Seymore Burke v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Seymore Burke
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corp. dba Space X, Does 1-10, inclusive and Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00445
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant shall have 21 days from the date Plaintiff files his First Amended Complaint in which to move, answer or otherwise plead to the First Amended Complaint. (iv)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Narvid, Leila)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Seymore Burke answer now due 3/20/2019, filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp..(Narvid, Leila)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp..(Attorney Leila Narvid added to party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.(pty:dft))(Narvid, Leila)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (car)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Seymore Burke, (Friedman, Todd)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seymore Burke. (Friedman, Todd)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Seymore Burke. (Friedman, Todd)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23072748 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seymore Burke. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Seymore Burke(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymore Burke v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seymore Burke
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Represented By: Taryn Essig Short
Represented By: Tiffany Noelle Buda
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: John R Habashy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corp. dba Space X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Matthew C Lewis
Represented By: Leila Narvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?