Tom Lange Company International, Inc. v. Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tom Lange Company International, Inc.
Defendant: Eric W. Mydland and Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00826
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. as to Defendants Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc. and Eric W. Mydland, Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-10771-CB and 8:19-bk-11047-MW. (Read, R)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application #7 . No bond shall be required to be posted by Plaintiff before the Preliminary Injunction is effective. See document re injunction as to defendant Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc. (gk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES OF Order to Show Cause Hearing Re Preliminary Injunction held before Judge Manuel L. Real: No one is present for defendant. Counsel submits on the papers. The Court ORDERS a preliminary injunction issued against Defendant Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc. Counsel shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (gk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #13 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Read, R)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #13 served on 02/13/2019. (Read, R)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE-SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: Counsel and parties are notified that the Order to Show Cause Hearing Re Preliminary Injunction is hereby continued and re-set on 2/19/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. Counsel for Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve defendants with a copy of this Minute Order, and notify defendants of the new date and time of the hearing. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of R. Jason Read Re Status of Service of TRO and Order to Show Cause and Non-Receipt of Opposition; Exhibits in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Read, R)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application #7 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants EVERGREEN FRESH FARMS, INC., a corporation, and ERIC W. MYDLAND, an individual, appear on 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM or as soon thereafter as the matter may be heard, then and there to show cause, if any it has, why it, its agents, bankers, subsidiaries, successors, assignees, principals, employees, officers, directors, shareholders, attorneys, and representatives should not be restrained and preliminarily enjoined during the pendency of this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants and their owners, officers, directors, shareholders, employees, agents, subsidiaries, successors, assignees, principals, assignors, attorneys and persons acting in concert with them, appear at the same time and place to show cause, if any they have, why they should not be commanded by order of this Court and required to distribute PACA trust assets in the amount of at least $329,708.75, consisting of the principal sum due of $315,438.00, plus contractual finance charges through 2/4/2019 in the amount of $10,118.25, plus reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,752.50, plus filing fees of $400.00, owing to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no bond shall be required to be posted by Plaintiff before the Temporary Restraining Order is effective. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with copies of this Order and all pleadings and other papers in support of the Order on or before 2/5/2019 by Federal Express with verification of receipt. Defendants shall file an Opposition, if any, to the Order to Show Cause on or before 12 PM on 2/8/2019, and shall personally serve Plaintiff's counsel with a copy of said Opposition by said deadline. Plaintiff shall file and serve a Reply to Defendants' Opposition, if any, on or before 12:00 PM on 2/10/2019. See document for further details. (gk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Plaintiffs Supplemental Declaration Regarding Notice of Deadline to File Opposition to Ex Parte Application for an Order Re Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Plaintiffs Declaration of Notice of Deadline to File Opposition to Ex Parte Application for an Order Re Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Jason Read in Support, #2 Declaration of Mark Krauter in Support, #3 Declaration of Jeff Baskovich in Support, #4 Declaration of R. Jason Read re Notice, #5 Memorandum on Points and Authorities in Support, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction) (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc., Eric W. Mydland. (car)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc., (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Read, R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23149969 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tom Lange Company International, Inc.. (Attorney R Jason Read added to party Tom Lange Company International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Read, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom Lange Company International, Inc. v. Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Lange Company International, Inc.
Represented By: Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Represented By: R Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric W. Mydland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Fresh Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?