Alcon Entertainment, LLC v. Automobiles Peugeot SA et al

Plaintiff: Alcon Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Automobiles Peugeot SA, Isabel Salas Mendez, Mamou Sissoko, Herve Montron, Publicis Groupe S.A., Does 1-10, inclusive and Publicis Media France SA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00245
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC, upon Defendant Automobiles Peugeot SA served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricia/Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. via Federal Express International Shipping Service (Yeh, Regina)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to Defendant Automobiles Peugeot SA, Isabel Salas Mendez, Herve Montron, Publicis Groupe S.A., Publicis Media France SA, Mamou Sissoko. (iv)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #7 filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC. (Anderson, Edward)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Anderson, Edward)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Automobiles Peugeot SA, Isabel Salas Mendez. (et)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC. (Anderson, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC, (Anderson, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC. (Anderson, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23026794 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alcon Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Edward Muir Anderson added to party Alcon Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla))(Anderson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcon Entertainment, LLC v. Automobiles Peugeot SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobiles Peugeot SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Salas Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamou Sissoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herve Montron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publicis Groupe S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publicis Media France SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcon Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Edward Muir Anderson
Represented By: Regina Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?