Shirley Lindsay v. Carolyn K. Mulne et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Lindsay
Defendant: Does 1-10, Carolyn K. Mulne and Jeff Muchamel
Case Number: 2:2019cv01166
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 Amended-Corrected CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Muchamel Jeff Muchamel, identifying No other interested parties. (Abraham, Stephen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #12 RE: Certificate of Interested Parties #11 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by no later than April 1, 2019. (bm)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number and judge's initials indicated in caption of attached document is incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN ON 3/28/18. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jeff Muchamel, identifying No other interested parties. (Abraham, Stephen) Modified on 3/29/2019 (bm).
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jeff Muchamel.(Attorney Stephen E Abraham added to party Jeff Muchamel(pty:dft))(Abraham, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Jeff Muchamel served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Jeff Muchamel, Carolyn K. Mulne(in individual), Carolyn K. Mulne(representative capacity as trustee). (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220892 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley Lindsay v. Carolyn K. Mulne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn K. Mulne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Muchamel
Represented By: Stephen E Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Lindsay
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?