Bruce Boyer v. City of Simi Valley
Plaintiff: Bruce Boyer
Defendant: City of Simi Valley, a public entity, City of Simi Valley and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00560
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT of REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF COUNSEL AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL SETTING UNTIL AFTER DETERMINATION OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Bruce Boyer. (Wallace, George)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Damages #16 filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sarno, Justin)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Damages filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin Reade Sarno, #2 Proposed Order) (Sarno, Justin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Simi Valley amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Bruce Boyer(Wallace, George)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley.(Sarno, Justin)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF SIMI VALLEY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #8 by Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-09996 PSG(JEMx) (rn)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:11-cv-02113 ODW(fmox) (rn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Bruce Boyer. Related Case(s): 18-09996 (Wallace, George)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarno, Justin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 5. The correct event is Proof of Service (subsequent documents). You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Simi Valley, Does 1 through 10. Filed by Plaintiff Bruce Boyer. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/17/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed as NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley, a public entity. (Sarno, Justin) Modified on 1/25/2019 (lh).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley, a public entity. (Sarno, Justin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley, a public entity, identifying Plaintiff, Bruce Boyer; plaintiff's counsel George M. Wallace, Esq. of WALLACE, BROWN & SCHWARTZ; Defendant, City of Simi Valley, a public entity; defense counsel, Steven J. Rothans, Esq., Jill Williams, Esq. and Justin Reade Sarno, Esq. of CARPENTER, ROTHANS & DUMONT. (Sarno, Justin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley, a public entity. (Sarno, Justin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2018-00521880-CU-CR-VTA Receipt No: 0973-23094378 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant City of Simi Valley, a public entity. (Attorney Justin Reade Sarno added to party City of Simi Valley, a public entity(pty:dft))(Sarno, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Boyer v. City of Simi Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Boyer
Represented By: George M Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Simi Valley, a public entity
Represented By: Justin Reade Sarno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Simi Valley
Represented By: Lonnie J Eldridge
Represented By: Justin Reade Sarno
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Jill Williams
Represented By: Dion J O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?