Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc. v. Textile One, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc. and Neman Brothers and Assoc., Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, Forever 21, Inc., Textile One, Inc. d/b/a Blue Leopard, Does 1-10, inclusive and Textile One, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01200
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal) (gk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff` Neman Brothers and Assoc., Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Jeong, Chan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neman Brothers and Assoc., Inc., upon Defendant Forever 21, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jeong, Chan)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Textile One, Inc. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Proposed Summons)(Jeong, Chan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc., (Jeong, Chan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23228012 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc. v. Textile One, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textile One, Inc. d/b/a Blue Leopard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textile One, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neman Brothers & Assoc., Inc.
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neman Brothers and Assoc., Inc.
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?