Shu-Ting Lin v. Kathy Baran, et al
Plaintiff: Shu-Ting Lin
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker, Director Kathy BARAN, Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Kathy Baran, Matthew G. Whitaker and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 2:2019cv00448
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION OF DEFENDANTS' LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendants Kathy Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker (Chen, Margaret)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Kirstjen M. Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna, Kathy Baran, Matthew G. Whitaker.(Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Kathy Baran(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Kirstjen M. Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Matthew G. Whitaker(pty:dft))(Chen, Margaret)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shu-Ting Lin, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. De la Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk_Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit Whitaker_Return Receipt, #4 Exhibit Baran_Return Receipt)(Lau, Linda)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Kathy Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shu-Ting Lin, identifying None. (Lau, Linda)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Shu-Ting Lin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Lau, Linda)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shu-Ting Lin. (Lau, Linda)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23073028 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shu-Ting Lin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Linda Wong Lau added to party Shu-Ting Lin(pty:pla))(Lau, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shu-Ting Lin v. Kathy Baran, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shu-Ting Lin
Represented By: Linda Wong Lau
Represented By: Helyn Christyne Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?