumstances resulted from plaintiffs'conduct. The Court further finds that, given the foregoing, any such "exigent circumstances" do not justify proceeding on an ex parte basis. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 346 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for To Compel The Deposition of 30(b)(6) Custodian Witness On Behalf Of Ford Motor Company Or, In The Alternative, For Evidentiary Sanctions Prohibiting Ford Motor Company From Objecting On Authentication And Business Re #342 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #2 Index of Exhibits to Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #3 Exhibit 1-11, #4 Exhibit 12-16)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 345 STATEMENT of in support of Plaintiffs' APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal #340 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Fyie)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 344 STATEMENT of in support of Plaintiffs' APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal #339 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Fyie)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance #328 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 342 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for To Compel The Deposition of 30(b)(6) Custodian Witness On Behalf Of Ford Motor Company Or, In The Alternative, For Evidentiary Sanctions Prohibiting Ford Motor Company From Objecting On Authentication And Business Record Admissibility Grounds With Respect To Its Documents filed by plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support Thereof, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application) (Taft, Stephanie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 341 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order, #338 , APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal #339 , Notice of Lodging, #336 , APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal #340 , Order on Request to Compel #337 e-mailed to Vikram Subramanian bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2019 Filing 340 APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Application for an Order to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document of First Amended Complaint)(Higgins, Russell)
June 21, 2019 Filing 339 APPLICATION to file document First Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document of First Amended Complaint)(Higgins, Russell)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER SETTING AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. After having reviewed Ford's itemization, the Court finds the fees and costs incurred by Ford to be reasonable and orders Knight to reimburse to Ford $17,284.50 in attorneys' fees and $1,628.83 in costs for a total sum of $18,913.33. Knight is ordered to pay this amount to Ford within 30 days of the date of this order. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS #274 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion with respect to Exhibit 4. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
June 19, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF NICOLE RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT re APPLICATION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance #328 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A - Proposed Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request for Judicial Assistance)(Ramirez, Nicole)
June 18, 2019 Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica Mendez at jmendez@kiesel.law with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Taft, Stephanie)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING AND SETTING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ORDER ISSUING LETTER ROGATORY #328 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. As the matter has been referred to this judge, the hearing notice noticed for July 12 before the Honorable Andr Birotte, Jr. is VACATED. Defendants may file their opposition, if any, on or before June 25, 2019. Plaintiffs may file their reply within seven days after defendants file an opposition. In the event the Court determines that oral argument is necessary, the Court will notify the parties. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 332 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/5/19, 9:43 A.M re Transcript #331 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2019 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/5/19, 9:43 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: CHIA MEI JUI, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2019. (Jui, Chia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 330 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance #328 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application for Issuance of Letter Rogatory should be set before the Magistrate Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 14, 2019 Filing 329 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
June 13, 2019 Filing 328 APPLICATION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory/Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Application set for hearing on 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application For An Order For The Issuance of Letter Rogatory / Letter of Request For Judicial Assistance) (Ramirez, Nicole)
June 13, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney H Grant Law on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney H Grant Law added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Law, H)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: In light of the Court's order modifying the schedule (Dkt. No. 322), Dkt. Nos. 317 and 319 are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED.(cb)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting #324 Motion for Leave to Appear of John Thomas as telephonic for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation: (see attached order) (jm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 324 REQUEST for Leave of Ford Motor Company to Appear for Telephonic Appearance at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Request set for hearing on 6/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Nassihi, Amir)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jong-Ju Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company and Non-Party Mike Khomutin, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #312 . (gk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 322 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders Plaintiffs' amended complaint be filed by 6/21/2019 and sets the following Pre-Trial schedule: Fact Discovery Cut-off (all IDP cases) 7/1/2019. Deadline to file Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) 9/16/2019. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) set on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The next Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 321 DECLARATION of Jodi Munn Schebel re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #320 in Further Support of Ford's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Dates, to Modify Scheduling Order as it Relates to Expert Discovery in the Trial Cases, and to Re-Open Discovery filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
June 4, 2019 Filing 320 Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial Dates to Modify Scheduling Order as it Relates to Expert Discovery in the Trial Cases, and to Reopen Discovery to Allow Fact Discovery to Proceed from 11/05/2019 to 02/2020 #319 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hugret, #2 Declaration of Brittany Wilson, #3 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6)(Nassihi, Amir)
June 3, 2019 Filing 319 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial Dates to Modify Scheduling Order as it Relates to Expert Discovery in the Trial Cases, and to Reopen Discovery to Allow Fact Discovery to Proceed from 11/05/2019 to 02/2020 filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Koncius In Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft In Support Thereof, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application) (Taft, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 318 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jong-Ju Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23847864) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
June 3, 2019 Filing 317 REQUEST for Leave to file Amended Joint Status Report as Alternative to Plaintiffs Filing Ex Parte Application on Scheduling and Continuance Issues filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Request set for hearing on 6/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Nassihi, Amir)
May 31, 2019 Filing 316 RESPONSE filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigationto Supplement #311 (Nassihi, Amir)
May 31, 2019 Filing 315 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jong-Ju Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23831818) #312 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 314 DECLARATION of Christopher Kwasniewicz re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #296 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
May 30, 2019 Filing 312 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jong-Ju Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23831818) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 311 SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 310 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Report filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Nassihi, Amir)
