Antonio Fernandez v. Pamela K. Barker et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Pamel K. Barker and DFC Recipe LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01168
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Pamel K. Barker, in individual and representative capacity as trustee of The Pamela K. Barker Revocable Trust created on 10-29- 2001. (bm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Pamel K. Barker filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #17 RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel #13 by Clerk of Court. The Docket Clerk will correct the docket entry to include the name of the entry and text content. (bm)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT; ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time #14 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation And Request To Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): [Proposed] Order was not attached as a separate, additional attachment to the Stipulation. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with a separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to DFC Recipe LLC answer now due 4/12/2019, filed by Defendant DFC Recipe LLC.(Attorney Justin G Schmidt added to party DFC Recipe LLC(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Justin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123 (Gunderson, Sara) Modified on 3/19/2019 (bm). Sara Gunderson added for plaintiff Antonio Fernandez Modified on 3/25/2019 (ak).
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Pamel K. Barker served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #9 served on 2/27/2019. (Carson, Chris)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant DFC Recipe LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process - LINDA DARLENE PEARSON in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (wm)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Pamel K. Barker, DFC Recipe LLC. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220939 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Pamela K. Barker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamel K. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFC Recipe LLC
Represented By: Justin G Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Sara Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?