Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00822
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-822 E on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/11/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on defendant, and shall file a proof of such service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this aspect of this Order may result in the issuance of an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. It is Ordered that defendant's time to plead to the complaint is extended such that defendant's pleading must be filed within 90 days of service of the complaint. Defendant shall file a transcript of the administrative proceedings at the same time that defendant pleads to the complaint. A paper copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings must be submitted directly to chambers within 24 hours of the time defendant pleads to the complaint. Within 30 days of the filing of defendant's answer, the plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. Within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. If either party believes that the case cannot be resolved by motion, such party shall so advise the Court and the opposing party in writing. The Court will take the motions under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. (sp)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (sp)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra, (Ruzin, Irene)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra (pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdias Leonel Beza Guerra
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?