May 28, 2019 Filing 309 ITEMIZATION OF FEES AND COSTS PER ORDER GRANTING IN PART FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P 30(D)(2), 28 U.S.C. 1927, and the Court's Inherent Power #234 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 308 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #305 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 24, 2019 Filing 307 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO KLG PLANITIFFS' FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY #302 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell Higgins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Higgins, Russell)
May 24, 2019 Filing 306 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.S EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO KLG PLAINTIFFS FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Higgins, Russell)
May 24, 2019 Filing 305 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski on behalf of Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FORD'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO KLG PLAINTIFFS' FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY #302 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The depositions are hereby STAYED. The parties are Ordered to appear on May 28, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 580 of the Roybal Courthouse for a hearing regarding the Ex Parte Application. The KLG Plaintiffs shall file their opposition, if any, to the Ex Parte Application no later than midnight, May 24, 2019. (hr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO KLG PLANITIFFS' FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY #302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Hugret, Spencer)
May 23, 2019 Filing 302 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO KLG PLANITIFFS' FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY filed by Defense Liaison Counsel Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SPENCER HUGRET IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION, #2 Exhibit INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION RE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE RE PLAINTIFFS' FIFTEEN (15) DEPOSITION NOTICES, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7-A, #12 Exhibit 7-B, #13 Exhibit 7-C, #14 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER) (Hugret, Spencer)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Ford seeks judgment on the pleadings against Canon and Brown #161 , represented by the Consumer Law Group ("CLR"), and against Pedante #162 and Quintero #163 , represented by the Knight Law Group ("KLG"). The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings are: (1) GRANTED as to the Warranty Claims asserted in Brown, Cannon, and Quintero. (2) GRANTED as to the Fraudulent Misrepresentation Claims based on Ford's Alleged Performance Misrepresentations, asserted in all 4 cases. (3) GRANTED as to the Fraudulent Omission Claims, asserted in all 4 cases. (4) DENIED as to the Warranty Claims asserted in Pedante. (5) DENIED as to the Fraudulent Misrepresentation Claims Based on Ford's "Automatic Transmission" Representation, asserted in all 4 cases. Plaintiffs have 21 days from the issuance of this order to file their First Amended Complaints. Any Complaints or claims not amended by that date will be deemed dismissed with prejudice. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER DENYING CLR PLAINTIFFS MARY CANNON & CHRISTI BROWN'S JOINT APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5.2.2(b) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby DENIES the Application to File Under Seal #179 . The materials are not relevant to the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings so the Court will not consider them. The Application is therefore MOOT. The Declaration (Dkt. No. 180) shall remain under seal. (gk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 299 EXHIBIT 1-3 to REQUEST to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents #274 (Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 298 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation) re REQUEST to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents #274 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #296 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs.(Taft, Stephanie)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON FORD'S MOTION FOR ORDER CLARIFYING THE ROLE OF APPOINTED PLAINTIFF LEADERSHIP FROM 6/5/2019 TO 7/31/2019 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #294 , it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Order Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership #249 will be continued to 7/31/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. All responsive pleadings are to trail the new date of 7/31/2019. The Case Management Conference remains on calendar for 6/5/2019 at 9:30 AM. (gk)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DIRECTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING WITH RESPECT TO, PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE M. TAFT IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS [L.R. 37-2] #275 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application is HEREBY GRANTED AS TO EXHIBIT 5. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application is HEREBY DENIED AS TO redacted EXHIBITs 1, 2, and 3. To the extent that Ford Motor Company contends that Exhibits 4, 6, and 7, or any portion of any of them, contains information that may be entitled to an order precluding public access, it may file a declaration within 10 days of the date hereof that justifies such treatment. (see document for further details) (hr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING THAT ALL THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY-RELATED MOTIONS BE FILED IN THIS COURT REGARDLESS OF THE JURISDICTION WHERE THE DISCOVERY IS SOUGHT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application #278 is DENIED. Plaintiffs have not established the need for an MDL-wide order to be entered on an ex parte basis. Furthermore, it is not apparent from the papers that this Court can require a Motion to Quash already filed in another district to be litigated in this district instead. See document for further details. (gk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 294 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Ford's Motion for Order Clarifying Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership from June 5, 2019 to July 24, 2019 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
May 15, 2019 Filing 293 CLR Plaintiffs Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #249 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. McNellie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #286 . (gk)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeremiah J. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #285 . (gk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 290 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Michael G. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark Fields, designating Brent S. Colasurdo as local counsel #281 . (gk)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #277 . (gk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 287 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael G. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Mark Fields (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23727265) #281 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 286 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. McNellie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733201) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
May 14, 2019 Filing 285 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeremiah J. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23733126) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING IN PART FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL #234 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court VACATES the hearing set for May 14, 2019 and decides the motion based on the documents filed. Plaintiff's deposition shall resume at a time and place convenient to the parties, but no later than 30 days from the date of this order. The Knight Law Group, LLP is ordered to reimburse defendant for the attorneys' fees, transportation fees, and court reporter fees it incurred in connection with the February 13, 2019 deposition and the attorneys' fees incurred in the preparation of the instant motion and the documents supporting the instant motion. Defendant's counsel is directed to file an itemization of the foregoing fees within 15 days. (see document for further details) (hr)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST CERTAIN CLR PLAINTIFFS #279 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Pursuant to Stipulation, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED: The following party witnesses will present themselves for deposition at the times and locations set forth below. Absent good cause, failure to appear for deposition at the times and locations set forth below shall result in the granting of the motion for sanctions for that Plaintiff's case, unless stipulated by the parties in writing otherwise. Ford's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against Certain CLR Plaintiffs #235 (the "Motion") is hereby withdrawn and the May 14, 2019 hearing date on the Motion is vacated. (see document for further details) (hr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 282 Non-Party Mark Fields' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Requiring that all Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions be Filed in this Court Regardless of the Jurisdiction Where the Discovery is Sought Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Requiring That All Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions Be Filed In This Court Regardless Of The Jurisdiction Where The Discovery Is Sought #278 filed by Miscellaneous Mark Fields. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Brady, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Colasurdo, Brent)
