General Finance Group, Inc. et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: RONALD F VALENTA, ANDREW HARDING, GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC., MARK C KEITH, LARRY D TASHJIAN, MARC PEREZ, TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, WILLIAM H QUIROS, Mark C. Keith, Larry D. Tashjian, Ronald F. Valenta and William H. Quiros
Defendant: UNITED SITE SERVICES, INC. and U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00844
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #21 filed March 25, 2019, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for June 3, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
March 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs, Ronald F. Valenta and General Finance Group, Inc., Andrew Harding, Mark C. Keith, Marc Perez, William H. Quiros, Larry D. Tashjian, Tashjian Family Limited Partnership. (Wallis, Jenifer)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants, Ronald F. Valenta and General Finance Group, Inc., Andrew Harding, Mark C. Keith, Marc Perez, William H. Quiros, Larry D. Tashjian, Tashjian Family Limited Partnership. (Wallis, Jenifer)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Tashjian Family Limited Partnership, Ronald F. Valenta, Andrew Harding, Marc Perez, Mark C. Keith, General Finance Group, Inc., Larry D. Tashjian, William H. Quiros. upon U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Faisal M. Zubairi of Dorsey & Whitney, LLP, counsel for Defendant, U.S. Bank National Association. (Ellrod, Anthony)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 4/8/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, (Attorney Christian E Picone added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft))(Picone, Christian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant United Site Services, Inc..(Attorney Christian E Picone added to party United Site Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Picone, Christian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff General Finance Group, Inc., upon Defendant United Site Services, Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for United Site Services, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Site Services, Inc. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-844 MWF-JEM. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs General Finance Group, Inc., Andrew Harding, Mark C. Keith, Marc Perez, William H. Quiros, Larry D. Tashjian, Tashjian Family Limited Partnership, Ronald F. Valenta. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs General Finance Group, Inc., Andrew Harding, Mark C. Keith, Marc Perez, William H. Quiros, Larry D. Tashjian, Tashjian Family Limited Partnership, Ronald F. Valenta. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #5 , Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC., ANDREW HARDING, MARK C KEITH, MARC PEREZ, WILLIAM H QUIROS, LARRY D TASHJIAN, TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC., ANDREW HARDING, MARK C KEITH, MARC PEREZ, WILLIAM H QUIROS, LARRY D TASHJIAN, TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Plaintiff, General Finance Group, Inc.; Plaintiff, Marc Perez; Plaintiff, Ronald F. Valenta; Plaintiff, Larry D. Tashjian as Trustee of the Tashjian Family Trust; Plaintiff, William H. Quiros as Trustee of the William H. Quiros Trust; Plaintiff, Tashjian Family Limited Partnership; Plaintiff, Andrew Harding; Plaintiff, Mark C. Keith; Defendant U.S. Bank National Association; Defendant, United Site Services, Inc.. (Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party RONALD F VALENTA(pty:pla))(Wallis, Jenifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC., ANDREW HARDING, MARK C KEITH, MARC PEREZ, WILLIAM H QUIROS, LARRY D TASHJIAN, TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Wallis, Jenifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23153959 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFFS TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ANDREW HARDING, MARC PEREZ, MARK C KEITH, GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC., LARRY D TASHJIAN, WILLIAM H QUIROS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint) (Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party ANDREW HARDING(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party MARK C KEITH(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party MARC PEREZ(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party WILLIAM H QUIROS(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party LARRY D TASHJIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP(pty:pla))(Wallis, Jenifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Finance Group, Inc. et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD F VALENTA
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW HARDING
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL FINANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK C KEITH
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY D TASHJIAN
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC PEREZ
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHJIAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM H QUIROS
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Keith
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Tashjian
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Valenta
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Quiros
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Anthony J Ellrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SITE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael Jin-Kon Cheng
Represented By: Christian E Picone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Christian E Picone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?