Frank Mora v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: FRANK MORA
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv01210
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-1210 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Mora, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FLABIA DE LA ROSA. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to CLERK. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CIVIL PROCESS CLERK. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (LaTour, Bill)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Frank Mora. (LaTour, Bill)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (iva)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF FRANK MORA, (LaTour, Bill)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF FRANK MORA. (LaTour, Bill)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FRANK MORA. (LaTour, Bill)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23229811 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF FRANK MORA. (Attorney Bill LaTour added to party FRANK MORA(pty:pla))(LaTour, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Mora v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK MORA
Represented By: Bill LaTour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?