David Bozell v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: David Bozell
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, THE LONG TERM DISABILITY COVERAGE FOR ALL EMPLOYEES WHO ARE COVERED BY A COLLECTIVE BARGAINING BETWEEN THE EMPLOYER AND THE FOLLOWING LOCALS: 14,110J, 120M, 120W, 135, 145, 1691C, 200, 264B, 399, 470 and The Long Term Disability Coverage for All Employees Who Are Covered By a Collective Bargaining Between the Employer and the Following Locals
Case Number: 2:2019cv00805
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
March 29, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America ("Prudential"), Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda)
March 29, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Chineduh, Charles)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT THE LONG TERM DISABILITY COVERAGE FOR ALL EMPLOYEES WHO ARE COVERED BY A COLLECTIVE BARGAINING BETWEEN THE EMPLOYER AND THE FOLLOWING LOCALS: 14, 110J, 120M, 120W, 135, 145, 1691C, 200, 264B, 399, 470WC BRIDGEPORT, NEW JERSEY, 470CL BRIDGEPORT, NEW JERSEY, 533, 5706, 703 (738), 703 (U29), 705 TRUCK DRIVERS, OIL DRIVERS, AND FILLING STATION 705A GLENDALE HEIGHTS, 722S PLAN by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #20 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant THE LONG TERM DISABILITY COVERAGE FOR ALL EMPLOYEES WHO ARE COVERED BY A COLLECTIVE BARGAINING BETWEEN THE EMPLOYER AND THE FOLLOWING LOCALS: 14, 110J, 120M, 120W, 135, 145, 1691C, 200, 264B, 399, 470WC BRIDGEPORT, NEW JERSEY, 470CL BRIDGEPORT, NEW JERSEY, 533, 5706, 703 (738), 703 (U29), 705 TRUCK DRIVERS, OIL DRIVERS, AND FILLING STATION 705A GLENDALE HEIGHTS, 722S PLAN (the "Plan") be dismissed from this action without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs directly related to this Stipulation to Dismiss the Plan and the dismissal of the Plan. The Prudential Insurance Company of America shall remain the only named defendant in this action. (bm)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Long Term Disability Coverage for All Employees Who Are Covered By a Collective Bargaining Between the Employer and the Following Locals filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chineduh, Charles)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Court's Orders filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Darras, Frank)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT granting Stipulation #17 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having reviewed the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing therefor, hereby GRANTS the parties' Stipulation to Extend Prudential's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint. Prudential's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint is extended to March 29, 2019. (bm)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 3/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Chineduh, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Bozell, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez of CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00805 PSG(AFMx). (rn)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-00805 PSG(JCx). (rn)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00805-CAS(JCx). (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Darras, Frank)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Long Term Disability Coverage for All Employees Who Are Covered By a Collective Bargaining Between the Employer and the Following Locals 14,110J, 120M, 120W, 135, 145, 1691C, 200, 264B, 399, 470WC, Bridgeport, New Jersey, 470CL Bridgeport, New Jersey, 533, 5706, 703, (738), 703(U29), 705 Truck Drivers, Oil Drivers, and Filling Station, 705A Glendale Heights, 722S Plan. (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (car)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Darras, Frank)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Darras, Frank)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Darras, Frank)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Bozell, (Darras, Frank)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 02/01/2019, receipt number 0973-23144032), filed by Plaintiff David Bozell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Frank N Darras added to party David Bozell(pty:pla))(Darras, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Bozell v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LONG TERM DISABILITY COVERAGE FOR ALL EMPLOYEES WHO ARE COVERED BY A COLLECTIVE BARGAINING BETWEEN THE EMPLOYER AND THE FOLLOWING LOCALS: 14,110J, 120M, 120W, 135, 145, 1691C, 200, 264B, 399, 470
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Term Disability Coverage for All Employees Who Are Covered By a Collective Bargaining Between the Employer and the Following Locals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bozell
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?