Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes v. Matthew Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo, Lee Francis CISSNA, Corinna Luna, Matthew Whitaker, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and Donna Campagnolo
Case Number: 2:2019cv01025
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Donna Campagnolo, Lee Francis Cissna, Corinna Luna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker. (bm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #9 , Summons Request #8 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes. (Telfer, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED - STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES (bm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: "To:" field needs to list at least one defendant before indicating "see attached". Judge's initials are not indicated in the caption of the attached summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes. (Telfer, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #2 , Miscellaneous Document #4 . The following error(s) was found: Document Number 2 and 4 the Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties which was e-filed the wrong events. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (et)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certification of Interested Parties re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Telfer, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes. (Telfer, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 **CIVIL COVER SHEET** filed as First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes(Telfer, David) Modified on 2/13/2019 (et).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23199772 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes. (Attorney David M Telfer added to party Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes(pty:pla))(Telfer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes v. Matthew Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis CISSNA
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinna Luna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossana Da Rosa Guimaraes
Represented By: David M Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?