May 13, 2019 Filing 281 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael G. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Mark Fields (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23727265) filed by Non-Party Mark Fields. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Brent Scott Colasurdo added to party Mark Fields(pty:misc)) (Colasurdo, Brent)
May 13, 2019 Filing 280 REPLY in response to Plaintiffs EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Requiring That All Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions Be Filed In This Court Regardless Of The Jurisdiction Where The Discovery Is Sought #278 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
May 12, 2019 Filing 279 JOINT STIPULATION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Certain CLR Plaintiffs #235 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST CERTAIN CLR PLAINTIFFS)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 278 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Requiring That All Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions Be Filed In This Court Regardless Of The Jurisdiction Where The Discovery Is Sought filed by Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Stephanie M. Taft In Support Of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For An Order Requiring That All Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions Be Filed In This Court Regardless Of The Jurisdiction Where The Discovery Is Sought, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For An Order Requiring That All Third-Party Discovery-Related Motions Be Filed In This Court Regardless Of The Jurisdiction Where The Discovery Is Sought) (Taft, Stephanie)
May 10, 2019 Filing 277 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23717584) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
May 9, 2019 Filing 276 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-7 to Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents under seal #275 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibits 1-7, #2 Certificate of Service)(Taft, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 275 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-7 to Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibits 1-7 to the Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents)(Taft, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 274 REQUEST to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Request set for hearing on 6/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents, #2 Redacted Document Declaration of Stephanie M. Taft in Support of Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents, #3 Declaration of Amy Maclear in Support of Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents, #4 Declaration of Jodi Munn Schebel in Support of Joint Stipulation re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents, #5 Proposed Order)(Taft, Stephanie)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER AWARDING PLAINTIFFS THEIR FEES AND COSTS COSTS UPON REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 4/16/2019, the Court granted motions for remand filed in Tracy Matthews aka Tracy Matthew v. Ford Motor Company, et al., 2:19-cv-01046-AB-FFM; David B. Picton v. Ford Motor Company, 2:19-cv-01047-AB-FFM; and Wilbur Earl Hightower, Jr., et al., v. Ford Motor Company, et al., 2:19-cv-01048-AB-FFM, and ordered that Plaintiffs shall be awarded their fees and costs associated with their motions for remand #258 . It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded their attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $1,625.00, each, for a total of $4,875.00. Attorneys' fees and costs shall be paid to Kiesel Law LLP. (gk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brittany Bolton Wilson on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Brittany Bolton Wilson added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Wilson, Brittany)
May 7, 2019 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samantha K N Burnett on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Samantha K N Burnett added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Burnett, Samantha)
April 30, 2019 Filing 270 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P 30(D)(2), 28 U.S.C. 1927, and the Court's Inherent Power #234 filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret in support of Reply, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON FORD'S MOTION FOR ORDER CLARIFYING THE ROLE OF APPOINTED PLAINTIFF LEADERSHIP FROM 5/1/2019 TO 6/5/2019 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #261 , it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership #249 will be continued to 6/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. All related pleadings are to trail the new date of 6/5/2019. The Case Management Conference is also continued to 6/5/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. A Joint Status Report must be filed by 5/29/2019. (gk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 268 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anh X Nguyen counsel for Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez. Anh X. Nguyen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Anh X. Nguyen. (Nguyen, Anh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 267 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P 30(D)(2), 28 U.S.C. 1927, and the Court's Inherent Power #234 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Rosensweig, Mitchell)
April 23, 2019 Filing 266 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/12/19, 9:18 A.M. re Transcript #265 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 23, 2019 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/12/19, 9:18 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (Jui, Chia)
April 22, 2019 Filing 264 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Attorneys' Fees Resulting from Removal re Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,,,,,,, #258 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taft, Stephanie)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #259 Non-Resident Attorney Thomas D. Isaacs APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel. (yl)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #260 Non-Resident Attorney Jodi M. Schebel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel. (yl)
April 19, 2019 Filing 261 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Ford's Motion for Order Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership from May 1, 2019 to June 5, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #249 filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Paul R Kiesel added to party Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Kiesel, Paul)
April 17, 2019 Filing 260 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jodi M. Schebel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23565105) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
April 17, 2019 Filing 259 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas D. Isaacs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23565040) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Motions to Remand are GRANTED. The following cases are REMANDED to the state courts from which they were removed: (1) Tracy Matthews v. Ford Motor Company, CV 19-01046 AB (FFMx) #197 ; (2) David B. Picton v. Ford Motor Company, CV 19-01047 AB (FFMx) #196 ; (3) Wilbur Earl Hightower, Jr. et al v. Ford Motor Company, CV 19-01048 AB (FFMx) #195 . Plaintiffs are awarded their attorneys' fees incurred in connection with the Motions for Remand. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: After consideration of the parties' responses and oral argument on 4/12/2019, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the 3/5/2019 order to show cause why Bradley Smith v. Ford Motor Corp., 19-01246 AB (FFMx), should not be removed from the MDL #210 . Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 256 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #162 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #163 Supplemental Authorities ISO Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Nassihi, Amir)
April 15, 2019 Filing 255 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 254 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal as it relates to Wilbur Earl Hightower, Jr., et al., v.Ford Motor Company, et al., 2:18-cv-01048-AB-FFM #195 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal as it relates to David B. Picton v. Ford Motor Company, 2:19-cv-01047-AB-FFM #196 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal as it relates to Tracy Matthews aka Tracy Matthew v. Ford Motor Company, et al.,2:19-cv-01046-AB-FFM #197 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative rulings prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court and counsel confer. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 5/1/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing time is advanced on the Motion for Order Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership #249 to 5/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 253 to Ford's Motion for Order re Clarification of Plaintiffs Leadership Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #249 Objection and Initial Opposition filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Gieleghem, John)
