Columbia Casualty Company v. Counter Brands, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Columbia Casualty Company
Defendant: Counter Brands, LLC and Counter Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00380
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits B, C, D, and E to Amended Complaint re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #13 , Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit D, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit E)(Sinnott, Randolph)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinnott, Randolph)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #11 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The following documents are hereby ordered sealed:No. Description 1. Amended Complaint Exhibit B. 2. Amended Complaint Exhibit C. 3. Amended Complaint Exhibit D. 4. Amended Complaint Exhibit E. (es)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits, B, C, D, and E to Amended Complaint under seal #11 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Amended Complaint, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit D, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit E)(Sinnott, Randolph)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits, B, C, D, and E to Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit D, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit E)(Sinnott, Randolph)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-00567 AG(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00380 AG(KESx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (rn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Counter Brands, Inc. (lh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Counter Brands, LLC. (lh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Sinnott, Randolph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Sinnott, Randolph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company, identifying CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CONTINENTAL CORPORATION, CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION, AND LOEWS CORPORATION. (Sinnott, Randolph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Sinnott, Randolph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23060742 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Randolph P Sinnott added to party Columbia Casualty Company(pty:pla))(Sinnott, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Casualty Company v. Counter Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By: Randolph P Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counter Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counter Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?