Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund v. Show Ready, LLC

Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND and Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund
Defendant: SHOW READY, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company and Show Ready, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01039
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Show Ready, LLC, a Suspended California limited liability company (bm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Show Ready, LLC filed by PLAINTIFF Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Halford, Kathryn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund, upon Defendant Show Ready, LLC served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Douglas Lee Murphy, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Halford, Kathryn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Show Ready, LLC. (lh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND, (Skinner, Marie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23197380 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Marie J Skinner added to party BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND(pty:pla))(Skinner, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund v. Show Ready, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND
Represented By: Marie J Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Marie J Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOW READY, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Show Ready, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?