April 10, 2019 Filing 252 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #249 filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Ramirez, Nicole)
April 10, 2019 Filing 251 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) RULING ON CLR PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying #241 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File: The Court notes that it previously, sua sponte, continued the hearing on Docket Entries 234 and 235 to May 14, 2019, in Courtroom 580 of the Temple Street Courthouse (Docket Entry 250). Given the foregoing, the CLR Plaintiffs' ex parte application is DENIED. (jm)
April 10, 2019 Filing 250 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Certain CLR Plaintiffs #235 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P 30(D)(2), 28 U.S.C. 1927, and the Court's Inherent Power #234 previously scheduled for 05/01/2019 10:00 am have been rescheduled. Motions now rescheduled for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 10, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joan R. Camagong, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed Order) (Camagong, Joan)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND AWARD OF COSTS AND EXPENSES RESULTING FROM REMOVAL (DKT. NOS. [195-197]) HEARING TIME by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the Case Management Conference and Motions hearing time from 1:30 PM to 9:00 AM on Friday, April 12, 2019 before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER SEALING INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT: DOCKET NO. 236-5 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court is Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Docket No. 236-5 #239 . The Court cannot remove filings from the docket. However, in light of the confidential material inadvertently filed, the Court ORDERS that Dkt. No. 236. Motion to Clarify Role of Plaintiff's Leadership, in its entirety is hereby SEALED AND STRICKEN. Defendant may re-file the motion to clarify as appropriate. (gk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 246 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Taft, Stephanie)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER APPOINTING THE HONORABLE GARY ALLEN FEESS AS SETTLEMENT MASTER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Judge Feess is appointed, and shall serve, as the settlement master for these proceedings to facilitate settlement discussions among all parties to this multidistrict litigation as soon as is feasible. The mediating Plaintiff(s) and Defendant shall jointly share and compensate Judge Feess and any personnel working under his direction at their normal and customary hourly rates. Judge Feess may incur necessary expenses and costs at reasonable amounts to permit him to fully facilitate settlement of these coordinated actions, and the mediating parties shall jointly reimburse him for such costs and expenses. See document for further details. (gk)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED SCHEDULE FOR IDP TRIAL CASES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #238 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following Pre-Trial Schedule is adopted by the Court for the IDP trial cases: Fact Discovery cut-off 5/29/2019. Deadline to file Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) 9/4/2019. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) 10/25/2019. See document for further details. (gk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 243 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File OPPOSITIONS TO FORD'S MAY 1, 2019 MOTIONS #241 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
April 8, 2019 Filing 242 Conditional Transfer Order - 28 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
April 5, 2019 Filing 241 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File OPPOSITIONS TO FORD'S MAY 1, 2019 MOTIONS filed by CLR PLAINTIFFS CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration GIELEGHEM DECLARATION RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY/CONTINUE FORD MAY 1, 2019 MOTIONS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Proposed Order PROPOPOSED ORDER) (Gieleghem, John)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND AWARD OF COSTS AND EXPENSES RESULTING FROM REMOVAL (DKT. NOS. [195-197]) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the Case Management Conference and Motions hearing from April 8, 2019 to Friday, April 12, 2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2019 Filing 239 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #236 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Camagong, Joan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 238 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Schedule for IDP Trial Cases filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
April 3, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support #236 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 5)(Camagong, Joan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarifying the Role of Appointed Plaintiff Leadership and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joan R. Camagong, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed Order) (Camagong, Joan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Certain CLR Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John M. Thomas, #3 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 4A, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 16A, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Proposed Order) (Nassihi, Amir)
April 3, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P 30(D)(2), 28 U.S.C. 1927, and the Court's Inherent Power filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate/ Proof of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
April 2, 2019 Filing 233 Conditional Transfer Order - 27 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 232 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority ISO Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nassihi, Amir)
March 26, 2019 Filing 231 NOTICE filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Appointing The Honorable Gary Allen Feess as Settlement Master (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hugret, Spencer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steve Vieux on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Steve Vieux added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Vieux, Steve)
March 18, 2019 Filing 229 REPLY OPPOSITION TO FORD RESPONSE TO OSC RE REMOVAL OF CASE FROM MDL 2814 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G)(Gieleghem, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Fred J. Fresard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P. Hugret as local counsel #224 . (gk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/6/19, 9:07 A.M. re Transcript #225 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2019 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/6/19, 9:07 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (Jui, Chia)
March 12, 2019 Filing 224 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Fred J. Fresard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23360347) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
March 11, 2019 Filing 223 Conditional Transfer Order - 26 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 222 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #196 Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rosensweig, Mitchell)
March 8, 2019 Filing 221 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #197 Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rosensweig, Mitchell)
March 8, 2019 Filing 220 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #195 Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rosensweig, Mitchell)
March 8, 2019 Filing 219 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Fred J. Fresard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23334874) #215 by Clerk. The document is stricken. (lom)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #216 Non-Resident Attorney Paul F. Malek APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Company, designating Spencer P Hugret as local counsel. (lom)
March 7, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Fred J. Fresard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23334874) #215 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
March 7, 2019 Filing 216 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul F. Malek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23334932) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
March 7, 2019 Filing 215 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 219 - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Fred J. Fresard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23334874) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer) Modified on 3/8/2019 (lom).
