Melissa Rivera v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al

Plaintiff: Melissa Rivera
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00235
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Melissa Rivera. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Righetti, Matthew)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-09305 DMG(RAOx) (rn)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer now due 1/31/2019, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(McNaught, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNaught, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
January 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 50 inclusive, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by plaintiff Melissa Rivera. (Filed in state court 10/26/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Wells Fargo & Company as Corporate Parent. (McNaught, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (McNaught, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNaught, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STCV02829 Receipt No: 0973-23024594 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of Diana Brandenburg in Support Thereof, #5 Declaration of Service) (Attorney Andrew M McNaught added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(McNaught, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissa Rivera v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Rivera
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: John Glugoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew M McNaught
Represented By: Jill Ann Porcaro
Represented By: Christian J Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?