Andre Galvan v. Smashburger IP Holder LLC et al

Plaintiff: Andre Galvan and Lucinda Lopez
Defendant: Jollibee Foods Corporation, Smashburger Franchising LLC and Smashburger IP Holder LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00993
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. UNDER SUBMISSION: NO HEARING. Joint Report Due: 5/10/2019 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING LOCAL RULES 23-3 AND EXTENDING DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge John A. Kronstadt #17 . Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to PlaintiffsFirst Amended Complaint by May 1, 2019. (twdb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Andre Galvan, Lucinda Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Blair)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Smashburger Franchising LLC, Smashburger IP Holder LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Andre Galvan, Lucinda Lopez (Attachments: #1 Redline of First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Attorney Blair Elizabeth Reed added to party Lucinda Lopez(pty:pla))(Reed, Blair)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE THE SUBMISSION OF COURTESY COPIES OF COMPLAINT (DKT. #1 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.5 and this Court's Standing Order 9(e), parties are required to submit courtesy copies of all initial pleadings and motion papers, among other filings. Copies must be printed from CM/ECF and must include the CM/ECF-generated header, unobscured by stapling or binding. The parties are directed to review the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders, and to submit the Complaint by March 1, 2019 to the 4th Floor of the First Street Courthouse. The parties are also reminded to review and comply with the Local Rules and Standing Orders with respect to all future filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Smashburger Franchising LLC answer now due 4/5/2019; Smashburger IP Holder LLC answer now due 4/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Smashburger Franchising LLC; Smashburger IP Holder LLC.(Attorney Mark A Finkelstein added to party Smashburger Franchising LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Finkelstein added to party Smashburger IP Holder LLC(pty:dft))(Finkelstein, Mark)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan, upon Defendant Jollibee Foods Corporation served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Caroline Marques, HR Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fisher, Lawrence)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan, upon Defendant Smashburger Franchising LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Angela Hodges, Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fisher, Lawrence)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan, upon Defendant Smashburger IP Holder LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Angela Hodges, Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fisher, Lawrence)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FRO SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Jollibee Foods Corporation, Smashburger Franchising LLC, Smashburger IP Holder LLC. (shb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan. (Reed, Blair)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan, (Reed, Blair)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan. (Reed, Blair)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan. (Reed, Blair)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23186621 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Andre Galvan. (Attorney Blair Elizabeth Reed added to party Andre Galvan(pty:pla))(Reed, Blair)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre Galvan v. Smashburger IP Holder LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jollibee Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smashburger Franchising LLC
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Mark A Finkelstein
Represented By: Adina Witzling Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smashburger IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Mark A Finkelstein
Represented By: Adina Witzling Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Galvan
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Reed
Represented By: Marc G Reich
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Adam T Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Lopez
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?