March 6, 2019 Filing 214 MINUTES OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; 1) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Cannon v. Ford Motor CV 18-4817-AB and Brown v. Ford Motor CV 18-04190-AB #161 ; 2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleading as to Pedante v. Ford Motor CV 17-06656-AB #162 ; 3) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Quintero v. Ford Motor CV 18-01912-AB #163 before Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 4/8/2019 at 1:30 PM. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court continues the hearing regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal (Dkt. Nos. #195 , #196 , #197 ) from 3/22/2019 to this same date and time. Counsel shall meet and confer and file a stipulation with proposed dates as discussed in Court and on the record. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (jp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 213 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anh X Nguyen counsel for Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez. Adding Anh X. Nguyen as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Anh X. Nguyen. (Attorney Anh X Nguyen added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Nguyen, Anh)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #201 Non-Resident Attorney Mary Quinn Cooper APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation, designating Spencer Peter Hugret as local counsel. (lom)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #200 Non-Resident Attorney Gregory L Schuck APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation, designating Spencer Peter Hugret as local counsel. (lom)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE NO. CV 19-01246 (BRADLEY SMITH) SHOULD NOT BE REMOVED FROM THE MDL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff Bradley Smith's (Plaintiff) objection to the inclusion of his case in the In Re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation MDL. Briefly, Plaintiff contends that his case concerns alleged defects in a 2018 Ford Fiesta, a vehicle model from a year that is not included in the MDL, which was established to adjudicate actions involving model year 2011-2016 Ford Fiestas. Defendant is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be removed from the MDL. Defendant must file a Response to this OSC no later than March 11, 2019, and Plaintiff may file a Reply no later than March 18, 2019. (lom)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING HEARING TIME by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This Court, on its own motion, hereby advances the Case Management Conference and Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. Nos. #161 , #162 and #163 ) hearing time from 9:30 AM to 8:30 AM on Wednesday, March 6, 2019 before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2019 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joan R Camagong on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Joan R Camagong added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Camagong, Joan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 207 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie Michelle Taft counsel for Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Adding Stephanie Taft as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attorney Stephanie Michelle Taft added to party Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Taft, Stephanie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #197 re Matthews filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Underhill, M)
March 1, 2019 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #196 re Picton filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Underhill, M)
March 1, 2019 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento #195 re Hightower filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Kevin Underhill, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Attorney M Kevin Underhill added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Underhill, M)
February 28, 2019 Filing 203 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory L. Schuck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23285939) #200 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mary Quinn Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23287207) #201 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 202 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hugret, Spencer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 201 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mary Quinn Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23287207) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 200 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory L. Schuck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23285939) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
February 26, 2019 Filing 199 CLR PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NON-CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORDS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 Opposition filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Resnick ISO the CLR Plaintiffs Notice Of Filing Non-Confidential Exhibits ISO Opposition To Defendant Fords Motions For Judgment On The Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 26, #17 Exhibit 27, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 33, #20 Exhibit 34, #21 Exhibit 37, #22 Exhibit 38, #23 Exhibit 39, #24 Exhibit 40, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 49, #29 Exhibit 50, #30 Exhibit 51, #31 Exhibit 53, #32 Exhibit 55, #33 Exhibit 56, #34 Exhibit 57, #35 Exhibit 59, #36 Exhibit 60, #37 Exhibit 61, #38 Exhibit 62, #39 Exhibit 66, #40 Exhibit 68, #41 Exhibit 71, #42 Exhibit 72, #43 Exhibit A)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 PT. 1, #5 Exhibit 3 PT. 2, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Rosensweig, Mitchell)
February 22, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Rosensweig, Mitchell)
February 22, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Rosensweig, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Attorney Mitchell Rosensweig added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla)) (Rosensweig, Mitchell)
February 19, 2019 Filing 194 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary M. Toole to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 2/19/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23234518) filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hugret, Spencer)
February 15, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 192 Conditional Transfer Order - 25 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/12/18, 8:39 A.M., 1/23/19, 9:41 A.M. re Transcript #190 , #189 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 4, 2019 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/23/19, 9:41 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (Jui, Chia)
February 4, 2019 Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/12/18, 8:39 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (Jui, Chia)
January 31, 2019 Filing 188 REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(c) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
January 31, 2019 Filing 187 REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(c) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #163 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
January 31, 2019 Filing 186 REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(c) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #162 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 185 DECLARATION of Matthew Fyie filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Thomas, John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 184 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits 1-73 to Opposition to Ford Motor Company's FRCP 12(c) Motion) under seal #179 Defendant's Response to CLR Plaintiffs' Joint Application for Leave to File Under Seal filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 22, 2019 Email)(Thomas, John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 183 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob William Cutler counsel for Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez. Erin Melody-Rosenfeld is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Cutler, Jacob)
