Lilie Lomeli Gomez et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Lomeli, David Gomez and Lilie Lomeli Gomez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, US Bank, NA and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00388
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #9 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Strike] #9 filed by Defendants US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Rackers, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Strike] filed by defendant US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Rackers, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Joint APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 2/4/2019 filed by Defendant US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Rackers, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, re Order #6 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer served on January 23, 2019. (Rackers, Mark)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
January 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, filed by plaintiffs Lilie Lomeli Gomez, Salvador Lomeli, David Gomez. (Filed in state court 12/13/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants US BANK, NA, as trustee for CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-HE3, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A, identifying U.S. Bancorp and Wells Fargo & Co.. (Rackers, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants US BANK, NA, as trustee for CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-HE3, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Rackers, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles, case number 18NWCV00163 Receipt No: 0973-23061358 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants US BANK, NA, as trustee for CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-HE3, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' State Court Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Remainder of State Court File, #3 Declaration of Service) (Attorney Mark Gerard Rackers added to party US BANK, NA, as trustee for CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-HE3(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Gerard Rackers added to party WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A(pty:dft))(Rackers, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilie Lomeli Gomez et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Matthew Guy Halgren
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Represented By: Matthew Guy Halgren
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Lomeli
Represented By: Stuart Russell Simone
Represented By: Mark A Gomez
Represented By: Peter Roble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gomez
Represented By: Stuart Russell Simone
Represented By: Mark A Gomez
Represented By: Peter Roble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilie Lomeli Gomez
Represented By: Stuart Russell Simone
Represented By: Mark A Gomez
Represented By: Peter Roble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?