The Proactiv Company LLC v. Halogent, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Proactiv Company LLC
Defendant: Halogent, LLC d/b/a Exposed Skin Care LLC, Jeffrey Hautala and Halogent, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01031
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kristine M. Young re Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) - optional html form #9 filed by Plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC. (Giali, Dale)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H WU. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. See order for further details. (shb)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Kristine M. Young APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC, designating JoAnne S. Jennings as local counsel. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristine M. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23218963) filed by plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jennings, JoAnne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristine M. Young. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Halogent, LLC, and Jeffrey Hautala. (jtil)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC, identifying The Proactiv Company LLC, Nestle Skin Health S.A., Guthy-Renker LLC, NSH Holdings, Inc., Global Synergy International LLC, Defendant Halogent, LLC d/b/a Exposed Skin Care, and Defendant Jeffrey Hautala. (Giali, Dale)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC. (Giali, Dale)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC. (Giali, Dale)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23196003 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff The Proactiv Company LLC. (Attorney Dale J Giali added to party The Proactiv Company LLC(pty:pla))(Giali, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Proactiv Company LLC v. Halogent, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halogent, LLC d/b/a Exposed Skin Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hautala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halogent, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Proactiv Company LLC
Represented By: Dale J Giali
Represented By: JoAnne S Jennings
Represented By: Kristine M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?