January 28, 2019 Filing 182 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration GIELEGHEM DECLARATION RE CLR PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS)(Gieleghem, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 181 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by CLR PLAINTIFFS CLR Plaintiffs, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,,, #180 served on JANUARY 25, 2019. (Gieleghem, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 180 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits 1-73 to Opposition to Ford Motor Company's FRCP 12(c) Motion) under seal #179 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit Exhibit 73)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 179 APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits 1-73 to Opposition to Ford Motor Company's FRCP 12(c) Motion) under seal filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Resnick, Allen-Michel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 178 APPLICATION to Withdraw APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by CLR PLAINTIFFS CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gieleghem, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON FORD'S MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE CLR PLAINTIFF CASES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #174 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the briefing schedule for Ford's Motions For Judgment On The Pleadings Re CLR Plaintiff Cases #161 , #162 , #163 shall be revised as follows: (1) The deadline for the CLR Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Ford's Motions is extended to 1/28/2019; (2) The deadline for Ford's Reply papers is extended to 2/11/2019. (3) The hearing will remain on 3/6/2019, as set at the January 23, Status Conference #176 . (gk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 176 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: As discussed in Court and on the record, the Court selects Hon. Gary A Feess (Ret.) to be the Settlement Master for this proceeding. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 3/6/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. By no later than 2/27/2019 counsel shall submit a Status Report. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court continues the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #161 , #162 , #163 hearing to this same date and time, 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Frank P Kelly, III on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Frank P Kelly, III added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Kelly, Frank)
January 22, 2019 Filing 174 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 filed by CLR PLAINTIFFS CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gieleghem, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Larry Chae on behalf of Plaintiff anthony alegrete (Attorney Larry Chae added to party anthony alegrete(pty:pla))(Chae, Larry)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Krista L. Lenart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Tamara A. Bush as local counsel #168 . (gk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #163 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Higgins, Russell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #162 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Higgins, Russell)
January 18, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Micah A H Yospe on behalf of Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Micah A H Yospe added to party Liaison Counsel for Defendants(pty:dft))(Yospe, Micah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 168 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Krista L. Lenart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23055525) filed by defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on App to Appear Pro Hace Vice) (Bush, Tamara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 167 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tamara A Bush counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Adding Tamara A. Bush as counsel of record for Defendant Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Tamara A Bush added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Bush, Tamara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
January 3, 2019 Filing 165 Conditional Transfer Order - 24 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings #161 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
December 21, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
December 21, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
December 21, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to On The Pleadings filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service) (Hugret, Spencer)
December 14, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 159 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Court and counsel confer regarding discovery, the appointment of a Settlement Master, and the parties settlement efforts. As discussed in Court and on the record, the Court will select a Settlement Master from the list of names provided by counsel. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 1/23/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 158 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin Melody-Rosenfeld counsel for Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez. Adding Erin Melody-Rosenfeld as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Erin Melody-Rosenfeld. (Attorney Erin Melody-Rosenfeld added to party Jose Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Melody-Rosenfeld, Erin)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING TIME by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the conference hearing time from 9:30 AM to 8:30 AM on Wednesday, December 12, 2018, before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 5, 2018 Filing 156 STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
November 19, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/3/18, 9:41 A.M. re Transcript #154 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2018 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/3/18, 9:41 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Jui, Chia)
November 16, 2018 Filing 153 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard J May counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Richard J May added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(May, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 152 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vikram Subramanian counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Vikram Subramanian added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Subramanian, Vikram)
November 16, 2018 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles Frederick Harlow counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Charles Frederick Harlow added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Harlow, Charles)
November 16, 2018 Filing 150 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen H Dye counsel for In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. Adding Stephen H. Dye as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Stephen H Dye added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Dye, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. FRCP 26(a) Initial Disclosures related to Mary Cannon v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 2:18-cv-04817-AB-FFM (Subramanian, Vikram)
November 15, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. FRCP 26(a) Initial Disclosures related to Garza, et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al., Case No.: 2:18-cv-02745-AB (Harlow, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. FRCP 26(a) Initial Disclosures related to Einbund v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 2:18-cv-02901-AB (Harlow, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. FRCP 26(a) Initial Disclosures related to Brown v. Ford Motor Company, Case No.: 2:18-cv-04190-AB-FFM (Harlow, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
November 13, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/7/18, 9:47 A.M. re Transcript #143 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2018 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/7/18, 9:47 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2019. (Jui, Chia)
