Liza Wolff v. Northstar Location Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: individually and on behalf of others similarly situated. and Liza Wolff
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00244
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Northstar Location Services, LLC answer now due 3/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Northstar Location Services, LLC.(Lorch, Gary)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Northstar Location Services, LLC answer now due 2/26/2019, filed by Defendant Northstar Location Services, LLC.(Attorney Gary J Lorch added to party Northstar Location Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Lorch, Gary)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00244 VAP(MAAx). (rn)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Liza Wolff, upon Defendant Northstar Location Services, LLC served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldstein, Amir)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Northstar Location Services, LLC. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Liza Wolff, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Goldstein, Amir)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Liza Wolff, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated., (Goldstein, Amir)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Liza Wolff, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Goldstein, Amir)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23026626 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Liza Wolff, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Attorney Amir J Goldstein added to party Liza Wolff(pty:pla), Attorney Amir J Goldstein added to party individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liza Wolff v. Northstar Location Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.
Represented By: Amir J Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Wolff
Represented By: Amir J Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Represented By: Gary J Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?