Swift Harvest USA, LLC v. Family Dollar, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Swift Harvest USA, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Family Dollar, Inc.
Petitioner: Family Dollar, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01195
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #15 #18 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar Inc, designating James H. Moon as local counsel. (lt)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #14 #16 Non-Resident Attorney Warren J. Rheaume APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar Inc, designating James H. Moon as local counsel. (lt)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/28/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23427471) filed by defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moon, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23427471) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. NY missing. (lt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Warren J. Rheaume to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/22/2019, Receipt No. 26G9NSQ6) filed by defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moon, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23427471) filed by defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moon, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Warren J. Rheaume to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23427227) filed by defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moon, James)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The above matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on May 14, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. The conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference and report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer as required by F.R.Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. See order for further details. (jre)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. identifying Dollar Tree, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Moon, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Family Dollar, Inc., identifying Family Dollar Stores, Inc.; Dollar Tree, Inc.; Huajun Toys Co. Ltd.; Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Moon, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Family Dollar, Inc..(Attorney James H Moon added to party Family Dollar, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moon, James)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, upon Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Registered Agent, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Raucher, Stephen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, identifying Aquawood LLC; Banzai International Limited; Focus Brand Limited. (Raucher, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23226948 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D) (Attorney Stephen L Raucher added to party Swift Harvest USA, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Raucher, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift Harvest USA, LLC v. Family Dollar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Family Dollar, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Harvest USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L Raucher
Represented By: Hana S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar, Inc.
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Lauren B Rainwater
Represented By: Warren J Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?