Michael McCain v. Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828 et al
Plaintiff: Michael McCain
Defendant: Ventura County Community College District, American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO and Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00228
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Elgant Covert on behalf of Defendant Ventura County Community College District (Attorney Spencer Elgant Covert added to party Ventura County Community College District(pty:dft))(Covert, Spencer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-00676 JLS(CWx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV19-00228 JLS(DFMx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (lwag)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08999-JLS-DFM; 2:18-cv-06793-JLS-DFM; 8:18-cv-00994-JLS-DFM; 8:18-cv-01169-JLS-DFM; 2:18-cv-09531-JLS-DFM (Kronland, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Federation of Teachers answer now due 3/12/2019; Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO answer now due 3/12/2019; Ventura County Community College District answer now due 3/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Federation of Teachers; Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO.(Kronland, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott A Kronland on behalf of Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO (Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party American Federation of Teachers(pty:dft), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO(pty:dft))(Kronland, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eileen B Goldsmith on behalf of Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO (Attorney Eileen B Goldsmith added to party American Federation of Teachers(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen B Goldsmith added to party Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO(pty:dft))(Goldsmith, Eileen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain, re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 1-25-19. (Myers, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Angel J. Valencia APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Michael McCain, designating Thomas O. Myers as local counsel. (mrgo)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Milton L. Chappell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Michael McCain, designating Thomas O. Myers as local counsel. (mrgo)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Milton L. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael McCain (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23067206) filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice (Milton L. Chappell)) (Myers, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angel J. Valencia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael McCain (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23066960) filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice (Angel J. Valencia)) (Myers, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Milton L. Chappell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Angel J. Valencia. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ventura County Community College District. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant American Federation of Teachers. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain, identifying The Classes He Seeks to Represent. (Myers, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23023671 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Attorney Thomas O Myers added to party Michael McCain(pty:pla))(Myers, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael McCain v. Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Community College District
Represented By: Spencer Elgant Covert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Eileen B Goldsmith
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Eileen B Goldsmith
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCain
Represented By: Thomas O Myers
Represented By: Angel J Valencia
Represented By: Milton L Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?