Unicolors, Inc. v. Iberia Fashion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Amazon.com, Inc., Da Moda Clothing, LLC, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Cosmos Trading, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., Western Pacific, Calessa Sportswear International, LLC, Dillard's, Inc., Gabriel Brothers, Inc, Embee Distribution Inc, J & W Distributing, Inc., Iberia Fashion, LLC, J and W Distributing, Inc., Dillards, Inc., Western Pacific individually and business entity of unknown form doing business as Dream State, Gabriel Brothers, Inc a West Virginia Corporation, individually doing business as Rugged Wearhouse, Cosmos Trading, Inc. a Texas Corporation, individually doing business as Austin5 doing business as Waikiki Store, Iberia Fashion, LLC a New York Limited Liability Company, individually doing business as Indero doing business as Bae City and Embee Distribution Inc a New York Corporation, individually doing business as Jembro Stores
Case Number: 2:2019cv00401
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Iberia Fashion, LLC, identifying Iberia Fashion, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Lee, Frank)
March 6, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dillards, Inc., (Sandoval, Laura)
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Dillards, Inc..(Attorney Laura Lisa Sandoval added to party Dillards, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sandoval, Laura)
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Western Pacific served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gus Margaros, Agent for Service c/o Manny Borja, Employee Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #28 . Amazon.com, Inc. (a Delaware Corporation) terminated. (mrgo)
February 28, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Embee Distribution Inc served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marcello Degliomina, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant J and W Distributing, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Cosmos Trading, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Dillards, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Larry Broomas, Jr., Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu:The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 4, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than March 21, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1.Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (shb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Iberia Fashion, LLC.(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Iberia Fashion, LLC(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank)
February 18, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ross Stores, Inc., identifying Ross Stores, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Lee, Frank)
February 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ross Stores, Inc..(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Ross Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank)
February 18, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, identifying Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, a New Jersey Corporation. (Lee, Frank)
February 18, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation.(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gabriel Brothers, Inc answer now due 3/21/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Gabriel Brothers, Inc.(Attorney Stephen R Smerek added to party Gabriel Brothers, Inc(pty:dft))(Smerek, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cosmos Trading, Inc. answer now due 3/25/2019; J and W Distributing, Inc. answer now due 3/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Cosmos Trading, Inc.; J and W Distributing, Inc..(Attorney Brian K Brookey added to party Cosmos Trading, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian K Brookey added to party J and W Distributing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brookey, Brian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 3/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Attorney Gregory L Doll added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Doll, Gregory)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Agent for Service c/o Cynthia Jones, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Daisy Montenegro, Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Gabriel Brothers, Inc served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Daisy Montenegro, Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Plaintiff Ross Stores, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Daisy Montenegro, Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-00401 GW(FFMx). (rn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Calessa Sportswear International, LLC, Cosmos Trading, Inc., Da Moda Clothing, LLC, Dillards, Inc., Embee Distribution Inc, Gabriel Brothers, Inc, Iberia Fashion, LLC, J and W Distributing, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., Western Pacific. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23064023 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Iberia Fashion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L Doll
Represented By: Jamie Olivia Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Da Moda Clothing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation
Represented By: Frank N Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmos Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Frank N Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calessa Sportswear International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embee Distribution Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & W Distributing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Fashion, LLC
Represented By: Frank N Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and W Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillards, Inc.
Represented By: Scott P Shaw
Represented By: Laura Lisa Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Pacific individually and business entity of unknown form doing business as Dream State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc a West Virginia Corporation, individually doing business as Rugged Wearhouse
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmos Trading, Inc. a Texas Corporation, individually doing business as Austin5 doing business as Waikiki Store
Represented By: Brian K Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Fashion, LLC a New York Limited Liability Company, individually doing business as Indero doing business as Bae City
Represented By: Frank N Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embee Distribution Inc a New York Corporation, individually doing business as Jembro Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?