Chom Ye Chon v. Enchanted Coffee et al

Plaintiff: CHOM YE CHON
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, ENCHANTED COFFEE and KELETHIN INVESTMENTS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00222
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION: NO HEARING by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report due by 4/19/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Enchanted Coffee, Kelethin Investments, LLC, (Sahelian, Ara)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Enchanted Coffee, Kelethin Investments, LLC.(Attorney Ara Sahelian added to party Enchanted Coffee (pty:dft), Attorney Ara Sahelian added to party Kelethin Investments, LLC(pty:dft))(Sahelian, Ara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Enchanted Coffee, Kelethin Investments, LLC. (et)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CHOM YE CHON, (Kim, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CHOM YE CHON. (Kim, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CHOM YE CHON. (Kim, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23022473 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CHOM YE CHON. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party CHOM YE CHON(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chom Ye Chon v. Enchanted Coffee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCHANTED COFFEE
Represented By: Ara Sahelian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELETHIN INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Ara Sahelian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHOM YE CHON
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?