Carrie Gray v. Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Gray
Defendant: Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Sephora USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00091
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 FRCP 7.1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC, Sephora USA, Inc., (Humphreys, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 7.1-1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC, Sephora USA, Inc., (Humphreys, Scott)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim, #14 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel are ordered to file their Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. See Local Rule 7.1-1. (mrgo)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson. The Scheduling Conference s set fr 3/25/2019 at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. (See order for further details) (yl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Carrie Gray filed by Defendants Sephora USA, Inc., Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Attorney Scott S Humphreys added to party Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott S Humphreys added to party Sephora USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Humphreys, Scott)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carrie Gray, upon Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service, authorized agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carrie Gray, upon Defendant Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tommy Everett, an Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. (et)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC. (et)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Carrie Gray. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Carrie Gray. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Carrie Gray. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carrie Gray, (Carroll, Stuart)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carrie Gray. (Carroll, Stuart)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22993045 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Carrie Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11) (Attorney Stuart L Carroll added to party Carrie Gray(pty:pla))(Carroll, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrie Gray v. Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat McGrath Cosmetics LLC
Represented By: Scott S Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Represented By: Scott S Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Gray
Represented By: Stuart L Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?