Luis Marquez v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Luis Marquez
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01079
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation identifying defendant as Corporate Parent. (Klein, Kyle)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Klein, Kyle)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Starbucks Corporation answer now due 4/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Kyle P Klein added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Klein, Kyle)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara Gunderson counsel for Plaintiff Luis Marquez. Adding Sara Gunderson as counsel of record for Luis Marquez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(Attorney Sara Gunderson added to party Luis Marquez(pty:pla))(Gunderson, Sara)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE / Becky De George - Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (lh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Carson, Chris)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez, (Carson, Chris)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Carson, Chris)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23203787 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Marquez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Luis Marquez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Marquez v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Janet Lynn Grumer
Represented By: Julie L Hall
Represented By: Kyle P Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Marquez
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Sara Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?