Barbara Labrador v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Labrador
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00412
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan answer now due 3/21/2019; UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 3/21/2019, filed by Defendants Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan; UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Chakameh Ganji added to party Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Chakameh Ganji added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ganji, Chakameh)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for deadlines and requirements.* (vdr)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Barbara Labrador, (Kantor, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Barbara Labrador. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Barbara Labrador. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23065888 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Barbara Labrador. (Attorney Andrew Michael Kantor added to party Barbara Labrador(pty:pla))(Kantor, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbara Labrador v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Represented By: Chakameh Ganji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elements Behavioral Health Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Represented By: Chakameh Ganji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Labrador
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?