November 7, 2018 Filing 142 MINUTES OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court sets the following trial dates for the four cases selected in the Initial Disposition Pool. By no later than March 29, 2019, counsel shall indicate what order the cases will go to trial. Tuesday, November 5, 2019, at 8:30 am; Tuesday, November 19, 2019, at 8:30 am; Tuesday, December 10, 2019, at 8:30 am; Tuesday, January 7, 2020, at 8:30 am. The next Case Management Conference will be held on Wednesday, December 12, 2018, at 9:30 am. By no later than 1 week before the conference counsel shall submit a Status Report outlining their efforts for identifying a settlement master. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (lom)
November 6, 2018 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob William Cutler counsel for Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Lloyd Lister, Jr., Jamie Lopez-Martinez, Soledad Monjarez, Zachary Pemberton, Knight Law Plaintiffs, Michelle Pope, Dolores B. Ramos, Mike Reneau, Daniel Reyes, Megan Rice, Teresa Rodriguez, Ivy Rosenberg, Juanita Sanches, Julian Santana, Bill Smith, Christine Tamez, Kandis Tippett, Dawn Utsey, Clayton Walley, Staci Wyatt, Robert Zebrowski. Adding Jacob Cutler as counsel of record for Plaintiiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jacob Cutler. (Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Lloyd Lister, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Jamie Lopez-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Soledad Monjarez(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Zachary Pemberton(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Knight Law Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Michelle Pope(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Dolores B. Ramos(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Mike Reneau(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Daniel Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Megan Rice(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Teresa Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Ivy Rosenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Juanita Sanches(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Julian Santana(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Bill Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Christine Tamez(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Kandis Tippett(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Dawn Utsey(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Clayton Walley(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Staci Wyatt(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Robert Zebrowski(pty:pla))(Cutler, Jacob)
November 6, 2018 Filing 140 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order #137 , Scheduling Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #136 e-mailed to Steve Mikhov bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to stevem@knightlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2018 Filing 139 Notice of Electronic Filing re MDL - Order #138 e-mailed to Steve Mikhov bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to stevem@knightlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 5, 2018 Filing 138 Conditional Transfer Order - 23 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER CONCERNING DEPOSITIONS OF FACT WITNESSES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. (gk)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1 RELATING TO INITIAL DISPOSITION GROUP OF CASES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: See document for Plaintiffs' List of Initial Disposition Pool ("IDP") of Cases; Plaintiffs' Trial Cases; Defendants' List of IDP Cases; and Defendant's Trial Cases. Fact Discovery cut-off (all IDP cases) 3/29/2019. Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) 7/31/2019. Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions (trial cases only) 10/4/2019. See document for further details. (gk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 135 Conditional Transfer Order - 22 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (et)
October 15, 2018 Filing 134 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Scheduling Order No. 1, #2 Exhibit B Proposed Order Re Fact Witness Deposition Protocol)(Mrowka, Molly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
October 12, 2018 Filing 133 Conditional Transfer Order - 21 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 132 Conditional Transfer Order - 20 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: SELECTING TEST CASES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reconsidered the parties. discussion regarding Lexecon and the venue where the first test trials should take place. Case management would be best served by at least the first test cases being tried in this Court. Only cases originally filed in, or removed to, this district can be tried before this Court. Therefore, the Court ORDERS that the first set of 30 test cases the parties must select by 10/15/2018, must be cases that were originally filed in, or removed to, the United States District Court for the Central District of California. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 128 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Court and counsel confer as to the recently filed Status Report. As discussed in Court and on the record, the parties are to meet and confer to select 30 test cases total, 15 per side, and then which 4 cases will go to trial. The parties shall also confer regarding their proposed schedule of dates and file a Joint Status Report by 10/15/2018. The next Case Management Conference will be held on 11/7/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court ORDERS the stay as to the removal of any cases pending in California state court lifted. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
September 28, 2018 Filing 130 Conditional Transfer Order - 19 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
September 28, 2018 Filing 127 Conditional Transfer Order - 18 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (et)
September 28, 2018 Filing 126 Conditional Transfer Order - 17 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order re Initial Disposition Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Fact Witness Deposition Protocol, #3 Exhibit C - Email Correspondence)(Mrowka, Molly)
September 19, 2018 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Knight Law Plaintiffs for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sarena Faranesh at sarenaf@knightlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Higgins, Russell)
September 18, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/29/18, 10:17 A.M. re Transcript #121 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2018 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/29/18, 10:17 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2018. (Jui, Chia)
September 14, 2018 Filing 125 Conditional Transfer Order - 16 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER NO. 2: ORDER DENYING TEST MOTIONS FOR REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court are test Motions for Remand filed by the Plaintiffs in seven member actions in this MDL. There were four motions filed by Plaintiffs represented by the Consumer Legal Remedies, APC Firm ("CLR Firm") (Case Numbers 2:18-cv-02972 AB (FFMx), docket no. #68 ; 2:18-cv-03493 AB (FFMx), docket no. #71 ; 2:18-cv-04409 AB (FFMx), docket no. #77 ; 2:18-cv-04580 AB (FFMx), docket no. #74 ), and three motions filed by Plaintiffs represented by the Knight Law Group LLP ("KLG Firm"). (Case Numbers 2:18-cv-00942 AB (FFMx), docket no. #62 ; 2:18-01071 AB (FFMx), docket no. #64 ; 2:18-cv-01752 AB (FFMx), docket no. #63 ). The Court DENIES all of the Motions. See document for further details. (gk)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REGARDING PAUSING REMOVAL OF CASES FILED BY KNIGHT LAW GROUP BASED ON DIVERSITY JURISDICTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #109 , it is hereby ordered: (1) Defendant Ford Motor Company ("Ford") will not remove any further cases filed by Knight Law Group LLP ("KLG Firm") based on diversity jurisdiction pending this Court's ruling on the initial remand motions; (2) The KLG Firm will not assert a timeliness objection against Ford as to removals based on diversity jurisdiction that occur within 30 days of this Court's ruling on the initial remand motions; and (3) Ford and the KLG Firm will jointly request that any of the KLG