Dexter Hubert White v. City of Los Angeles et al

Plaintiff: DEXTER HUBERT WHITE
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Los Angeles Police Department, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, OFFICER CORY MCMICHAEL, OFFICER JAVIER TAFOYA, Javier Tafoya, Cory McMichael and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
1 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Dexter Hubert White pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to County of Los Angeles. (Mgdesyan, George)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department, Cory McMichael, Javier Tafoya. (shb)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Dexter Hubert White. (Attachments: #1 Face Page of Complaint)(Mgdesyan, George)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Remove "et al " from the Summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF DEXTER HUBERT WHITE. (Mgdesyan, George)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DEXTER HUBERT WHITE. (Mgdesyan, George)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DEXTER HUBERT WHITE, (Mgdesyan, George)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23026598 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF DEXTER HUBERT WHITE. (Attorney George G Mgdesyan added to party DEXTER HUBERT WHITE(pty:pla))(Mgdesyan, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dexter Hubert White v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEXTER HUBERT WHITE
Represented By: George G Mgdesyan
Represented By: Araksya Boyadzhyan
Represented By: Hripsime Ani Bagdasaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CORY MCMICHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JAVIER TAFOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Tafoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory McMichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?