In Re: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.

Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association, Antoinette Weed, Nancy Hoffmeier Zamora and Sara Yavor
Appellant: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Julio C. Molica, Nancy Cueva, Nancy Amparo Cueva and Julio C Molica
Case Number: 2:2019cv00120
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: David O Carter
1 Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #9 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Appellant Nancy Cueva, Pro Se., in place and stead of Attorneys Daniel M McCarthy #10 . (jp)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Request for Approval of Substitution of Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Pro Se in place and stead of attorney Daniel J. McCarthy of Hill Farrer and Burrill LLP #8 . A corporation cannot represent itself. (jp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Nancy Cueva) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Julio C. Molica) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 First REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Daniel J. McCarthy as counsel of record (Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.) filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proof of Service) (McCarthy, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10689 DSF. Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00120 DSF. Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Appellants Nancy Amparo Cueva, Julio C Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.. (McCarthy, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: 1) Notice to Vacate, 2) Writ of Execution for Possession of Real Property Commonly Known as 10351 Oklahoma Avenue, Chatsworth, California 91311, 3) Trustee's Opposition to Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay and for Permanant Stay Pending Appeal; supporting Declaration; 4) Order (1) Determining Quitclaim Deed Recorded 12/26/18 Null and Void and (2) Authorizing and Directing First American Title Company to Disregard Quitclaim Deed for Purposes of Insuring Title to Real Property filed by Appellants Julio C. Molica, Nancy Cueva. (lom) Modified on 1/24/2019 (lom).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 1/4/2019. (lh)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELLECTION: Re: 1) Writ of Execution for Possession of Real Property Commonly Known as 10351 Oklahoma Avenue, Chatsworth, California 91311, 2) Order to Show Cause Why Nancy Cueva and Debtor Should Not Be Held In Contempt of Court entered on 12/19/18 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/20/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:16-bk-11387-GM, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-18-1340. Filed by Appellants Julio C. Molica, Real Estate Short Sales, Inc., Nancy Cueva. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: JaVonne M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Antoinette Weed
Represented By: A David Youssefyeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy Hoffmeier Zamora
Represented By: David Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sara Yavor
Represented By: Ken I Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Real Estate Short Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C. Molica
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Cueva
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Amparo Cueva
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julio C Molica
Represented By: Daniel J McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?