Man Wai Chung v. Jose Alberto Molina et al

Plaintiff: Man Wai Chung and Jenny Chung
Defendant: Jose Alberto Molina, Haciendas Grandes Development, LLC, Does 1-25, Inclusive, John Krempasky, Southbay Development Services, LLC and Joe Molina
Case Number: 2:2019cv00832
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Jose Alberto Molina re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) #4 . (jp)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Amended Notice of Ruling Regarding Briefing Deadlines as to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Man Wai Chung. (Foster, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Dkt. #11 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order (Dkt. #8 ), any opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ("Motion" (Dkt. #11 )) was due by March 11, 2019. No such opposition has been filed. On or before March 29, 2019, Defendant Molina shall file an opposition or a notice of non-opposition to the Motion. If Defendant opts to oppose the Motion, Defendant shall also file a separate request, by March 29, 2019, to file the opposition, which shall explain the reason why the opposition was not timely filed and why the Court should accept the late-filed opposition. The Court will determine whether the request will be granted at the hearing on the Motion or in its ruling should it determine that a hearing is not necessary. If an opposition and request are filed by March 29, 2019, any reply shall be filed no later than April 8, 2019. If an opposition and accompanying request are not filed by the deadline, the Court will deem the Motion unopposed and a determination will be made upon the papers that have been submitted. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide telephonic and email notice of this Order to Defendant Molina and file a corresponding proof of service on or before March 22, 2019. THIS ORDER SUPERSEDES THE ORDER AT DKT. 13. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of BRIEFING DEADLINES AS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND filed by Plaintiff Man Wai Chung. (Foster, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On March 19, 2019, an Order issued setting certain deadlines as to the briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Dkt. 13. It also required counsel for Plaintiff to provide telephonic and email notice of the Order to Defendant Molina and file a corresponding proof of service on or before March 20, 2019. No such proof of service has been filed. Counsel for plaintiff shall file such proof of service no later than 9:00 a.m. on March 22, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE FAILURE TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Dkt. #11 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order (Dkt. #8 ), any opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ("Motion" (Dkt. #11 )) was due by March 11, 2019. No such opposition has been filed. On or before March 27, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an opposition or a notice of non-opposition to the Motion. If Plaintiff opts to oppose the Motion, Plaintiff shall also file a separate request, by March 27, 2019, to file the opposition, which shall explain the reason why the opposition was not timely filed and why the Court should accept the late-filed opposition. The Court will determine whether the request will be granted at the hearing on the Motion or in its ruling should it determine that a hearing is not necessary. If an opposition and request are filed by March 27, 2019, any reply shall be filed no later than April 5, 2019. If an opposition and accompanying request are not filed by the deadline, the Court will deem the Motion unopposed and a determination will be made upon the papers that have been submitted. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide telephonic and email notice of this Order to Defendant Molina and file a corresponding proof of service on or before March 20, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE THE SUBMISSION OF COURTESY COPIES OF COMPLAINT (DKT. #1 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.5 and this Court's Standing Order 9(e), parties are required to submit courtesy copies of all initial pleadings and motion papers, among other filings. Copies must be printed from CM/ECF and must include the CM/ECF-generated header, unobscured by stapling or binding. The parties are directed to review the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders, and to submit the Complaint by March 1, 2019 to the 4th Floor of the First Street Courthouse. The parties are also reminded to review and comply with the Local Rules and Standing Orders with respect to all future filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Man Wai Chung. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Foster, Richard)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice (Other) #7 , for the following reasons: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings-Applications/Motions/Petitions/Request. (2) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (3) The docket text and tile of the document do not match. The document is filed as a generic Notice but is titled as a Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys Fees. Because the Motion was filed incorrectly, it was not set for hearing on the docket. Plaintiff shall refile the Motion using the correct event codes. (jp)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. UNDER SUBMISSION: NO HEARING. Joint Report Due: 4/5/2019 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT IS HEREBY STRICKEN, PER ORDER (DKT NO. #10 ***. NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Man Wai Chung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration Declaration and Proof of Service)(Foster, Richard). Modified on 2/21/2019 (jp).
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Jose Alberto Molina. (et)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jose Alberto Molina. (et)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles-Southeast Judicial District, case number VC064855 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott., filed by Defendant Jose Alberto Molina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Man Wai Chung v. Jose Alberto Molina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Alberto Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haciendas Grandes Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krempasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southbay Development Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Man Wai Chung
Represented By: Richard J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Chung
Represented By: Richard J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?