Connie Hare v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Connie Hare
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv01209
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Hare, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Drake, Roger)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Connie Hare, identifying None. (Drake, Roger)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Plaintiff name in the body of the Certification and Notice of Interested Parties is different from what is reflected on the caption. Please make appropriate corrections. (lh)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Connie Hare. (Drake, Roger)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Connie Hare, identifying None. (Drake, Roger)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Connie Hare. (Drake, Roger)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23229753 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Connie Hare. (Attorney Roger David Drake added to party Connie Hare(pty:pla))(Drake, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connie Hare v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul H Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Hare
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?