Joan Pascua v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Joan Pascua
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00365
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ellis, Patricia)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Court's Notice re Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff Joan Pascua. (Grabarsky, Susan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 3/14/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for deadlines and requirements.* (vdr)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-00365 FMO(GJSx). (rn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joan Pascua, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (et)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff JOAN PASCUA. (Grabarsky, Susan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JOAN PASCUA, (Grabarsky, Susan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JOAN PASCUA. (Grabarsky, Susan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23058171 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JOAN PASCUA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party JOAN PASCUA(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joan Pascua v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Patricia A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Pascua
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?