Firm's cases pending in California state court and not yet removed be stayed pending this Court's ruling on the initial remand motions. (gk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 118 Conditional Transfer Order - 15 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 116 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie Heather Gold counsel for Plaintiff Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. Adding Stephanie Heather Gold as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attorney Stephanie Heather Gold added to party Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Gold, Stephanie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 115 MINUTES OF Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Plaintiffs Dyanna Dawn Becker and Peter Lewis Stetina's Motion for Remand to Superior Court of California and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal (related to CV 18-00942 AB (FFMx)) #62 ; Plaintiff Michael D. Bell's Motion for Remand to Superior Court of California and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal (related to CV 18-01752 AB (FFMx)) #63 ; Plaintiff Aaron K. Duerksen's Motion for Remand to Superior Court of California and Award of Costs and Expenses Resulting from Removal (related to CV 18-01071 AB (FFMx)) #64 ; Plaintiff Connie Hill's Motion for Remand of CLR Plaintiffs Test Cases (related to CV 18-04409 AB (FFMx)) #77 ; Plaintiff Rigoberto Sumano's Motion for Remand of CLR Plaintiffs Test Cases (related to CV 18-04580 AB (FFMx)) #74 ; Plaintiffs Ellen Eggers and Paul Eggers Motion for Remand of CLR Plaintiffs Test Cases (related to CV 18-03493 AB (FFMx)) #71 ; and Plaintiff Crystal Vasquez's Motion for Remand of CLR Plaintiffs Test Cases (related to CV 18-02972 AB (FFMx)) #68 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court and counsel confer as to the recently filed Status Report. As discussed in Court and on the record, the parties are to meet and confer on or before 9/12/2018, and file a Joint Status Report by 9/19/2018. The next Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Molly J Mrowka on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Molly J Mrowka added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Mrowka, Molly)
August 29, 2018 Filing 113 Conditional Transfer Order - 14 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Patricia Maclear on behalf of In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Maclear, Amy)
August 22, 2018 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT FOR AUGUST 29, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Gieleghem, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 110 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order No. 1, #2 Exhibit B Defendant's Proposed Coordination Order)(Mrowka, Molly)
August 22, 2018 Filing 109 STIPULATION for Order REGARDING PAUSING REMOVAL OF CASES FILED BY KNIGHT LAW GROUP BASED ON DIVERSITY JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Nicole)
August 21, 2018 Filing 108 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #74 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #71 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Gieleghem, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 107 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #63 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #74 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #64 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #71 Defendant's Notice Of Supplemental Authority Re Opposition To Plaintiffs' Test Remand Motions filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 21, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 07/18/18 - 9:13 a.m re Transcript #105 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2018 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 07/18/18 - 9:13 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez, #5920, phone number 213-894-2979; csrlisag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (Gonzalez, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 104 Conditional Transfer Order - 13 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE Master Case List filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for Defendants. (Hugret, Spencer)
August 6, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Declaration (Motion related). The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Declaration from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Memorandum in Support of Motion. The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Memorandum from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Declaration (Motion related). The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Declaration from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Memorandum in Support of Motion. The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Memorandum from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Declaration (Motion related). The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Declaration from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Memorandum in Support of Motion. The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Memorandum from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Declaration (Motion related). The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Declaration from the 8/29/2018 calendar.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Memorandum in Support of Motion. The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand (Suggestion of) (MDL cases only), which set a duplicative Motion before the judge. Clerk has removed the Memorandum from the 8/29/2018 calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 94 DECLARATION of NEIL GIELEGHEM REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CLR PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMOVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #74 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #71 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH G, #2 Appendix APPENDIX A)(Gieleghem, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 93 REPLY Reply In Support of CLR Plaintiffs Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #74 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #71 filed by Plaintiff CLR Plaintiffs. (Gieleghem, John)
August 3, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #63 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #64 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Higgins, Russell)
August 3, 2018 Filing 91 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #63 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #64 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #62 filed by Plaintiff Knight Law Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Higgins, Russell)
July 27, 2018 Filing 90 to Opposition to CLR Plaintiffs' Test Motions for Remand 77 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #63 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #74 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #64 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #78 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #76 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #71 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS #73 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) MPA #72 filed by In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Byrd, #2 Declaration of Steven Dye, #3 Declaration of Taylor Sullivan, #4 Declaration of Gary Hertica, #5 Declaration of Krista Lenart, #6 Declaration of John Morshad, #7 Declaration of Gary Hertica)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 26, 2018 Filing 89 Conditional Transfer Order - 12 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gk)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Defendant has submitted courtesy copies of oppositions to motions for remand (Dkt. Nos. 85, 86). These oppositions include declarations and exhibits thereto, and the courtesy copies provided are not accurately or adequately tabbed. Because Dkt. No. 85 is particularly voluminous, it is too onerous to use without proper tabbing. The Court therefore ORDERS Defendant to supply the Court with new courtesy copies of Dkt. No. 85 accurately and adequately tabbed so the Court can easily locate the individual exhibits. Also, given the volume of pages, the opposition and its supporting declarations should not be bound together in one stack but instead should be provided separately. T