Antonio Fernandez v. ALJ Investment Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Juan Graciano, Quilino Z. Vergara, ALJ Investment Co., LLC, Noe Gutierrez Vasquez and Isabel Gonzalez Galvan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01167
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 as to defendants Isabel Gonzalez Galvan, Noe Gutierrez Vasquez. (mrgo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants ALJ Investment Co., LLC, Does, Isabel Gonzalez Galvan, Noe Gutierrez Vasquez amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Christopher A. Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Quilino Z. Vergara served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leticia Vergara - Wife in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant ALJ Investment Co., LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: GENE DUNGNO LEE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants ALJ Investment Co., LLC, Juan Graciano, Quilino Z. Vergara. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220928 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. ALJ Investment Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Graciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quilino Z. Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALJ Investment Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noe Gutierrez Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Gonzalez Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?