Maria Zavala v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Maria Zavala
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00999
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Tova D Wolking added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Wolking, Tova)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Zavala, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/14/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Drake, Roger)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (lh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Zavala. (Drake, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Zavala, identifying None. (Drake, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Zavala. (Drake, Roger)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23188394 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maria Zavala. (Attorney Roger David Drake added to party Maria Zavala(pty:pla))(Drake, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Zavala v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zavala
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Represented By: Erika Bailey Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Tova D Wolking
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?