Debra Mendez v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Debra Mendez
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01176
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Stipulation is GRANTED and UNUM's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to April 26, 2019. (lom)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 4/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kristin Kyle De Bautista added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(De Bautista, Kristin)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Debra Mendez. (Garris, Christian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Debra Mendez, identifying Morrison & Foerster. (Garris, Christian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Debra Mendez. (Garris, Christian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23223598 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Debra Mendez. (Attorney Christian J Garris added to party Debra Mendez(pty:pla))(Garris, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debra Mendez v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Mendez
Represented By: Christian J Garris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kristin Kyle De Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?